ARCHIE v. ACEVEDO et al
Plaintiff: ERNEST LEE ARCHIE, JR
Defendant: JELO ACEVEDO and CHIP SIMMONS
Case Number: 3:2024cv00008
Filed: January 4, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff shall have fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order to show cause why this case should not be dismissed due to his failure to comply with the Court's February 2 Order. The Court will discharge this Order to show cause if, within fourteen (14) days, Plaintiff pays the $39.05 initial partial filing fee. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 2/29/2024. Show Cause Response due by 3/14/2024. (mb)
February 28, 2024 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #6 Fee due by 2/23/2024. (Fee not received). (mb)
February 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, Docs. #2 & #5 , is GRANTED to the extent this case may proceed without prepayment of the entire filing fee. Within twenty-one days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall pay the clerk an initial partial filing fee of $39.05. The clerk shall mail a copy of this order with the appropriate cover letter to: The Escambia County Jail, Finance Department, 6400 North W Street, Pensacola, Florida 32505, Attention Administrator of Inmate Accounts. The Administrator should note that Plaintiffs inmate number is 9980361337. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 02/02/2024. ( Fee due by 2/23/2024.) (alb) Modified on 2/2/2024 Order and letter mailed to facility (alb).
January 31, 2024 Filing 5 PRISONER CONSENT & FINANCIAL CERTIFICATE re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by ERNEST LEE ARCHIE, JR. (mb)
January 31, 2024 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #5 Prisoner Consent Form & Financial Certificate re #4 Order. (mb)
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. The clerk shall send Plaintiff a prisoner consent form. Within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall correct the deficiencies in his motion to proceed in forma pauperis by filing: (1) a prisoner consent form which is signed and dated; and (2) a printout of the transactions in his inmate account for the six months preceding the filing of the complaint. (Deadline to correct deficiencies in IFP Motion: 1/26/2024.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 1/5/2024. (mb)
January 4, 2024 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se Litigant, ERNEST LEE ARCHIE, JR. (mb)
January 4, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ERNEST LEE ARCHIE, JR. (mb)
January 4, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JELO ACEVEDO, CHIP SIMMONS, filed by ERNEST LEE ARCHIE, JR. (No service copies). (mb)
January 4, 2024 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint (No service copies), #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (mb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ARCHIE v. ACEVEDO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERNEST LEE ARCHIE, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JELO ACEVEDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHIP SIMMONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?