MIMS v. SANOFI US SERVICES INC et al
Plaintiff: DOROTHY MIMS
Defendant: SANOFI US SERVICES INC, SANOFI-AVENTIS US LLC doing business as WINTHROP U S and SANOFI-AVENTIS US INC
Case Number: 3:2023cv24723
Filed: November 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
2 Judge: T KENT WETHERELL
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER. Science Day is scheduled for 2/28/2024 beginning at 08:00 AM in U.S. Courthouse Pensacola before JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS. (SEE FULL ORDER) Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 01/23/24. (jfj)
January 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying #18 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/19/2024. (ss)
January 19, 2024 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by SANOFI US SERVICES INC, SANOFI-AVENTIS US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (GUTHRIE, BRIAN)
January 19, 2024 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #21 Response in Opposition to #18 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint. (alb)
January 16, 2024 Filing 20 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by DOROTHY MIMS. (ELLIOTT, J)
January 16, 2024 Filing 19 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re #18 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by DOROTHY MIMS. "Counsel is directed to re-file doc # 18-1 as a separate pleading pursuant to Local Rule 15.1. ""When leave is sought to amend a pleading pursuant to a motion, the motion and the proposed amended pleading shall each be filed and docketed separately. The proposed amended pleading shall not take effect unless and until the motion to amend is granted""." (alb)
January 16, 2024 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #20 Amended Complaint, #18 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint (alb)
January 12, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by DOROTHY MIMS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8-1 to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8-2 to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 9 to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 10 to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 11 to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 12 to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 13 to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 14 to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 15 to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 16 to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 17 to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint) (ELLIOTT, J)
December 29, 2023 Filing 17 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. (alb)
December 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER Re: #14 Status Report. Discovery due by 8/8/2024. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 8/22/2024. Jury Trial set for 10/21/2024 09:00 AM before JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS. Mediation to take place by 9/1/2024.. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 12/29/2023. (alb)
December 22, 2023 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS: Joint Status Conference held on 12/22/2023. Attendance of counsel in person and via Zoom. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Donna Boland.) (blr)
December 21, 2023 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #14 Status Report. (alb)
December 20, 2023 Filing 14 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by SANOFI US SERVICES INC, SANOFI-AVENTIS US LLC. (SEARS, CONNOR)
December 12, 2023 Filing 13 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Bachus and Schanker LLC Re: #10 NOTICE REGARDING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE, mailed to attorneys: Darin L. Schanker at Bachus & Schanker, LLC, 1899 Wynkoop St. #700, Denver, CO 80202. (Attachments: #1 Christopher Elliott, #2 Kyle Bachus) (alb) Modified on 12/13/2023 Clerk notified attorneys via phone. Clerk also notified attorneys via ad hoc at attorneys assistants request. (alb).
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. A joint status conference will be held in both cases on December 22, 2023 at 10:30 a.m. CST. All counsel of record for both sides in both cases must attend the conference either in person or by Zoom. By December 20, 2023, the parties must file a joint report on the two individual dockets addressing the below topics. A single report, organized by case for plaintiff specific information, is preferable. (Please see order.) Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 12/5/2023. ( Joint Report due by 12/20/2023. Status Conference set for 12/22/2023 10:30 AM in U.S. Courthouse Pensacola before JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS.) (alb)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF RECUSAL. JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II recused. Case reassigned to JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS for all further proceedings. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 11/28/2023. (alb)
November 28, 2023 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #11 Order of Recusal. (alb)
November 27, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE REGARDING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE, mailed to attorneys: J. Kyle Bachus, Darin L. Schanker & J. Christopher Elliott at Bachus & Schanker, LLC, 1899 Wynkoop St. #700, Denver, CO 80202 (alb) (Main Document 10 replaced on 11/27/2023 with signature) (alb).
November 27, 2023 Filing 9 Case electronically transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-01791. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TRANSFER ORDER-Case transferred to Northern District of Florida. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/23/2023. (MDL 2740, Doc. 16511)(go) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/27/2023.]
September 26, 2023 Filing 7 Joint Designation of Record for MDL Transfer by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Joint Designation of General and Case-Specified MDL Records to Be Included Upon Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(McRae, Christopher) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/27/2023.]
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance.(ADI) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/27/2023.]
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt.(ADI) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/27/2023.]
March 2, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (aj) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/27/2023.]
March 2, 2018 Filing 3 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Civil Cover sheet and Summons. The pdf should not have the green header nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. (aj) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/27/2023.]
February 21, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/27/2023.]
February 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6671310) filed by Dorothy Mims. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)Attorney Darin Lee Schanker added to party Dorothy Mims(pty:pla).(Schanker, Darin) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/2/2018) (aj). (Attachment 2 replaced on 3/2/2018) (aj). (Attachment 3 replaced on 3/2/2018) (aj). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/27/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MIMS v. SANOFI US SERVICES INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI US SERVICES INC
Represented By: CONNOR JAY SEARS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI-AVENTIS US LLC doing business as WINTHROP U S
Represented By: CONNOR JAY SEARS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI-AVENTIS US INC
Represented By: CONNOR JAY SEARS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOROTHY MIMS
Represented By: J CHRISTOPHER ELLIOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?