FERRIS v. STATE OF FLORIDA et al
Plaintiff: PERCIVAL CHARLES FERRIS, JR
Defendant: STATE OF FLORIDA, FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, T KNIGHT, A RALPH, M D GRANT and RICKY DIXON
Case Number: 3:2024cv00039
Filed: January 29, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: ZACHARY C BOLITHO
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2024 Filing 11 Plaintiff's Written Objections to #9 Report and Recommendations, by PERCIVAL CHARLES FERRIS, JR. (alb)
March 28, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION for Request of Counsel, by PERCIVAL CHARLES FERRIS, JR. (alb)
March 28, 2024 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, #11 Objection to Report and Recommendations. (alb)
March 11, 2024 Filing 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. That this case be DISMISSED without prejudice as malicious under 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b)(1). That the Clerk of Court be directed to enter judgment accordingly and close this case. R&R flag set Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ZACHARY C BOLITHO on 3/11/2024. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 4/8/2024. (alb)
March 7, 2024 Filing 8 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against RICKY DIXON, M D GRANT, T KNIGHT, A RALPH, STATE OF FLORIDA, filed by PERCIVAL CHARLES FERRIS, JR. (No service copies.) (alb)
March 7, 2024 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ZACHARY C BOLITHO notified that action is needed Re: #8 Amended Complaint. (alb)
February 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #6 Motion for Reconsideration. Plaintiff should file an amended complaint as previously instructed. The Court, however, will extend the deadline for filing such an amended complaint to March 15, 2024. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ZACHARY C BOLITHO on 02/28/2024. (alb)
February 28, 2024 Set Deadlines/Hearings re #7 Order. Amended Pleadings due by 3/15/2024. (alb)
February 27, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION for Reconsideration by PERCIVAL CHARLES FERRIS, JR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (alb)
February 27, 2024 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ZACHARY C BOLITHO notified that action is needed Re: #6 MOTION for Reconsideration. Referred to ZACHARY C BOLITHO. (alb)
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. The Clerk of Court is directed to send Plaintiff a civil rights complaint form for use by prisoners. This case number should be written on the form. Plaintiff has thirty days from the date of this order to file an amended civil rights complaint.Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ZACHARY C BOLITHO on 02/01/2024. (Amended Pleadings due by 3/4/2024.) (Order and form mailed.) (alb)
January 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #2 ) is GRANTED to the extent the case may proceed without prepayment of the entire filing fee. Because Plaintiff has no funds accrued in his inmate trust fund account, the Court will not assess Plaintiff an initial partial filing fee as provided in 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1) (A). However, the total filing fee in this case remains $350.00. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order, with the appropriate cover letter to the Florida Department of Corrections, 501 South Calhoun St., Tallahassee, FL 32399-2500, Attention: Agency Clerk. (Order and letter mailed.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ZACHARY C BOLITHO on 01/30/2024. Fee status updated to in forma pauperis (alb)
January 30, 2024 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se Litigant. (alb)
January 30, 2024 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ZACHARY C BOLITHO notified that action is needed Re: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #1 Complaint. Referred to ZACHARY C BOLITHO. (alb)
January 29, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by PERCIVAL CHARLES FERRIS, JR. (alb)
January 29, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, M D GRANT, T KNIGHT, A RALPH, STATE OF FLORIDA, filed by PERCIVAL CHARLES FERRIS, JR. (No service copies.) (alb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FERRIS v. STATE OF FLORIDA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PERCIVAL CHARLES FERRIS, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF FLORIDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T KNIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A RALPH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M D GRANT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICKY DIXON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?