MOORER v. PENSACOLA FEDERAL COURT HOUSE
Plaintiff: CLEVEN MOORER
Defendant: PENSACOLA FEDERAL COURT HOUSE
Case Number: 3:2024cv00088
Filed: February 28, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2024 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. (No objections filed.) (alb)
March 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - RECOMMENDED: This case be DISMISSED for lack of subject matter jurisdiction and as frivolous. The clerk be directed to close the file. R&R flag set. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 3/11/2024. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 4/8/2024. (mb)
March 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. ORDERED - Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, Doc. #2 , is DENIED. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 3/11/2024. (mb)
February 28, 2024 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se Litigant, CLEVEN MOORER. (mb)
February 28, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by CLEVEN MOORER. (mb)
February 28, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PENSACOLA FEDERAL COURT HOUSE, filed by CLEVEN MOORER. (No service copies). (mb)
February 28, 2024 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #1 Complaint. (No service copies). Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (mb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MOORER v. PENSACOLA FEDERAL COURT HOUSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLEVEN MOORER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENSACOLA FEDERAL COURT HOUSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?