MOORE v. FINKE et al
Plaintiff: LARRANCE DURELLE MOORE
Defendant: OKALOOSA COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE, OKALOOSA COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE, DAVID RICHARD FINKE, TRAVIS RYAN TOPOLSKI, COREY RAWLES, HEATH BRENDON HEAL, K C CAMPELL, STEVEN A RICHARD, PAXTON FRENCH SHELTON, TODD J PADILLA, MATTHEW D LANGER, ARIEL PLANCK, MITCHELL ROY LANDIS, HORACE RANDALL PAINE, JR, AARON J PITMAN and KEVIN J LOONEY
Case Number: 3:2024cv00030
Filed: January 18, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Plaintiff shall have fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order to show cause why this case should not be dismissed due to his failure to comply with the Court's February 13 Order. The Court will discharge this Order to show cause if, within fourteen (14) days, Plaintiff pays the $42.37 initial partial filing fee. (Show Cause Response due by 3/29/2024.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 3/15/2024. (jcw)
March 11, 2024 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #7 Order - Filing fee was not received. (jcw)
February 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall pay the clerk an initial partial filing fee of $42.37. The clerk shall mail a copy of this order with the appropriate cover letter to: The Okaloosa County Jail, Finance Department, 1200 E. James Lee Boulevard, Crestview, Florida 32539, Attention: Administrator of Inmate Accounts. ( Fee due by 3/5/2024.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 2/13/2024. (jcw)(cc: Okaloosa County Jail)
February 12, 2024 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement re #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by LARRANCE DURELLE MOORE. (jcw)
February 12, 2024 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement. (jcw)
February 12, 2024 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #4 Amended Complaint,. Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (jcw)
February 9, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by LARRANCE DURELLE MOORE. (jcw) (Main Document 5 replaced on 2/12/2024) (jcw).
February 9, 2024 Filing 4 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against DAVID RICHARD FINKE, TRAVIS RYAN TOPOLSKI, COREY RAWLES, HEATH BRENDON HEAL, K C CAMPELL, STEVEN A RICHARD, PAXTON FRENCH SHELTON, TODD J PADILLA, MATTHEW D LANGER, ARIEL PLANCK, MITCHELL ROY LANDIS, HORACE RANDALL PAINE, JR, AARON J PITMAN, KEVIN J LOONEY, filed by LARRANCE DURELLE MOORE. (No service copies filed.) (jcw)
January 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re #1 Complaint. The clerk shall send Plaintiff a civil rights complaint form for use by prisoners in actions under 42 U.S.C. 1983 and a complete set of forms needed to file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis (for prisoners). This case number should be written on the forms and "Amended Complaint" shall be written on the complaint form. Within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this order, Plaintiff shall file (1) an amended complaint and (2) a complete motion to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the $402.00 filing fee. (Amended Complaint due by 2/9/2024., Fee due by 2/9/2024.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 1/19/2024. (jcw)(Forms sent as ordered.)
January 19, 2024 Filing 2 Notice to Pro Se (jcw)
January 19, 2024 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint. (jcw)
January 18, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against OKALOOSA COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE, filed by LARRANCE DURELLE MOORE. (Filing fee was not paid. No service copies filed.) (jcw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MOORE v. FINKE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRANCE DURELLE MOORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OKALOOSA COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OKALOOSA COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID RICHARD FINKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRAVIS RYAN TOPOLSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COREY RAWLES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEATH BRENDON HEAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K C CAMPELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN A RICHARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAXTON FRENCH SHELTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TODD J PADILLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW D LANGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARIEL PLANCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MITCHELL ROY LANDIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HORACE RANDALL PAINE, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AARON J PITMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN J LOONEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?