U.S. BANK TRUST COMPANY, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE FOR VELOCITY COMMERCIAL CAPITAL LOAN TRUST 2023-2 v. MYERS
Plaintiff: U.S. BANK TRUST COMPANY, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE FOR VELOCITY COMMERCIAL CAPITAL LOAN TRUST 2023-2
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER J. MYERS
Case Number: 3:2023cv24668
Filed: October 31, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 191 Bank Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2023 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #6 Order. (Response to Motion not filed). (mb)
November 20, 2023 Set Deadlines/Hearings re #9 Affidavit of Service. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 11/29/2023). (alb)
November 20, 2023 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summons, Motion for Ex Parte Appointment of Receiver served on Christopher J. Myers on 11/08/2023, filed by U.S. BANK TRUST COMPANY, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE FOR VELOCITY COMMERCIAL CAPITAL LOAN TRUST 2023-2. (PRENDERGAST, ZACHARY)
November 7, 2023 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to CHRISTOPHER J MYERS. (mb)
November 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. The Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, ECF No. #4 , is GRANTED. Attorney Zachary D. Prendergast, is admitted pro hac vice to represent Plaintiff, pursuant to Local Rule 11.1(C). (Appointed ZACHARY DAVID PRENDERGAST for U.S. BANK TRUST COMPANY, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE FOR VELOCITY COMMERCIAL CAPITAL LOAN TRUST 2023-2). Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 11/7/2023. (mb)
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. U.S. Bank's Motion for Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, ECF No. #3 , is DENIED. U.S. Bank's Motion for Ex Parte Appointment of Receiver, ECF No. #2 , is DENIED insofar as appointment without notice is requested and DEFERRED on the merits until Defendant has been served and given an opportunity to respond. Plaintiff U.S. Bank is directed to serve Defendant Christopher J. Myers with a summons, the Complaint, and the Motion for Appointment of a Receiver. Defendant's responses to the Complaint, ECF No. #1 , and the pending motion, ECF No. #2 , are due within 21 (twenty-one) days after being served. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response to MOTION not filed earlier: 11/21/2023).) Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 11/6/2023. (mb)
November 3, 2023 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (ROBBINS, FREDRIC)
November 1, 2023 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2 Ex Parte MOTION to Appoint Receiver, #3 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Ex Parte MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Zachary D. Prendergast. (Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-8351325.) (mb)
October 31, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Zachary D. Prendergast.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-8351325.) by U.S. BANK TRUST COMPANY, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE FOR VELOCITY COMMERCIAL CAPITAL LOAN TRUST 2023-2. (PRENDERGAST, ZACHARY)
October 31, 2023 Filing 3 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Ex Parte MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by U.S. BANK TRUST COMPANY, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE FOR VELOCITY COMMERCIAL CAPITAL LOAN TRUST 2023-2. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2) (ROBBINS, FREDRIC)
October 31, 2023 Filing 2 Ex Parte MOTION to Appoint Receiver by U.S. BANK TRUST COMPANY, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE FOR VELOCITY COMMERCIAL CAPITAL LOAN TRUST 2023-2. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4) (ROBBINS, FREDRIC)
October 31, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ON PROMISSORY NOTE, FOR FORECLOSURE, FOR APPOINTMENT OF A RECEIVER, AND FOR OTHER RELIEF against CHRISTOPHER J. MYERS ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-8351025.), filed by U.S. BANK TRUST COMPANY, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE FOR VELOCITY COMMERCIAL CAPITAL LOAN TRUST 2023-2. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons) (ROBBINS, FREDRIC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. BANK TRUST COMPANY, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE FOR VELOCITY COMMERCIAL CAPITAL LOAN TRUST 2023-2 v. MYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. BANK TRUST COMPANY, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE FOR VELOCITY COMMERCIAL CAPITAL LOAN TRUST 2023-2
Represented By: ZACHARY DAVID PRENDERGAST
Represented By: FREDRIC JOSEPH ROBBINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER J. MYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?