STALLWORTH v. BUSS
Plaintiff: VICTOR DONTAVIOUS STALLWORTH
Defendant: MATHERS, EDWIN BUSS, S TYSON and DUANE SPEARS
Case Number: 4:2011cv00432
Filed: August 29, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Tallahassee Office
County: Taylor
Presiding Judge: ROBERT L HINKLE
Presiding Judge: WILLIAM C SHERRILL
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER DISMISSING THE CASE BUT DENYING SANCTIONS; adopting 80 Report and Recommendation; granting 47 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 49 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 2/26/2013. The clerk must enter a judgment stating, All the plaintiff Victor Dontavious Stallworths claims against all defendants are dismissed with prejudice. The clerk must tax costs against the plaintiff on a timely submission. The clerk must close the file. (kdm)
July 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER DISMISSING THE OFFICIAL CAPACITY CLAIMS. ACCEPTING 39 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Granting 31 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The plaintiffs claims against the defendant in her official capacity are DISMISSED. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 7/11/12. (pll)
December 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DENYING A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, ACCEPTING 14 Report and Recommendation. Denying 13 Motion for TRO. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 12/19/11. (pll)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STALLWORTH v. BUSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VICTOR DONTAVIOUS STALLWORTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATHERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWIN BUSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S TYSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DUANE SPEARS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?