COWDIN III v. BASF CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: EDWIN G. COWDIN III
Defendant: BASF CATALYSTS LLC, BASF CORPORATION, BELL TEXTRON, INC., BOEING COMPANY, THE, DCO, LLC, DEXTER HYSOL AEROSPACE, LLC, EATON AEROQUIP LLC, GENERAL CABLE CORPORATION, GENERAL DYNAMICS CORPORATION, GENERAL ELECTRIC CORPORATION, THE GOODYEAR TIRE AND RUBBER COMPANY, HENKEL CORPORATION, HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC, IMO INDUSTRIES INC, LOCKHEED MARTIN CORPORATION, MERITOR, INC., NORTHROP GRUMMAN CORPORATION, PARAMOUNT GLOBAL, PARKER-HANNIFAN CORPORATION, PNEUMO ABEX LLC, PREMIX MARBLETITE MANUFACTURING CO., RAYTHEON TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION, ROCKWELL AUTOMATION, INC., SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC., SHELL USA INC., SPECIALTY CABLE CORP., TELEDYNE TECHNOLOGIES INCORPORATED, UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION, WYETH HOLDINGS LLC and GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Case Number: 3:2023cv24639
Filed: October 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: ZACHARY C BOLITHO
Referring Judge: T KENT WETHERELL
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2023 Filing 175 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER JM COLLINGS on behalf of GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (COLLINGS, CHRISTOPHER)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL re #173 Stipulation of Dismissal. All claims against BASF Catalysts, LLC are dismissed without prejudice under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) and the Clerk shall terminate that defendant in CM/ECF. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 12/6/2023. BASF CATALYSTS LLC terminated. (alb)
December 5, 2023 Filing 173 STIPULATION of Dismissal (JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT BASF CATALYSTS, LLC) by BASF CATALYSTS LLC. (JACKSON-FANNIN, JULIAN)
November 30, 2023 Filing 172 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice fee received: $ 208.00, receipt number CFLNDC-8385209, entered per Finance request via email). (mb)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER granting #170 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Kari H. Halbrook is authorized to appear pro hac vice for Defendant Henkel US Operations Corporation. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 11/28/2023. (alb)
November 28, 2023 Motions No Longer Referred: #170 Consent MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kari H. Halbrook. (Previously referred to wrong judge.) (alb)
November 27, 2023 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #170 Consent MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kari H. Halbrook.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-8380001.) (alb) Modified on 11/28/2023 to reflect the correct judge (alb).
November 22, 2023 Filing 170 Consent MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kari H. Halbrook.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-8380001.) by HENKEL CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (HALBROOK, KARI)
November 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER. The #168 motion is GRANTED, and attorney John R. Lawless is authorized to appear pro hac vice for Defendant Wyeth Holdings LLC. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 11/16/2023. (alb)
November 15, 2023 Filing 168 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John R. Lawless.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-8372917.) by WYETH HOLDINGS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (LAWLESS, JOHN)
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER. The #166 motion is GRANTED, and attorney Adam Doeringer is authorized to appear pro hac vice for Defendant Bell Textron, Inc. f/k/a Bell Helicopter Company. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 11/14/2023. (alb)
November 13, 2023 Filing 166 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Adam Doeringer.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-8367261.) by BELL TEXTRON, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter of Good Standing) (DOERINGER, ADAM)
November 13, 2023 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #166 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Adam Doeringer.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-8367261.) (alb)
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER granting #163 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Scott Kossoudji is authorized to appear pro hac vice for Defendant Lockheed Martin Corporation. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 11/02/2023. (alb)
November 1, 2023 Filing 164 RULE 26 Disclosures by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. (FERGUSON, TIMOTHY)
November 1, 2023 Filing 163 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Scott A. Kossoudji.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-8353903.) by LOCKHEED MARTIN CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (KOSSOUDJI, SCOTT)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 162 REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' status report (Doc. #161 ), it is ORDERED that the paperless scheduling order (Docs. 112 , 113 , 114 ) entered by Judge Moore is replaced by this Order, and the following deadlines and procedures are established: Discovery due by 2/23/2024. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 3/15/2024. Mediation to take place by 3/15/2024. Mediation Report due by 3/22/2024. (Please see full order.) Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 11/1/2023. (alb)
November 1, 2023 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #163 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Scott A. Kossoudji.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-8353903.) (alb)
October 31, 2023 Filing 161 STATUS REPORT by EDWIN G. COWDIN III. (GREEN, JENNIFER)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER re #157 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Lockheed Martin Corporation. Based on the notice of withdrawal (Doc. #157 ), it is ORDERED that the Clerk shall terminate attorney Dino Galardi as counsel of record for Defendant Lockheed Martin Corporation in CM/ECF. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 10/31/2023. Attorney DINO GALE GALARDI terminated. (alb)
October 31, 2023 Filing 159 NOTICE of Appearance by CAITLYN MCCUTCHEON on behalf of SHELL USA INC. (MCCUTCHEON, CAITLYN)
October 31, 2023 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #161 Status Report. (alb)
October 30, 2023 Filing 158 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID C REEVES on behalf of LOCKHEED MARTIN CORPORATION (REEVES, DAVID)
October 30, 2023 Filing 157 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Lockheed Martin Corporation by LOCKHEED MARTIN CORPORATION. (GALARDI, DINO)
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER SUBSTITUTING COUNSEL. Re: #155 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Edward J. Briscoe shall have no further obligation to represent Defendant Lockheed Martin in this case, and the Clerk shall terminate him as counsel of record for Defendant Lockheed Martin in CM/ECF. The Clerk shall add attorney James F. Moseley, Jr. as counsel of record for Defendant Lockheed Martin in CM/ECF. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 10/30/2023. Added attorney JAMES FRANCES MOSELEY, JR for LOCKHEED MARTIN CORPORATION. Attorney EDWARD J BRISCOE terminated (alb)
October 27, 2023 Filing 155 MOTION to Substitute Attorney for Lockheed Martin Corporation by LOCKHEED MARTIN CORPORATION. (BRISCOE, EDWARD)
October 27, 2023 Filing 154 NOTICE of Appearance by MONICA L IREL on behalf of RAYTHEON TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION (IREL, MONICA)
October 27, 2023 Filing 153 NOTICE of Appearance by STUART LANCE COHEN on behalf of RAYTHEON TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION (COHEN, STUART)
October 27, 2023 Filing 152 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN CHARLES REDDIN on behalf of RAYTHEON TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION (REDDIN, JOHN)
October 25, 2023 Filing 151 NOTICE of Appearance by PETER J MELARAGNO on behalf of IMO INDUSTRIES INC (MELARAGNO, PETER)
October 25, 2023 Filing 150 NOTICE of Appearance by PETER J MELARAGNO on behalf of THE GOODYEAR TIRE AND RUBBER COMPANY (MELARAGNO, PETER)
October 25, 2023 Filing 149 NOTICE of Appearance by PETER J MELARAGNO on behalf of NORTHROP GRUMMAN CORPORATION (MELARAGNO, PETER)
