LINCOLN v. FLORIDA GAS TRANSMISSION COMPANY LLC
Plaintiff: WILLIAM F T LINCOLN
Defendant: FLORIDA GAS TRANSMISSION COMPANY LLC, DOES, MUSTANG ENGINEERING INC, SOUTHERN UNION COMPANY, GEORGE L LINDEMANN, KINDER MORGAN INC, RICHARD D KINDER, US PIPELINE INC, GREG CURRAN, ROBERT O BOND, CITRUS CORPORATION and ROCKFORD G MEYER
Case Number: 4:2013cv00074
Filed: February 20, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Tallahassee Office
County: Leon
Presiding Judge: MARK E WALKER
Presiding Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER ON SECOND ADOPTING 57 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - Defendants' motions to dismiss, ECF Nos. 43 & 44 , are GRANTED. The Clerk must enter judgment stating, "The third amended complaint is dismissed." The Clerk shall close the file. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 7/7/2014. (tdl)
April 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER ACCEPTING AND ADOPTING 55 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - The motion to dismiss, ECF No. 52 , filed by Defendants, Mustang Engineering, L.P. and Mustang Engineering Florida, Inc., is GRANTED, and the claims raised against t hem in Plaintiff's third amended complaint are DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to serve the complaint within 120 days as required by Fed. R. Civ. P 4(m). This cause is remanded to the Magistrate for further proceedings. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 4/22/2014. (tdl)
March 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Plaintiff shall submit an amended complaint. Clerk shall return this file upon filing of amended complaint or no later than 3/25/2013. (Notify Chambers on 3/25/2013., Amended Pleadings due by 3/25/2013.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 3/8/2013. (jws)
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re Plaintiff's 5 Objections to 4 Order construed as Motion to file an Amended Complaint and REMANDS the case to magistrate judge. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 2/28/2013. (jws)
February 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re 1 Complaint: Clerk directed to provide Plaintiff a 28 U.S.C.§1331 civil rights complaint form for filing as an amended complaint. (Amended Pleadings/AR due by 3/25/2013.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 2/22/2013. (jws)(Form to Plaintiff as order directed.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LINCOLN v. FLORIDA GAS TRANSMISSION COMPANY LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLORIDA GAS TRANSMISSION COMPANY LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUSTANG ENGINEERING INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOUTHERN UNION COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGE L LINDEMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KINDER MORGAN INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD D KINDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US PIPELINE INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREG CURRAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT O BOND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITRUS CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROCKFORD G MEYER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM F T LINCOLN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?