MATHEWS v. STREEIT et al
Plaintiff: CARLTON XAVIER MATHEWS
Defendant: J STREEIT and JOHN DOE
Case Number: 3:2024cv00167
Filed: April 18, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: ZACHARY C BOLITHO
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2024 Filing 7 CLERK'S JUDGMENT re #6 Order Adopting Report and Recommendation. (alb)
June 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. The magistrate judge's Report and Recommendation (Doc. #5 ) is adopted and incorporated by reference in this order. This case is DISMISSED without prejudice, under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g), based on Plaintiff's failure to pay the filing fee at the time he commenced this case. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in accordance with this order and close the case. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 06/04/2024. (alb)
May 30, 2024 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, #1 Complaint. (No objections filed.) (alb)
April 22, 2024 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, (Doc. #2 ), be DENIED. This action be DISMISSED without prejudice, under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g), based on Plaintiff's failure to pay the filing fee at the time he commenced this case. The Clerk of Court be directed to close this case.Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ZACHARY C BOLITHO on 04/22/2024. - R&R flag set Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 5/20/2024. (alb)
April 19, 2024 Filing 4 Notice to Pro Se Litigant. (alb)
April 19, 2024 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ZACHARY C BOLITHO notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #3 Notice to the Court. Referred to ZACHARY C BOLITHO. (alb)
April 18, 2024 Filing 3 Notice to the Court, by CARLTON XAVIER MATHEWS. (Imminent danger.) (alb)
April 18, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by CARLTON XAVIER MATHEWS. (alb)
April 18, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CARLTON XAVIER MATHEWS, filed by CARLTON XAVIER MATHEWS. (No service copies.) (alb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MATHEWS v. STREEIT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARLTON XAVIER MATHEWS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J STREEIT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?