THOMAS v. HALL et al
Plaintiff: JONATHAN LEE THOMAS
Defendant: LESLIE HALL and ARAMARK SERVICES
Case Number: 3:2022cv07427
Filed: June 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: ZACHARY C BOLITHO
Referring Judge: LACEY A COLLIER
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ZACHARY C BOLITHO notified that action is needed Re: 6 Initial Partial Filing Fee Received. (alb)
July 8, 2022 Filing 6 Initial Partial Filing fee: $ 29.37, receipt number FLN300015488. (alb)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #4 LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. The Clerk of Court is directed to assess Plaintiff an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $29.37 pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1). Plaintiff must pay the initial partial filing fee within thirty days of the date of this order. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order with the appropriate cover letter to the Escambia County Jail, Finance Department, 6400 North W Street, Pensacola, Florida 32505, Attention: Reshonda Watson. The Court will take no further action on Plaintiff's claims until the Court receives the initial partial filing fee. (Order and letter mailed.)( Fee due by 7/18/2022.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ZACHARY C BOLITHO on 06/17/2022. (alb)
June 16, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JONATHAN LEE THOMAS. (alb)
June 16, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ZACHARY C BOLITHO notified that action is needed Re: #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to ZACHARY C BOLITHO. (alb)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. The Clerk of Court is directed to send Plaintiff a form application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis with this case number included on the form. On or before JULY 6, 2022, Plaintiff must: a. file a notice of voluntary dismissal; OR b. submit payment in the amount of $402.00; OR c. file a complete application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis on the Court-approved form.Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ZACHARY C BOLITHO on 06/06/2022. ( Fee or form due by 7/6/2022.) (Order and form mailed.) (alb)
June 6, 2022 Filing 2 Notice to Pro Se Litigant. (alb)
June 6, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ZACHARY C BOLITHO notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint. (alb)
June 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ARAMARK SERVICES, LESLIE HALL, filed by JONATHAN LEE THOMAS. (No service copies, no IFP motion or fee.) (alb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THOMAS v. HALL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONATHAN LEE THOMAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LESLIE HALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARAMARK SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?