Adams v. BP PLC et al

Plaintiff: Emily R. Adams
Defendant: BP PLC, BP AMERICA INC, BP PRODUCTS NORTH AMERICA INC, BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY, BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC, ANADARKO PETROLEUM CORPORATION, ANADARKO E & P COMPANY LP, MOEX OFFSHORE 2007 LLC, TRANSOCEAN LTD, TRANSOCEAN DEEPWATER INC, TRANSOCEAN OFFSHORE DEEPWATER DRILLING INC, TRANSOCEAN HOLDINGS LLC, TRITON ASSET LEASING GMBH, HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES INC, M-I LLC, WEATHERFORD US LP, DRIL-QUIP INC, CAMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, JOHN AND JANE DOES A-Z and CORPORATIONS A-Z
Case Number: 4:2010cv00306
Filed: July 21, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Tallahassee Office
County: Alachua
Presiding Judge: STEPHAN P MICKLE
Presiding Judge: WILLIAM C SHERRILL
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 60 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-2) MDL No. 2179. (jws)
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER GRANTING 5 , 30 MOTIONS to Stay. All proceedings and deadlines in this case are temporarily stayed, pending the JPML's final decision on whether to transfer this action to the Eastern District of Louisiana. Defendants shall file a status report approsing the Court of the status of the transfer request before the JPML by 11/1/2010. ( Status Report due by 11/1/2010.). Signed by CHIEF JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 9/2/2010. (jws)
August 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING 4 , 11 , 12 , 23 , 24 , 32 , 33 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. ANADARKO E & P COMPANY LP, ANADARKO E & P COMPANY LP answer due 10/1/2010; ANADARKO PETROLEUM CORPORATION answer due 10/1/2010; BP AMERIC A INC answer due 10/1/2010; BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY answer due 10/1/2010; BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC answer due 10/1/2010; BP PRODUCTS NORTH AMERICA INC answer due 10/1/2010; CAMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION answer due 10/1/2010; M-I LLC answer due 10/1/2010; TRANSOCEAN DEEPWATER INC answer due 10/1/2010; TRANSOCEAN HOLDINGS LLC answer due 10/1/2010; TRANSOCEAN OFFSHORE DEEPWATER DRILLING INC answer due 10/1/2010; TRITON ASSET LEASING GMBH answer due 10/1/2010; WEATHERFORD US LP answer due 10/1/2010.). Signed by CHIEF JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 8/18/2010. (jws)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. BP PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily R. Adams
Represented By: THOMAS DAVID HOYLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP AMERICA INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP PRODUCTS NORTH AMERICA INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANADARKO PETROLEUM CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANADARKO E & P COMPANY LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOEX OFFSHORE 2007 LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRANSOCEAN LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRANSOCEAN DEEPWATER INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRANSOCEAN OFFSHORE DEEPWATER DRILLING INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRANSOCEAN HOLDINGS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRITON ASSET LEASING GMBH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M-I LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEATHERFORD US LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DRIL-QUIP INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN AND JANE DOES A-Z
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORPORATIONS A-Z
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?