ROMAGNANO v. PENSACOLA NEWS JOURNAL et al
Plaintiff: CHASE ANDERSON ROMAGNANO
Defendant: PENSACOLA NEWS JOURNAL, WKRG, WALA, WPMI and ESCAMBIA COUNTY SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS OFFICE
Case Number: 3:2022cv21803
Filed: October 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: ZACHARY C BOLITHO
Referring Judge: ROGER VINSON
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER adopting the magistrate judge's #5 Report and Recommendation. Plaintiff's request for preliminary injunctive relief (Doc. #1 ) is denied. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 12/12/2022. (djb)
December 11, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON notified that action is needed Re: #5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. (No objection filed.) (alb)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER of deficiency. On October 28, 2022, Plaintiff submitted a ten-page document titled "Amendments" to the Clerk of Court. The Clerk of Court is to RETURN the document titled "Amendment" without filing. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ZACHARY C BOLITHO on 11/1/2022. (alb) Modified on 11/2/2022 to correct file date (alb).
October 31, 2022 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Plaintiff's request for preliminary injunctive relief, which is contained in Plaintiffs complaint (Doc. #1 ), be DENIED. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ZACHARY C BOLITHO on 10/31/2022. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 11/28/2022. (alb)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #2 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff is advised this case is now in the statutory screening stage, during which the Court is required to review Plaintiffs complaint to determine whether the complaint fails to state a claim on which relief may be granted or seeks monetary relief against a defendant who is immune from such relief. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ZACHARY C BOLITHO on 10/31/2022. Fee status updated to in forma pauperis. (alb)
October 28, 2022 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se Litigant. (alb)
October 28, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ZACHARY C BOLITHO notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint. ** Contains Motion for Emergency Injunction. #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to ZACHARY C BOLITHO. (jfj)
October 27, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by CHASE ANDERSON ROMAGNANO. (jfj)
October 27, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by CHASE ANDERSON ROMAGNANO. ** Contains Motion for Emergency Injunction. (No service copies received. IFP Motion received.) (jfj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROMAGNANO v. PENSACOLA NEWS JOURNAL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHASE ANDERSON ROMAGNANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENSACOLA NEWS JOURNAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WKRG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WPMI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESCAMBIA COUNTY SUPERVISOR OF ELECTIONS OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?