October 25, 2023 Filing 148 NOTICE of Appearance by PETER J MELARAGNO on behalf of EATON AEROQUIP LLC (MELARAGNO, PETER)
October 18, 2023 Filing 147 NOTICE of Appearance by FRANCES LOPEZ on behalf of DCO, LLC (LOPEZ, FRANCES)
October 18, 2023 Filing 146 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN FRASER COXHEAD on behalf of BELL TEXTRON, INC. (COXHEAD, STEPHEN)
October 18, 2023 Filing 145 NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY JOHN FERGUSON on behalf of HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC (FERGUSON, TIMOTHY)
October 18, 2023 Filing 144 NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD J BRISCOE on behalf of THE GOODYEAR TIRE AND RUBBER COMPANY (BRISCOE, EDWARD)
October 18, 2023 Filing 143 NOTICE of Appearance by DINO GALE GALARDI on behalf of PREMIX MARBLETITE MANUFACTURING CO. (GALARDI, DINO)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER. The attorneys who are not authorized to practice in this District shall seek admission or file motions to appear pro hac vice as soon as practical. No later than 14 days from the date of this Order, the parties shall file a status report identifying any matters that require the Courts attention at this time and listing the current deadlines (by date, not number of days before trial, etc.) for amending the pleadings, joining additional parties, initial disclosures, expert disclosures, completing discovery, completing mediation, and other matters in the paperless scheduling order. The Clerk shall send a copy of this Order to the attorneys who were sent notices regarding admission to practice. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 10/17/2023. ( Status Report due by 10/31/2023.) (alb)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL, re #135 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by PARAMOUNT GLOBAL. The claims against Paramount Global are DISMISSED without prejudice under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2). The Clerk shall terminate Paramount Global as a Defendant in CM/ECF.Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 10/17/2023.PARAMOUNT GLOBAL, terminated. (alb)
October 17, 2023 Filing 140 NOTICE of Appearance by JENNIFER BOWERSOX GREEN on behalf of EDWIN G. COWDIN III (GREEN, JENNIFER)
October 17, 2023 Filing 139 NOTICE of Appearance by EVELYN FLETCHER DAVIS on behalf of DCO, LLC (DAVIS, EVELYN)
October 16, 2023 Filing 138 Notice Regarding Admission to Practice mailed to attorneys Dawn Marie Besserman and Jennifer Bowersox Green for Plaintiff Edwin G. Cowdin III. (Attachments: #1 ATTORNEY ARI SHAPIRO for GENERAL DYNAMICS CORP, #2 ATTORNEY FRANCES LOPEZ for DCO LLC, #3 ATTORNEY PETER MELARAGNO for EATON AEROQUIP LLC AND NORTHRP GRUMMAN CORP, #4 TIMOTHY FERGUSON for HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC) (alb)
October 16, 2023 Filing 137 Case electronically transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 0:23-cv-60841. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER granting #107 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 10/16/2023. See attached document for full details. (rhr) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
October 16, 2023 Civil Case Terminated per order DE #136 . Closing Case. (drz) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
October 12, 2023 Filing 135 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by PARAMOUNT GLOBAL (Collings, Christopher) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 134 PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Defendant's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for John R. Lawless, Esq. #133 . UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion #133 is GRANTED. John R. Lawless, Esq may appear pro hac vice in this matter. The Clerk of Court shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to: jlawless@parklawless.com. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 8/18/2023. (rhr) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
August 16, 2023 Filing 133 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for John R. Lawless. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-16848950 by Wyeth Holdings LLC. Responses due by 8/30/2023 (Attachments: #1 Certification of John R. Lawless, Esquire)(Cachaldora, Amanda) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
July 28, 2023 Filing 132 NOTICE by Raytheon Technologies Corporation (Reddin, John) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
July 27, 2023 Filing 131 Defendant's NOTICE by Boeing Company, The re 112 Scheduling Order,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, of Reservation of Rights with Respect to Deadline for Seeking Leave to Amend Affirmative Defenses (Yudovich, Loren) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
June 30, 2023 Filing 130 Defendant's REPLY to Response to Motion re #107 Defendant's MOTION to Change Venue and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Boeing Company, The. (Pazos, Lucia) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
June 30, 2023 Filing 129 The Boeing Company's AMENDED ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Boeing Company, The. (Pazos, Lucia) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
June 26, 2023 Filing 128 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Loren Yael Yudovich on behalf of Boeing Company, The. Attorney Loren Yael Yudovich added to party Boeing Company, The(pty:dft). (Yudovich, Loren) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
June 23, 2023 Filing 127 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Michael Essington. (Green, Jennifer) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
June 23, 2023 Filing 126 Clerk's Notice to Filer re #125 Notice (Other). Mediator Not Added; ERROR - The Filer failed to add the mediator. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF and add the mediator. (drz) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
June 23, 2023 Filing 125 Plaintiff's NOTICE by Edwin G. Cowdin III of Selection of Mediator (Green, Jennifer) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
June 23, 2023 Filing 124 RESPONSE in Opposition re #107 Defendant's MOTION to Change Venue and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Edwin G. Cowdin III. Replies due by 6/30/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - GAO-NSIAD 96-29 Closing Maintenance Depots, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Screenshot 2023-06-21 161849, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Screenshot 2023-06-23 094837 (Premix Marbletite Plants), #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Screenshot 2023-06-21 163543, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Screenshot 2023-06-23 125223, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - March 2023 Monthly Calendar Yr Traffic Report (MIA), #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8 - Screenshot 2023-06-21 163837 (hotels in Maimi-Launderdale area), #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9 - Screenshot 2023-06-21 165414 (Google Maps - Pensacola), #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10 - Airport-Fact-Sheet-2021rev (Pensacola), #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11 - Screenshot 2023-06-21 165504 (Pensacola Hotels), #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12 - Cowdin 000040-41)(Green, Jennifer) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
June 22, 2023 Filing 123 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wyeth Holdings LLC identifying Corporate Parent Pfizer, Inc. for Wyeth Holdings LLC (Cachaldora, Amanda) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
June 22, 2023 Filing 122 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Wyeth Holdings LLC. (Cachaldora, Amanda) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
June 22, 2023 Filing 121 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melanie Erica Chung-Tims on behalf of Wyeth Holdings LLC. Attorney Melanie Erica Chung-Tims added to party Wyeth Holdings LLC(pty:dft). (Chung-Tims, Melanie) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
