PRISON LEGAL NEWS v MAYO, et al
Plaintiff: |
PRISON LEGAL NEWS |
Defendant: |
KENNETH S TUCKER, CORRECTIONS CORPORATION OF AMERICA and GEO GROUP INC |
Case Number: |
4:2012cv00239 |
Filed: |
April 3, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Florida |
Office: |
Tallahassee Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
ROBERT L HINKLE |
Presiding Judge: |
CHARLES A STAMPELOS |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 22, 2019 |
Filing
357
ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DETERMINE THE AMOUNT OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AND EXPENSES - Plaintiff's Motion to Determine the Amount of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses, ECF No. 329 , is GRANTED in part. Plaintiff P rison Legal News is entitled to $1,148,210.89 in attorneys' fees and $33,448.57 in expenses. In addition, this Court has previously determined Plaintiff is entitled to $6,204.42 in costs. ECF No. 326 . Accordingly, Plaintiff&# 039;s total judgment amount is $1,187,863.88. The Clerk shall enter a fee and cost judgment stating, "Plaintiff is entitled to judgment against Defendant in the amount of $1,148,210.89 in attorneys' fees, $33,448.57 in expenses, and $6,204.42 in costs, for a total judgment amount of $1,187,863.88, for which sum let execution issue." The Clerk shall also close the file. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 10/22/2019. (cle)
|
August 27, 2015 |
Filing
251
ORDER. Judicial estoppel does not preclude the Florida Department of Corrections from adopting its current litigation position. The Florida Department of Corrections censorship of Prison Legal News under Rule 33-501.401(3) of t he Florida Administrative Code does not violate Prison Legal News First Amendment rights. The Florida Department of Corrections censorship procedures violate Prison Legal News right to due process under the Fourteenth Amendment. The Clerk shall enter judgment. This Court retains jurisdiction over the open file to decide costs and attorneys fees, if any. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 8/27/2015. (pll)
|
March 27, 2014 |
Filing
191
ORDER ACKNOWLEDGING DISMISSAL OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL re 189 Notice of Withdrawing Motion to Proceed on Appeal in Forma Pauperis. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 3/27/2014. (dlt)
|
January 2, 2014 |
Filing
176
ORDER GRANTING 175 MOTION TO CONSTRUE LEVITAN'S OBJECTION AND MEMORANDUM AS A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND DENYING 174 THE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 1/2/2014. (dlt)
|
December 4, 2013 |
Filing
173
ORDER DENYING 170 MOTION TO INTERVENE. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 12/4/2013. (dlt)**Copy mailed to Daniel J Levitan**.
|
May 9, 2012 |
Filing
57
ORDER. The plaintiff's motion to transfer (doc. 49 ) is hereby GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to transfer this case to the Tallahassee Division. The defendants' pending motions to dismiss, contained within their prior-filed motions to transfer (docs. 18 , 29 , 37 ), will carry with the case. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on May 9, 2012. (pmc)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?