THE SCHOOL BOARD OF ESCAMBIA COUNTY FL ESCAMBIA COUNTY STATE OF FLORIDA v. META PLATFORMS INC et al
Plaintiff: THE SCHOOL BOARD OF ESCAMBIA COUNTY FLORIDA ESCAMBIA COUNTY STATE OF FLORIDA
Defendant: META PLATFORMS INC, FACEBOOK HOLDINGS LLC, FACEBOOK OPERATIONS LLC, INSTAGRAM LLC, FACEBOOK PAYMENTS INC, SICULUS INC, SNAP INC, TIKTOK INC, BYTEDANCE INC, GOOGLE LLC and YOUTUBE LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv24611
Filed: October 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: ZACHARY C BOLITHO
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2023 Filing 18 ACKNOWLEDGMENT re 16 Case Transferred to NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA. Case transferred from Florida Northern has been opened in California Northern District as case 4:23-cv-05475, filed on 10/24/2023. (mb)
October 24, 2023 Filing 17 AMENDED CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-19) re MDL No. 3047 to NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA re #15 CTO Order. (mb)
October 24, 2023 Filing 16 Inter-district Transfer to the NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA - OAKLAND DIVISION located at RONALD V DELLUMS FED BLDG, 1301 CLAY STREET, OAKLAND, CA 94612 re MDL 3047. (mb)
October 24, 2023 Filing 15 CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-19) re MDL No. 3047 to NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA. (Attachments: #1 CTO for MDL, #2 MDL Minute ORDER) (mb)
October 12, 2023 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by THE SCHOOL BOARD OF ESCAMBIA COUNTY FLORIDA ESCAMBIA COUNTY STATE OF FLORIDA. YOUTUBE LLC served on 10/11/2023, answer due 11/1/2023. (PAULOS, EMANUELLA)
October 12, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by THE SCHOOL BOARD OF ESCAMBIA COUNTY FLORIDA ESCAMBIA COUNTY STATE OF FLORIDA. GOOGLE LLC served on 10/11/2023, answer due 11/1/2023. (PAULOS, EMANUELLA)
October 12, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by THE SCHOOL BOARD OF ESCAMBIA COUNTY FLORIDA ESCAMBIA COUNTY STATE OF FLORIDA. SNAP INC served on 10/11/2023, answer due 11/1/2023. (PAULOS, EMANUELLA)
October 12, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by THE SCHOOL BOARD OF ESCAMBIA COUNTY FLORIDA ESCAMBIA COUNTY STATE OF FLORIDA. BYTEDANCE INC served on 10/11/2023, answer due 11/1/2023. (PAULOS, EMANUELLA)
October 12, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by THE SCHOOL BOARD OF ESCAMBIA COUNTY FLORIDA ESCAMBIA COUNTY STATE OF FLORIDA. TIKTOK INC served on 10/11/2023, answer due 11/1/2023. (PAULOS, EMANUELLA)
October 12, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by THE SCHOOL BOARD OF ESCAMBIA COUNTY FLORIDA ESCAMBIA COUNTY STATE OF FLORIDA. SICULUS INC served on 10/11/2023, answer due 11/1/2023. (PAULOS, EMANUELLA)
October 12, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by THE SCHOOL BOARD OF ESCAMBIA COUNTY FLORIDA ESCAMBIA COUNTY STATE OF FLORIDA. INSTAGRAM LLC served on 10/11/2023, answer due 11/1/2023. (PAULOS, EMANUELLA)
October 12, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by THE SCHOOL BOARD OF ESCAMBIA COUNTY FLORIDA ESCAMBIA COUNTY STATE OF FLORIDA. FACEBOOK PAYMENTS INC served on 10/11/2023, answer due 11/1/2023. (PAULOS, EMANUELLA)
October 12, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by THE SCHOOL BOARD OF ESCAMBIA COUNTY FLORIDA ESCAMBIA COUNTY STATE OF FLORIDA. FACEBOOK OPERATIONS LLC served on 10/11/2023, answer due 11/1/2023. (PAULOS, EMANUELLA)
October 12, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by THE SCHOOL BOARD OF ESCAMBIA COUNTY FLORIDA ESCAMBIA COUNTY STATE OF FLORIDA. META PLATFORMS INC served on 10/11/2023, answer due 11/1/2023. (PAULOS, EMANUELLA)
October 4, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to META PLATFORMS INC (Attachments: #1 SUMMONS - INSTAGRAM LLC, #2 SUMMONS - SNAP INC, #3 SUMMONS - TIK TOK INC, #4 SUMMONS - GOOGLE LLC, #5 SUMMONS - YOUTUBE LLC). (mb)
October 4, 2023 Filing 3 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re #1 Complaint. The parties in the above-referenced case were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. Party names are to be entered in all caps and without punctuation. For future reference: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide," available at www.flnd.uscourts.gov. (mb)
October 4, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE Proposed Summons to be issued by Clerk by The School Board of Escambia County, Florida, Escambia County, State of Florida (PAULOS, EMANUELLA)
October 3, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-8256630.), filed by The School Board of Escambia County, Florida, Escambia County, State of Florida. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (PAULOS, EMANUELLA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THE SCHOOL BOARD OF ESCAMBIA COUNTY FL ESCAMBIA COUNTY STATE OF FLORIDA v. META PLATFORMS INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE SCHOOL BOARD OF ESCAMBIA COUNTY FLORIDA ESCAMBIA COUNTY STATE OF FLORIDA
Represented By: EMANUELLA JOANNA PAULOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: META PLATFORMS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FACEBOOK HOLDINGS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FACEBOOK OPERATIONS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INSTAGRAM LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FACEBOOK PAYMENTS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SICULUS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SNAP INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIKTOK INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BYTEDANCE INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOOGLE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YOUTUBE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?