June 22, 2023 Filing 120 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amanda Rae Cachaldora on behalf of Wyeth Holdings LLC. Attorney Amanda Rae Cachaldora added to party Wyeth Holdings LLC(pty:dft). (Cachaldora, Amanda) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 119 PAPERLESS ORDER STRIKING #118 RULE 26 INITIAL DISCLOSURES. THIS CAUSE is before the Court upon a sua sponte review of the record. Defendant General Dynamics Corp. has filed initial disclosures under Rule 26(a)(1), ECF No. #118 . The Local Rules of the Southern District of Florida specifically provide that "[i]nitial and expert disclosures and the following discovery requests, responses, objections, notices or any associated proof of service shall not be filed until they are used in the proceeding or the court orders their filing: (1) deposition transcripts; (2) interrogatories; (3) requests for documents, electronically stored information or things, or to permit entry upon land; (4) requests for admission; (5) notices of taking depositions or notices of serving subpoenas; and (6) privilege logs." S.D. Fla. L.R. 26.1(b). The filing of Defendant's Rule 26 initial disclosures at this time is improper. Accordingly, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that ECF No. #118 is STRICKEN. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis on 6/21/2023. (elm) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
June 21, 2023 Filing 118 Stricken per Order de#119-Initial Disclosure(s) of pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by General Dynamics Corporation (Shapiro, Ari) Modified text on 6/22/2023 (drz). [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
June 16, 2023 Filing 117 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Boeing Company, The (Pazos, Lucia) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
June 14, 2023 Filing 116 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by BASF Corporation identifying Corporate Parent BASF USA Holding LLC, Corporate Parent BASF Nederland BV, Corporate Parent BASF SE for BASF Corporation (Jackson-Fannin, Julian) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
June 14, 2023 Filing 115 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by BASF Catalysts LLC identifying Corporate Parent BASF USA Holding LLC, Corporate Parent BASF Nederland BV, Corporate Parent BASF SE, Corporate Parent BASF Alpha Holding LLC, Corporate Parent BASF Corporation for BASF Catalysts LLC (Jackson-Fannin, Julian) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 114 PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon the Parties' Joint Rule 21 Motion to Dismiss Teledyne Technologies Incorporated, #82 . Id. Rule 21 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure permits a Court, "[o]n motion or on its own," to "add or drop a party" "at any time, on just terms." Here, the Parties have agreed that dismissal of Plaintiff's claims against Teledyne Technologies Incorporated is proper. See generally #82 . Accordingly, UPON CONSIDERATION of the Joint Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the above-styled cause is hereby DISMISSED as to Defendant Teledyne Technologies Incorporated. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to TERMINATE Defendant Teledyne Technologies Incorporated as a party to this case. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 6/12/2023. (fpi) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 113 PAPERLESS ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION. Trial having been set in this matter for the two-week trial period beginning June 3, 2024, at 9:00 a.m. pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rule of Civil Procedure and Rule 16.2 of the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED as follows: 1. All parties are required to participate in mediation. The mediation shall be completed no later than eighty (80) days before the scheduled trial date. 2. Plaintiff's counsel, or another attorney agreed upon by all counsel of record and any unrepresented parties, shall be responsible for scheduling the mediation conference. The parties are encouraged to avail themselves of the services of any mediator on the List of Certified Mediators, maintained in the office of the Clerk of this Court, but may select any other mediator. The parties shall agree upon a mediator and file a Notice of Mediator Selection within fifteen (15) days from the date of this Order. If there is no agreement, lead counsel shall file a request for the Clerk of Court to appoint a mediator in writing within fifteen (15) days from the date of this Order, and the Clerk shall designate a mediator from the List of Certified Mediators. Designation shall be made on a blind rotation basis. 3. The parties shall agree upon a place, date, and time for mediation convenient to the mediator, counsel of record, and unrepresented parties and file a Notice of Scheduling Mediation no later than one hundred and ten (110) days prior to the scheduled trial date. If the parties cannot agree to a place, date, and time for the mediation, they may motion the Court for an order dictating the place, date, and time. 4. The physical presence of counsel and each party or representatives of each party with full authority to enter in a full and complete compromise and settlement is mandatory. The mediation shall take place in person absent good cause shown by the parties. If insurance is involved, an adjuster with authority up to the policy limits or the most recent demand, whichever is lower, shall attend. 5. All discussions, representations and statements made at the mediation conference shall be confidential and privileged. 6. At least ten (10) days prior to the mediation date, all parties shall present to the mediator a brief written summary of the case identifying issues to be resolved. Copies of those summaries shall be served on all other parties. 7. The Court may impose sanctions against parties and/or counsel who do not comply with the attendance or settlement authority requirements herein, or who otherwise violate the terms of this Order. The mediator shall report non-attendance and may recommend imposition of sanctions by the Court for non-attendance. 8. The mediator shall be compensated in accordance with the standing order of the Court entered pursuant to Rule 16.2.B.6, or on such basis as may be agreed to in writing by the parties and the mediator selected by the parties. The cost of mediation shall be shared equally by the parties unless otherwise ordered by the Court. All payments shall be remitted to the mediator within 30 days of the date of the bill. Notice to the mediator of cancellation or settlement prior to the scheduled mediation conference must be given at least two (2) full business days in advance. Failure to do so will result in imposition of a fee for one hour. 9. If a full or partial settlement is reached in this case, counsel shall promptly notify the Court of the settlement in accordance with Local Rule 16.2.F, by filing a notice of settlement signed by the counsel of record within ten (10) days of the mediation conference. Thereafter, the parties shall forthwith submit an appropriate pleading concluding the case. 10. Within five (5) days following the mediation conference, the mediator shall file a Mediation Report indicating whether all required parties were present. The report shall also indicate whether the case settled (in full or in part), was continued with the consent of the parties, or whether the mediator declared an impasse. 11. If mediation is not conducted, the case may be stricken from the trial calendar, and other sanctions may be imposed. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 6/12/2023. (fpi) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 112 PAPERLESS ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL IN FORT LAUDERDALE. This case is now set for trial commencing the two-week trial period of June 3, 2024, at 9 a.m. in the United States District Courthouse, 299 East Broward Boulevard, Fort Lauderdale, Florida. The assigned courtroom will be announced at the calendar call. All parties are directed to report to the calendar call on May 30, 2024, at 2 p.m., at which time all matters relating to the scheduled trial date may be brought to the attention of the Court. A final pretrial conference as provided for by Rule 16, Fed. R. Civ. P., and Rule 16.1(C), S.D. Fla. L.R., is scheduled for May 21, 2024, at 11 a.m. The calendar call and the final pretrial conference will take place in Courtroom 13-1 (thirteenth floor), United States District Courthouse, 400 North Miami Avenue, Miami, Florida. A bilateral pretrial stipulation and all other pretrial preparations shall be completed NO LATER THAN FIVE DAYS PRIOR TO THE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. All motions to amend the pleadings or to join additional parties must be filed by the later of forty-five (45) days after the date of entry of this Order, or forty-five (45) days after the first