JOHNSON v. STEVENS
Plaintiff: RAYMOND JOHNSON
Defendant: STEVENS
Case Number: 4:2009cv00367
Filed: September 14, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Tallahassee Office
County: Taylor
Presiding Judge: WILLIAM C SHERRILL
Presiding Judge: WILLIAM STAFFORD
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER ADOPTING THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S 19 SECOND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The plaintiff's complaint and this action are DISMISSED for failure to pay the filing fee as previously ordered. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD on 3/22/2010. (pll)
March 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SECOND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, it is RECOMMENDED that all pending motions be DENIED and this case be DISMISSED for failure to comply with court orders to pay the filing fee, and failure to prosecute, and that the order adopting this report and recommendation direct the Clerk of Court to note on the docket that this cause was dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii) re 17 MOTION for Default Judgment as to filed by RAYMOND JOHNSON, 9 MOTION for Protective Order filed by RAYMOND JOHNSON, 18 MOTION for Protective Order filed by RAYMOND JOHNSON - R&R flag set. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILLIAM C SHERRILL, JR on 3/1/2010. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 3/29/2010. (pll) Modified on 3/9/2010 (pll).
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ADOPTING IN PART, THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to the extent it addresses the plaintiff's status under section 1915(g). The plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED. The m agistrate judge's order (doc. 5 ) granting the plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is hereby VACATED AND SET ASIDE. The plaintiff may not proceed with this case without prepayment of the full filing fee. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD on 11/30/09. (pll)
November 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, It is RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's complaint, doc. 1 , be DISMISSED for failing to honestly and completely disclose all prior cases he has filed in the federal courts, and because Plaintiff is not e ntitled to be granted in forma pauperis pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g), and was well aware of that fact at the time he submitted his in forma pauperis motion and complaint. It is further RECOMMENDED that the order adopting this report and recom mendation direct the Clerk of Court to note on the docket that this cause was dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g): R&R flag set. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILLIAM C SHERRILL, JR on 11/10/09. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 12/8/2009. (pll)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JOHNSON v. STEVENS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAYMOND JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVENS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?