WATERS EDGE LIVING LLC v. WESTCHESTER SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: WATERS EDGE LIVING LLC
Defendant: WESTCHESTER SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 4:2008cv00069
Filed: February 13, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Tallahassee Office
County: Leon
Presiding Judge: STEPHAN P MICKLE
Presiding Judge: WILLIAM C SHERRILL
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446 Breach of Contract- Insurance
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER denying 131 Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Portions of Defendant's Brief Regarding Issues to be Tried and allowing Plaintiffs to proceed on wrongful payout claim signed by CHIEF JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 1/3/11. (tss)
July 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER denying 95 Bill of Costs filed by WESTCHESTER SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY, denying 96 Bill of Costs filed by WESTCHESTER SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 7/8/10. (bkp)
June 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER DENYING 102 MOTION to Strike; GRANTING 93 MOTION for Reconsideration; VACATING 92 Clerk's Judgment. On Reconsideration of 91 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment is denied as to Count One (wron gful payout of settlement) and granted as to Counts Two and Three (bad faith). Trial set for 10/18/2010 at 08:30 AM in U.S. Courthouse, Tallahassee, Florida. A separate order setting a pretrial conference and deadlines for submissions issued at a date closer to trial. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 6/23/2010. (jws)
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER ON CROSS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT GRANTING 45 Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant, WESTCHESTER SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY; DENYING 48 Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 9/30/2009. (jws)
April 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER GRANTING re 60 REVISED MOTION for leave to file reply on their 48 Motion for Summary Judgment, AND 77 MOTION for Clarification Regarding their Request for Leave to File Reply on their 48 Motion for Summary Judgment fi led by WATERS EDGE LIVING LLC and WATERS EDGE JW LLC. Clerk shall file Plaintiffs' reply memorandum. Defendant may, if desired, file a sur-reply, on or before 4/22/2009. ( Miscellaneous Deadline - by 4/22/2009.) Signed by JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 4/15/2009. (jws)
April 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER GRANTING 61 MOTION for Leave to File a reply brief filed by WESTCHESTER SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY. WESTCHESTER shall have up to and including 4/13/2009 to file reply. Plts may, if desired, file a sur-reply on or before 4/20/2009. ( Reply due by 4/13/2009., Sur-reply due by 4/20/2009.) Signed by JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 4/6/2009. (jws)
February 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting 66 MOTION to Stay filed by WESTCHESTER SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY as it relates to the pretrial conference and trial, and setting response deadline for 3/9/2009); signed by JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 2/25/09. (tss)
February 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER GRANTING 64 MOTION to Allow Electronic Equipment to Pre-Trial Conference on March 2, 2009 filed by WESTCHESTER SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY. Signed by JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 2/20/2009. (jws)
October 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER denying 22 Motion to Reassign Case; signed by JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 10/10/08. (tss)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WATERS EDGE LIVING LLC v. WESTCHESTER SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WATERS EDGE LIVING LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTCHESTER SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?