responsive pleading by the last responding defendant. Any and all pretrial motions, including motions for summary judgment, Daubert motions, and motions in limine must be filed no later than eighty (80) days prior to the trial date. Responses to summary judgment motions must be filed no later than fourteen (14) days after service of the motion, and replies in support of the motion must be filed no later than seven (7) days after service of the response, with both deadlines computed as specified in Rule 6, Fed. R. Civ. P. The Parties are hereby notified that this Court requires strict compliance with Local Rule 56.1 regarding the filing of any motion for summary judgment and corresponding statements of material facts. For evidence not previously filed on the docket, and to the extent practicable, evidentiary support for a Party's statement of material facts shall be filed as separate exhibits within the Court's electronic case filing system; the first citation to any evidence in support of a motion for summary judgment or statement of material facts shall provide the docket entry for that evidence using the form "ECF No." In all circumstances, citations to any composite exhibit shall provide both the page number assigned by the Court's electronic case filing system (i.e., the page number of the PDF) and the page number of the document. Each party is limited to one Daubert motion. If all evidentiary issues cannot be addressed in a 20-page memorandum, the parties must file for leave to exceed the page limit. Each party is also limited to one motion in limine (other than Daubert motions). If all evidentiary issues cannot be addressed in a 20-page memorandum, the parties must file for leave to exceed the page limit. Rule 26(a)(2) expert disclosures shall be completed one hundred thirty (130) days prior to the date of trial. All discovery, including expert discovery, shall be completed one hundred (100) days prior to the date of trial. The failure to engage in discovery pending settlement negotiations shall not be grounds for continuance of the trial date. All exhibits must be pre-marked, and a typewritten exhibit list setting forth the number and description of each exhibit must be submitted at the time of trial. Plaintiff's exhibits shall be marked numerically with the letter "P" as a prefix. Defendant's exhibits shall be marked numerically with the letter "D" as a prefix. For a jury trial, counsel shall prepare and submit proposed jury instructions to the Court. The Parties shall submit their proposed jury instructions and verdict form jointly, although they do not need to agree on each proposed instruction. Where the parties do not agree on a proposed instruction, that instruction shall be set forth in bold type. Instructions proposed only by a plaintiff should be underlined. Instructions proposed only by a defendant should be italicized. Every instruction must be supported by citation to authority. The parties should use the Eleventh Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions for Civil Cases as a guide, including the directions to counsel contained therein. The parties shall jointly file their proposed jury instructions via CM/ECF, and shall also submit their proposed jury instructions to the Court via e-mail at moore@flsd.uscourts.gov in WordPerfect or Word format. For a non-jury trial, the parties shall prepare and submit to the Court proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law fully supported by the evidence, which counsel expects the trial to develop, and fully supported by citations to law. The proposed jury instructions or the proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law shall be submitted to the Court no later than five (5) business days prior to the scheduled trial date. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2016-70 of the Southern District of Florida and consistent with the Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit's Local Rules and Internal Operating Procedures, within three days of the conclusion of a trial or other proceeding, parties must file via CM/ECF electronic versions of documentary exhibits admitted into evidence, including photographs of non-documentary physical exhibits. The Parties are directed to comply with each of the requirements set forth in Administrative Order 2016-70 unless directed otherwise by the Court. THE FILING BY COUNSEL OF A "NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY" BY MOTION OR OTHERWISE IS NOT PROVIDED FOR UNDER THE LOCAL RULES AND SHALL NOT BE PRESUMED TO ALTER OR MODIFY THE COURT'S SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 6/12/2023. (fpi) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
June 12, 2023 Filing 111 NOTICE/STIPULATION of Substitution of Counsel by Julian Antony Jackson-Fannin on behalf of BASF Catalysts LLC, BASF Corporation instead of prior counsel of record J. Trumon Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Jackson-Fannin, Julian) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
June 12, 2023 Attorney J Trumon Phillips representing BASF Catalysts LLC (Defendant) and BASF Corporation (Defendant) terminated per docket entry DE #111 . (drz) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
June 9, 2023 Filing 110 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Boeing Company, The (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Parties' Proposed Trial Settings and Corresponding Deadlines)(Pazos, Lucia) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
June 9, 2023 Filing 109 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Specialty Cable Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Draka Holding B.V., Corporate Parent Prysmian S.p.A., Corporate Parent prysmian cable and systems US, Inc. for Specialty Cable Corp. (Shapiro, Ari)[Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
June 9, 2023 Filing 108 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Cable Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Prysmian Cables and Systems US, Inc., Corporate Parent Draka Holding B.V., Corporate Parent Prysmian S.p.A. for General Cable Corporation (Shapiro, Ari) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
June 9, 2023 Filing 107 Defendant's MOTION to Change Venue and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Boeing Company, The. Responses due by 6/23/2023 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint)(Pazos, Lucia) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
June 9, 2023 Filing 106 Clerk's Notice to Filer re #103 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (drz) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
June 9, 2023 Filing 105 Clerk's Notice to Filer re #100 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (drz) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
June 8, 2023 Filing 104 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Henkel Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Henkel of America, Inc., Corporate Parent Henkel AG & Co. KGaA, Corporate Parent Henkel of America I LLC, Other Affiliate Henkel US Operations Corporation for Henkel Corporation (Cunningham, Troy) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
June 8, 2023 Filing 103 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Cable Corporation (Garcia, Daniel) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
June 8, 2023 Filing 102 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Meritor, Inc. (Garcia, Daniel) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
June 8, 2023 Filing 101 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dexter Hysol Aerospace, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Henkel US Operations Corporation, Other Affiliate Henkel of America, Inc., Other Affiliate Henkel AG & Co. KGaA, Other Affiliate Henkel of America I LLC for Dexter Hysol Aerospace, LLC (Cunningham, Troy) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
June 8, 2023 Filing 100 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Specialty Cable Corp. (Garcia, Daniel) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
June 8, 2023 Filing 99 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Dexter Hysol Aerospace, LLC. Attorney Troy Patrick Cunningham added to party Dexter Hysol Aerospace, LLC(pty:dft). (Cunningham, Troy) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
June 8, 2023 Filing 98 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Specialty Cable Corp.. Attorney Ari Chaim Shapiro added to party Specialty Cable Corp.(pty:dft). (Shapiro, Ari) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
