WELCH v. THEODORIDES-BUSTLE
Plaintiff: MICHAEL WELCH
Defendant: ELECTRA THEODORIDES-BUSTLE and CARL FORD
Case Number: 4:2009cv00302
Filed: August 10, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Tallahassee Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: ROBERT L HINKLE
Presiding Judge: WILLIAM C SHERRILL
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER CERTIFYING RULE 23(b)(2) CLASS. GRANTING 39 MOTION to Certify Class filed by MICHAEL WELCH. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 11/17/2010. (pll)
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER denying 38 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 45 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 7/1/2010. (RH)
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER DENYING 16 AND 18 MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 1/5/2010. (pll)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WELCH v. THEODORIDES-BUSTLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL WELCH
Represented By: LANCE A HARKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELECTRA THEODORIDES-BUSTLE
Represented By: GEORGE LEE WAAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARL FORD
Represented By: GEORGE LEE WAAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?