CM VANTAGE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY v. MCKENZIE et al
Plaintiff: CM VANTAGE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: RRI PENSACOLA LLC d/b/a RED ROOF INN PENSACOLA and TEMPIE MCKENZIE
Case Number: 3:2024cv00216
Filed: May 17, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: T KENT WETHERELL
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2024 Filing 7 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against TEMPIE MCKENZIE, filed by CM VANTAGE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Underlying Complaint, #2 Exhibit Policy) (PORTER, IRENE)
June 7, 2024 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint for Declaratory Judgment served on RRI Pensacola, LLC d/b/a Red Rood Inn Pensacola c/o Alpesh Ramani on June 4, 2024, filed by CM VANTAGE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (HERNANDEZ, ELIZABETH)
June 5, 2024 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint for Declaratory Judgment served on Tempie Louise McKenzie on May 27, 2024, filed by CM VANTAGE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (HERNANDEZ, ELIZABETH)
May 29, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH A HERNANDEZ on behalf of CM VANTAGE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (HERNANDEZ, ELIZABETH)
May 29, 2024 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by CM VANTAGE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent Church Mutual Holding Company, Inc. for CM VANTAGE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY.. (PORTER, IRENE)
May 20, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to TEMPIE MCKENZIE, RRI PENSACOLA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (jfj)
May 17, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AFLNDC-8803847.), filed by CM VANTAGE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - Complaint in underlying lawsuit, #2 Exhibit Ex B - Vantage Policy (Premium Information Redacted), #3 Exhibit Summons-Tempie Louise McKenzie, #4 Exhibit Summons - RRI Pensacola LLC, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (PORTER, IRENE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CM VANTAGE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY v. MCKENZIE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RRI PENSACOLA LLC d/b/a RED ROOF INN PENSACOLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEMPIE MCKENZIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CM VANTAGE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: ELIZABETH A HERNANDEZ
Represented By: IRENE MARIE PORTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?