June 8, 2023 Filing 97 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Meritor, Inc.. Attorney Ari Chaim Shapiro added to party Meritor, Inc. (pty:dft). (Shapiro, Ari) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
June 8, 2023 Filing 96 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Henkel Corporation. Attorney Troy Patrick Cunningham added to party Henkel Corporation(pty:dft). (Cunningham, Troy) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
June 8, 2023 Filing 95 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by General Dynamics Corporation. (Shapiro, Ari) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
June 8, 2023 Filing 94 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by General Cable Corporation. Attorney Ari Chaim Shapiro added to party General Cable Corporation(pty:dft). (Shapiro, Ari) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
June 8, 2023 Filing 93 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Rockwell Automation, Inc.. (Cachaldora, Amanda) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
June 8, 2023 Filing 92 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melanie Erica Chung-Tims on behalf of Rockwell Automation, Inc. (Chung-Tims, Melanie) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
June 8, 2023 Filing 91 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Bell Textron, Inc.. (Coxhead, Stephen) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
June 8, 2023 Filing 90 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company. (Melaragno, Peter) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
June 8, 2023 Filing 89 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by BASF Corporation. (Jackson-Fannin, Julian) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
June 8, 2023 Filing 88 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by BASF Catalysts LLC. (Jackson-Fannin, Julian) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
June 8, 2023 Filing 87 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Eaton Aeroquip LLC. (Melaragno, Peter) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
June 8, 2023 Filing 86 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by IMO Industries Inc.. (Melaragno, Peter) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
June 8, 2023 Filing 85 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Northrop Grumman Corporation. (Melaragno, Peter) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
June 8, 2023 Filing 84 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Lockheed Martin Corporation. Attorney Dino Gale Galardi added to party Lockheed Martin Corporation(pty:dft). (Galardi, Dino) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
June 8, 2023 Filing 83 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Premix Marbletite Manufacturing Co.. (Galardi, Dino) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
June 7, 2023 Filing 82 Joint MOTION Motion to Dismiss Teledyne Technologies Inc without prejudice by Teledyne Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Dismiss Teledyne Technologies Inc without prejudice)(Andersen, Donald) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
June 7, 2023 Filing 81 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by SHELL USA INC. identifying Corporate Parent Royal Dutch Shell plc, Corporate Parent Shell Petroleum Inc., Corporate Parent Shell Petroleum N.V. for SHELL USA INC. (McCutcheon, Caitlyn) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
June 7, 2023 Filing 80 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Caitlyn R. McCutcheon on behalf of SHELL USA INC. (McCutcheon, Caitlyn) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
June 7, 2023 Filing 79 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by SHELL USA INC.. Attorney Caitlyn R. McCutcheon added to party SHELL USA INC.(pty:dft). (McCutcheon, Caitlyn) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
June 1, 2023 Filing 78 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Eaton Aeroquip LLC (Melaragno, Peter) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
June 1, 2023 Filing 77 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eaton Aeroquip LLC identifying Other Affiliate Eaton Corporation plc (Ireland) for Eaton Aeroquip LLC (Melaragno, Peter) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 31, 2023 Filing 76 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by DCO, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Enstar Holdings, Inc. for DCO, LLC (Lopez, Frances) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 30, 2023 Filing 75 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melanie Erica Chung-Tims on behalf of Rockwell Automation, Inc.. Attorney Melanie Erica Chung-Tims added to party Rockwell Automation, Inc.(pty:dft). (Chung-Tims, Melanie) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 30, 2023 Filing 74 Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement Rockwell Automation, Inc. is a publicly owned company. Rockwell has no parent corporation. No publicly owned company owns 10% or more of Rockwell. Rockwell does not own 10% or more of any publicly owned company. by Rockwell Automation, Inc. (Cachaldora, Amanda) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 30, 2023 Filing 73 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amanda Rae Cachaldora on behalf of Rockwell Automation, Inc.. Attorney Amanda Rae Cachaldora added to party Rockwell Automation, Inc.(pty:dft). (Cachaldora, Amanda) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 18, 2023 Filing 72 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Lockheed Martin Corporation (Melaragno, Peter) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 18, 2023 Filing 71 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lockheed Martin Corporation identifying Other Affiliate State Street Coporation for Lockheed Martin Corporation (Melaragno, Peter) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 18, 2023 Filing 70 NOTICE by Lockheed Martin Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), Notice of Joinder in Removal of Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint) (Melaragno, Peter) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 18, 2023 Filing 69 Pneumo Abex LLC's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Pneumo Abex, LLC. (Sturge, Clarke) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 18, 2023 Filing 68 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Dynamics Corporation (Shapiro, Ari) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 18, 2023 Filing 67 NOTICE by General Dynamics Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), . Attorney Ari Chaim Shapiro added to party General Dynamics Corporation(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Shapiro, Ari) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 18, 2023 Filing 66 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Pneumo Abex, LLC (Sturge, Clarke) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 17, 2023 Filing 65 Clerk's Notice to Filer re #64 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (Pneumo Abex Asbestos Claims Settlement Trust not added by attorney) (drz) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 17, 2023 Filing 64 Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interested Persons by Pneumo Abex, LLC (Sturge, Clarke) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 17, 2023 Filing 63 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Northrop Grumman Corporation (Melaragno, Peter) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 17, 2023 Filing 62 Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interested Persons by Northrop Grumman Corporation (Melaragno, Peter) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 17, 2023 Filing 61 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Henry Salas on behalf of Pneumo Abex, LLC. Attorney Henry Salas added to party Pneumo Abex, LLC(pty:dft). (Salas, Henry) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 17, 2023 Filing 60 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Clarke Scott Sturge on behalf of Pneumo Abex, LLC. Attorney Clarke Scott Sturge added to party Pneumo Abex, LLC(pty:dft). (Sturge, Clarke) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 17, 2023 Filing 59 NOTICE by Northrop Grumman Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), Notice of Removal and Joinder in the Notice of Removal of Raytheon Technology Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint) (Melaragno, Peter) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 17, 2023 Filing 58 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Raytheon Technologies Corporation. (Reddin, John) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 16, 2023 Filing 57 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Schneider Electric USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Schneider Electric Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Schneider Electric Industries SAS, Corporate Parent Schneider Electric Industries SAS, Corporate Parent Schneider Electric Holding Amerique du Nord, Corporate Parent Schneider Electric SE for Schneider Electric USA, Inc. (Mason, W.) