JACKSON v. DOSEK et al
Plaintiff: CHARLIE JACKSON
Defendant: DOSEK, MICHOT, GUNNS, ENGLISH and DIXON
Case Number: 3:2023cv24733
Filed: December 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. Plaintiff shall have fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order to show cause why this case should not be dismissed due to his failure to comply with the Court's December 28 Order. Doc. #6 . The Court will discharge this Order to show cause if, within fourteen (14) days, Plaintiff pays the $25.33 initial partial filing fee. Plaintiff shall notify the Court of any changes to his address within seven (7) days of the change by filing a notice of change of address. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this Order will result in a recommendation that this case be dismissed. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 01/24/24. (Show Cause Response due by 2/7/2024.) (jfj)
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. This Order corrects Plaintiff's inmate number and directs the FDOC to remit payments to the Court as they become available until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. As funds become available in Plaintiff's inmate account, Plaintiff is required to make monthly payments of twenty (20) percent of the preceding month's income (that is, all funds deposited into his account) in each case he has filed in this Court. The agency having custody of Plaintiff shall forward payments from Plaintiff's account to the clerk on a monthly basis each time the amount in the account exceeds $10.00. These payments shall continue until the filing fee of $350.00 is paid in full in each case The clerk shall mail a copy of this order with the appropriate cover letter to the Department of Corrections. The Agency Clerk should note that Plaintiff's inmate number is S14168. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 01/23/24. (Documents mailed as directed.) (jfj)
January 22, 2024 Filing 7 Notice to the Court regarding #6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Order, #2 Clerks Letter.) (alb)
January 22, 2024 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #7 Notice to the Court Regarding the #6 Order. (alb)
January 19, 2024 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (No fee or form received.) (alb)
December 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Within twenty-one days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall pay the clerk an initial partial filing fee of $25.33. The clerk shall mail a copy of this order with the appropriate cover letter to: The Department of Corrections, 501 South Calhoun Street, Tallahassee, Florida 32399-2500, Attention: Agency Clerk. The Agency Clerk should note that Plaintiffs inmate number is R53635. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 12/28/2023.(Fee due by 1/18/2024.) (Order and letter mailed.) (alb)
December 27, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (only includes Prisoner Consent Form and Financial Certificate), by CHARLIE JACKSON. (alb)
December 27, 2023 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Consent Form and Financial Certificate portion only), #4 Amended Complaint. Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (alb)
December 26, 2023 Filing 4 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against DOSEK, GUNNS, MICHOT, filed by CHARLIE JACKSON. (No service copies.) (alb)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. The clerk shall send Plaintiff a complete set of the forms needed for a prisoner to file an application for in forma pauperis status. This case number should be written on the forms. Within twenty-one from the date of this order, Plaintiff shall either file a complete motion to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the $402.00 filing fee. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 12/5/2023. ( Fee or form due by 12/26/2023.) (Order and form mailed.) (alb)
December 4, 2023 Filing 2 Notice to Pro Se Litigant. (alb)
December 4, 2023 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint. (alb)
December 1, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DIXON, DOSEK, ENGLISH, GUNNS, MICHOT, filed by CHARLIE JACKSON. (No service copies, no IFP motion or fee received.) (alb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JACKSON v. DOSEK et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLIE JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOSEK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHOT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GUNNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENGLISH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIXON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?