MCCROAN v. MORGAN, et al
Plaintiff: WILLIAM TONY MCCROAN
Defendant: MARGUERITE J MORGAN and ADAM SMITH
Case Number: 4:2013cv00370
Filed: June 25, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Tallahassee Office
County: Gadsden
Presiding Judge: MARK E WALKER
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER ACCEPTING 60 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - Plaintiff's motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis, ECF No. 59 , is DENIED because this Court finds that the appeal is not taken in good faith. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 7/2/2014. (tdl)
June 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER ACCEPTING 55 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - The Clerk shall enter judgment stating, "Plaintiff's claims against Joseph Smith and Joseph Chason are DISMISSED for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted." Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 6/19/2014. (tdl)
April 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER ACCEPTING AND ADOPTING 45 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - The Clerk shall enter judgment stating, "Defendant Morgan's Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. 26 , is GRANTED. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Morgan are dismissed with prejudice in their entirety." This cause is remanded to the Magistrate for further proceedings and for review of Plaintiff's objections, ECF 46 , wherein Plaintiff moves for entry of a default judgment against Chief Smith. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 4/16/2014. (tdl)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCCROAN v. MORGAN, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARGUERITE J MORGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADAM SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM TONY MCCROAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?