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 16, 2023 Filing 56 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by Schneider Electric USA, Inc.. (Mason, W.) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 16, 2023 Filing 55 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by W. Scott Mason on behalf of Schneider Electric USA, Inc.. Attorney W. Scott Mason added to party Schneider Electric USA, Inc.(pty:dft). (Mason, W.) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 16, 2023 Filing 54 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by GENERAL ELECTRIC CORPORATION (Dardis, Erin) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 15, 2023 Filing 53 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company identifying Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc., Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group for The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company (Briscoe, Edward) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 15, 2023 Filing 52 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company (Briscoe, Edward) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 12, 2023 Filing 51 NOTICE by Teledyne Technologies Incorporated Joinder of Teledyne Technologies Incorporated in Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State Court pleadings served on Teledyne Technologies Incorporated) (Andersen, Donald) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 12, 2023 Filing 50 The Boeing Company's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Boeing Company, The. (Pazos, Lucia) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 12, 2023 Filing 49 NOTICE by Boeing Company, The re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), Joinder in Removal and Independent Bases for Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Boeing Joinder in Removal - Summons and Complaint) (Pazos, Lucia) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 12, 2023 Filing 48 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by GENERAL ELECTRIC CORPORATION identifying Other Affiliate GE Power India Limited, Other Affiliate GE T&D India Limited, Other Affiliate AerCap Holdings N.V., Other Affiliate China XD Electric Co. Ltd. for GENERAL ELECTRIC CORPORATION (Dardis, Erin) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 12, 2023 Filing 47 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by BELL TEXTRON, INC. (Coxhead, Stephen) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 11, 2023 Filing 46 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Donald Ross Andersen on behalf of Teledyne Technologies Incorporated (Andersen, Donald) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Defendants Teledyne Technologies Incorporated's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. #41 . Therein, Defendant requests until May 31, 2023 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Id. at 2. Yet the Court has already ruled that "[a]ll Defendants in this action shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before June 8, 2023." (ECF No. 17). Accordingly, UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion #41 is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 5/11/2023. (fpi) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 11, 2023 Filing 44 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brianna Elizabeth Donet on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation. Attorney Brianna Elizabeth Donet added to party Union Carbide Corporation(pty:dft). (Donet, Brianna) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 11, 2023 Filing 43 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Honeywell International Inc. (Ferguson, Timothy) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 11, 2023 Filing 42 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Honeywell International Inc.. (Ferguson, Timothy) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 11, 2023 Filing 41 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by Teledyne Technologies Incorporated. Attorney Donald Ross Andersen added to party Teledyne Technologies Incorporated(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Teledyne Technologies Incorporated's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time To Move Answer or Respond to Complaint)(Andersen, Donald) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 11, 2023 Filing 40 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Union Carbide Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Dow Chemical Company for Union Carbide Corporation (Drumm, Ashley) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 11, 2023 Filing 39 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Union Carbide Corporation. (Drumm, Ashley) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 11, 2023 Filing 38 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ashley Christina Pears Drumm on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation. Attorney Ashley Christina Pears Drumm added to party Union Carbide Corporation(pty:dft). (Drumm, Ashley) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 11, 2023 Filing 37 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Julian Antony Jackson-Fannin on behalf of BASF Catalysts LLC, BASF Corporation. Attorney Julian Antony Jackson-Fannin added to party BASF Catalysts LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Julian Antony Jackson-Fannin added to party BASF Corporation(pty:dft). (Jackson-Fannin, Julian) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 11, 2023 Filing 36 General Electric Company's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by GENERAL ELECTRIC CORPORATION. (Dardis, Erin) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 11, 2023 Filing 35 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Erin E. Dardis on behalf of GENERAL ELECTRIC CORPORATION. Attorney Erin E. Dardis added to party GENERAL ELECTRIC CORPORATION(pty:dft). (Dardis, Erin) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 10, 2023 Filing 34 NOTICE by BELL TEXTRON, INC. OF JOINDER IN RAYTHEON TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION'S REMOVAL AND INDEPENDENT BASIS FOR NOTICE OF REMOVAL. Attorney Stephen Fraser Coxhead added to party BELL TEXTRON, INC.(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Coxhead, Stephen) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 10, 2023 Filing 33 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Timothy John Ferguson on behalf of Honeywell International Inc.. Attorney Timothy John Ferguson added to party Honeywell International Inc.