JORDAN v. OAKES et al
Plaintiff: JOHNNIE LEE JORDAN, JR
Defendant: B OAKES, SUSAN DOVE and KENNY MATELESKA
Case Number: 3:2023cv24730
Filed: November 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: LACEY A COLLIER
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2024 Filing 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION #9 Amended Complaint. Accordingly, it is RECOMMENDED: That Plaintiff's "Motion to Address the Honorable Court," Doc. #8 , be DENIED. That this case be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii) due to Plaintiff's failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted. That the clerk close the file. (Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 2/21/2024.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 1/24/2024. (jcw)
January 16, 2024 Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against B OAKES, filed by JOHNNIE LEE JORDAN, JR. (No service copies filed.) (jcw)
January 16, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION TO ADDRESS THE HONORABLE COURT by JOHNNIE LEE JORDAN, JR. (jcw)
January 16, 2024 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #8 MOTION TO ADDRESS THE HONORABLE COURT, #9 Amended Complaint. Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (jcw)
December 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Plaintiff's motion for extension of time, Doc. #6 , is GRANTED to the extent he shall have until 2/1/2024, to comply with the Court's December 11, 2023 Order, Doc. #5 , which directed him to file a typed or clearly written amended complaint that complies with the instructions on the complaint form. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 12/27/2023. (jcw)
December 21, 2023 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #6 MOTION for Extension of Time as to #5 Order. Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (jcw)
December 20, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time as to #5 Order by JOHNNIE LEE JORDAN, JR. (jcw)
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #1 Complaint. The clerk shall send Plaintiff a civil rights complaint form for use by prisoners in actions under 42 U.S.C. 1983. This case number and "Amended Complaint" should be written on the form. Within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall file either a notice of voluntary dismissal or an amended complaint. If Plaintiff files an amended complaint, it must be typed or clearly written and submitted on the Court form as instructed above. (Amended complaint due by 1/2/2024.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 12/11/2023. (jcw)(Form sent as ordered.)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The clerk shall mail a copy of this order with the appropriate cover letter to: The Department of Corrections, 501 South Calhoun Street, Tallahassee, Florida 32399-2500, Attention: Agency Clerk. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 12/4/2023. (jcw)(cc: FDOC)
December 1, 2023 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se (jcw)
December 1, 2023 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (jcw)
November 30, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JOHNNIE LEE JORDAN, JR. (jcw)
November 30, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SUSAN DOVE, KENNY MATELESKA, B OAKES, filed by JOHNNIE LEE JORDAN, JR. (Filing fee was not paid. No service copies filed.) (jcw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JORDAN v. OAKES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHNNIE LEE JORDAN, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B OAKES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUSAN DOVE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNY MATELESKA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?