(pty:dft). (Ferguson, Timothy) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 10, 2023 Filing 32 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Premix Marbletite Manufacturing Co. (Briscoe, Edward) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 10, 2023 Filing 31 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Premix Marbletite Manufacturing Co. identifying Corporate Parent Imperial Industries, Inc. for Premix Marbletite Manufacturing Co. (Briscoe, Edward) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 10, 2023 Filing 30 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Bowersox Green on behalf of Edwin G. Cowdin III. Attorney Jennifer Bowersox Green added to party Edwin G. Cowdin III(pty:pla). (Green, Jennifer) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 10, 2023 Filing 29 Parker-Hannifin Corporation ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Parker-Hannifan Corporation. (Cachaldora, Amanda) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 10, 2023 Filing 28 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melanie Erica Chung-Tims on behalf of Parker-Hannifan Corporation. Attorney Melanie Erica Chung-Tims added to party Parker-Hannifan Corporation(pty:dft). (Chung-Tims, Melanie) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 9, 2023 Filing 27 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher J. M. Collings on behalf of GENERAL ELECTRIC CORPORATION. Attorney Christopher J. M. Collings added to party GENERAL ELECTRIC CORPORATION(pty:dft). (Collings, Christopher) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 9, 2023 Filing 26 Initial Disclosure(s) by Raytheon Technologies Corporation (Reddin, John) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 9, 2023 Filing 25 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by IMO Industries Inc. (Briscoe, Edward) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 9, 2023 Filing 24 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by IMO Industries Inc. identifying Corporate Parent ESAB Corporation for IMO Industries Inc. (Briscoe, Edward) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 9, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Frances Lopez on behalf of DCO, LLC. Attorney Frances Lopez added to party DCO, LLC(pty:dft). (Lopez, Frances) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 9, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter J. Melaragno on behalf of Eaton Aeroquip LLC. Attorney Peter J. Melaragno added to party Eaton Aeroquip LLC(pty:dft). (Melaragno, Peter) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 9, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter J. Melaragno on behalf of IMO Industries Inc.. Attorney Peter J. Melaragno added to party IMO Industries Inc.(pty:dft). (Melaragno, Peter) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 9, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter J. Melaragno on behalf of Lockheed Martin Corporation. Attorney Peter J. Melaragno added to party Lockheed Martin Corporation(pty:dft). (Melaragno, Peter) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 9, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter J. Melaragno on behalf of Northrop Grumman Corporation. Attorney Peter J. Melaragno added to party Northrop Grumman Corporation(pty:dft). (Melaragno, Peter) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 9, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter J. Melaragno on behalf of Premix Marbletite Manufacturing Co.. Attorney Peter J. Melaragno added to party Premix Marbletite Manufacturing Co.(pty:dft). (Melaragno, Peter) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Defendants BASF Catalysts LLC and BASF Corporation's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. #14 . UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion #14 is GRANTED. All Defendants in this action shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #1 on or before June 8, 2023. Counsel are reminded to file documents on the CM/ECF system using the correct nomenclature. A review of the docket reveals several general "notices," most of which are filings which could be more accurately described through the functions provided by CM/ECF. Counsel need not change what has already been filed. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 5/9/2023. (fpi) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 9, 2023 Filing 16 Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement (a) Is said party a parent, subsidiary or other affiliate of a publicly owned corporation? No. (b) Does any publicly held corporation own 10% or more of the partys stock? No. (c) Is there a publicly owned corporation, not a party to the case, which has a financial interest in the outcome? No. by Parker-Hannifan Corporation (Cachaldora, Amanda) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 9, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lucia V. Pazos on behalf of Boeing Company, The. Attorney Lucia V. Pazos added to party Boeing Company, The(pty:dft). (Pazos, Lucia) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 9, 2023 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by BASF Catalysts LLC, BASF Corporation. Attorney J Trumon Phillips added to party BASF Catalysts LLC(pty:dft), Attorney J Trumon Phillips added to party BASF Corporation(pty:dft). Responses due by 5/23/2023 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Phillips, J) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 9, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dino Gale Galardi on behalf of Premix Marbletite Manufacturing Co.. Attorney Dino Gale Galardi added to party Premix Marbletite Manufacturing Co.(pty:dft). (Galardi, Dino) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 9, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward Joy Briscoe on behalf of IMO Industries Inc.. Attorney Edward Joy Briscoe added to party IMO Industries Inc.(pty:dft). (Briscoe, Edward) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 9, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward Joy Briscoe on behalf of Lockheed Martin Corporation. Attorney Edward Joy Briscoe added to party Lockheed Martin Corporation(pty:dft). (Briscoe, Edward) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 9, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward Joy Briscoe on behalf of Premix Marbletite Manufacturing Co.. Attorney Edward Joy Briscoe added to party Premix Marbletite Manufacturing Co.(pty:dft). (Briscoe, Edward) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 9, 2023 Set/Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline per order DE#17: BASF Catalysts LLC response/answer due 6/8/2023; BASF Corporation response/answer due 6/8/2023. (drz) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 8, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amanda Rae Cachaldora on behalf of Parker-Hannifan Corporation. Attorney Amanda Rae Cachaldora added to party Parker-Hannifan Corporation(pty:dft). (Cachaldora, Amanda) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 8, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward Joy Briscoe on behalf of The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company. Attorney Edward Joy Briscoe added to party The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company(pty:dft). (Briscoe, Edward) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 8, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter J. Melaragno on behalf of The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company. Attorney Peter J. Melaragno added to party The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company(pty:dft). (Melaragno, Peter) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 8, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stuart L. Cohen on behalf of Raytheon Technologies Corporation (Cohen, Stuart) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 8, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Charles Reddin on behalf of Raytheon Technologies Corporation (Reddin, John) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PAPERLESS ORDER REFERRING PRETRIAL DISCOVERY MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE LAUREN F. LOUIS. PURSUANT to 28 U.S.C. 636 and the Magistrate Judge Rules of the Local Rules of the Southern District of Florida, the above-captioned Cause is referred to United States Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis to take all necessary and proper action as required by law with respect to any and all pretrial discovery matters. Any motion affecting deadlines set by the Court's Scheduling Order is excluded from this referral, unless specifically referred by separate Order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall comply with Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis's discovery procedures. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 5/8/2023. (fpi) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PAPERLESS PRETRIAL ORDER. THIS ORDER has been entered upon the filing of a Notice of Removal. Counsel for the removing party is hereby ORDERED to forward a copy of this Order to all other parties. It is further ORDERED that S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1 shall apply to this case and the parties shall hold a scheduling conference within twenty (20) days of the date of this Order. Within ten (10) days of the scheduling conference, counsel shall file a Joint Scheduling Report. The report shall indicate the proposed month and year for the trial and the estimated number of days required for trial. The scheduling conference may be held via telephone. At the conference, the parties shall comply with the following agenda that the Court adopts from S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1: (1) Documents (S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.B.1 and 2) The parties shall determine the procedure for exchanging a copy of, or a description by category and location of, all documents and other evidence that is reasonably available and that a party expects to offer, or may offer, if the need arises. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(B). (A) Documents include computations of the nature and extent of any category of damages claimed by the disclosing party unless the computations are privileged or otherwise protected from disclosure. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(C). (B) Documents include insurance agreements which may be at issue with the satisfaction of the judgment. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(D). (2) List of Witnesses - The parties shall exchange the name, address, and telephone number of each individual known to have knowledge of the facts supporting the material allegations of the pleading filed by the party. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(A). The parties have a continuing obligation to disclose this information. (3) Discussions and Deadlines (S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.B.2) - The parties shall discuss the nature and basis of their claims and defenses and the possibility of a prompt settlement or resolution of the case. Failure to comply with this Order or to exchange the information listed above may result in sanctions and/or the exclusion of documents or witnesses at the time of trial. S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.I. Failure of counsel to file a joint scheduling report may result in remand or dismissal, default, and the imposition of other sanctions including attorney's fees and costs. The filing of a motion to dismiss, or other motion, does not toll the time for filing a joint scheduling report. Counsel for the non-removing party must file a motion to remand the case on the basis of any defect other than lack of subject matter jurisdiction within thirty (30) days after the filing of the Notice of Removal. The parties are hereby on notice that this Court requires all filings to be formatted in 12 point Times New Roman font and double spaced, including any footnotes, with one inch margins on all sides. Failure to follow these formatting guidelines may result in the filing being stricken, any opposing filing being granted by default, and the imposition of other sanctions, including attorney's fees and costs. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. The parties shall seek extensions of time in a timely fashion. "A motion for extension of time is not self-executing.... Yet, by filing these motions on or near the last day, and then sitting idle pending the Court's disposition of the motion, parties essentially grant their own motion. The Court will not condone this." Compere v. Nusret Miami, LLC, 2020 WL 2844888, at *2 (S.D. Fla. May 7, 2020) (internal citations omitted). Pursuant to Administrative Order 2016-70 of the Southern District of Florida and consistent with the Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit's Local Rules and Internal Operating Procedures, within three (3) days of the conclusion of a trial or other proceeding, parties must file via CM/ECF electronic versions of documentary exhibits admitted into evidence, including photographs of non-documentary physical exhibits. The Parties are directed to comply with each of the requirements set forth in Administrative Order 2016-70 unless directed otherwise by the Court. Telephonic appearances are not permitted for any purpose. Upon reaching a settlement in this matter the parties are instructed to notify the Court by telephone and to file a Notice of Settlement within twenty-four (24) hours. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 5/8/2023. (fpi) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 5, 2023 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge K. Michael Moore. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (pc) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]
May 5, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Cowdin, Edwin) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16597215, filed by Raytheon Technologies Corporation f/k/a United Technologies Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Reddin, John) (complaint see pg. 11 of Exh A, Answer see pg. 126 of Exh. A, no Motion to Dismiss filed) Modified text on 5/8/2023 (pc). [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/16/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COWDIN III v. BASF CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWIN G. COWDIN III
Represented By: JENNIFER BOWERSOX GREEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF CATALYSTS LLC
Represented By: JULIAN ANTONY JACKSON-FANNIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF CORPORATION
Represented By: JULIAN ANTONY JACKSON-FANNIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BELL TEXTRON, INC.
Represented By: STEPHEN FRASER COXHEAD
Represented By: ADAM H DOERINGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOEING COMPANY, THE
Represented By: LOREN YAEL YUDOVICH
Represented By: LUCIA VERONICA PAZOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DCO, LLC
Represented By: EVELYN FLETCHER DAVIS
Represented By: FRANCES LOPEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEXTER HYSOL AEROSPACE, LLC
Represented By: TROY P CUNNINGHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EATON AEROQUIP LLC
Represented By: PETER J MELARAGNO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL CABLE CORPORATION
Represented By: DANIEL ALBERTO GARCIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL DYNAMICS CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC CORPORATION
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER JM COLLINGS
Represented By: ERIN ELIZABETH DARDIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE GOODYEAR TIRE AND RUBBER COMPANY
Represented By: EDWARD J BRISCOE
Represented By: PETER J MELARAGNO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HENKEL CORPORATION
Represented By: TROY P CUNNINGHAM
Represented By: KARI H HALBROOK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC
Represented By: TIMOTHY JOHN FERGUSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO INDUSTRIES INC
Represented By: EDWARD J BRISCOE
Represented By: PETER J MELARAGNO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOCKHEED MARTIN CORPORATION
Represented By: EDWARD J BRISCOE
Represented By: DINO GALE GALARDI
Represented By: CARSON ELAINE PROCTOR
Represented By: DAVID C REEVES
Represented By: JAMES FRANCES MOSELEY, JR
Represented By: SCOTT ALLEN KOSSOUDJI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERITOR, INC.
Represented By: DANIEL ALBERTO GARCIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTHROP GRUMMAN CORPORATION
Represented By: PETER J MELARAGNO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PARAMOUNT GLOBAL
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER JM COLLINGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PARKER-HANNIFAN CORPORATION
Represented By: AMANDA RAE CACHALDORA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNEUMO ABEX LLC
Represented By: CLARKE S STURGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PREMIX MARBLETITE MANUFACTURING CO.
Represented By: EDWARD J BRISCOE
Represented By: DINO GALE GALARDI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAYTHEON TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION
Represented By: STUART LANCE COHEN
Represented By: JOHN CHARLES REDDIN
Represented By: MONICA L IREL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROCKWELL AUTOMATION, INC.
Represented By: AMANDA RAE CACHALDORA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC.
Represented By: W SCOTT MASON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHELL USA INC.
Represented By: CAITLYN MCCUTCHEON
Represented By: DAVID W MARSTON, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPECIALTY CABLE CORP.
Represented By: DANIEL ALBERTO GARCIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TELEDYNE TECHNOLOGIES INCORPORATED
Represented By: DONALD ROSS ANDERSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION
Represented By: BRIANNA ELIZABETH DONET
Represented By: ASHLEY DRUMM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WYETH HOLDINGS LLC
Represented By: AMANDA RAE CACHALDORA
Represented By: JOHN R LAWLESS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER JM COLLINGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?