VEIT v. CENTENE MANAGEMENT COMPANY LLC et al
Plaintiff: VEIT, ANGELA B DILWORTH, JOAN FRETT, JENNIFER MONTGOMERY, PAMELA WIZNER, ASHELY FRASER, JENNIFER HARRIS, CLARISE MILLER, MONACO BENJAMIN, AMBER FRAZZINI, KATHY CREEL, YANTALE OWENS, MONICA HERNANDEZ, ANGELA TIJUANA CARRINGTON, JOHNNY BANKS, EBONY HOLLEY, LAKISHA L HUGHES, LATRISHA UPSON, DEDRA MCKINNEY, ALANA COHEN, KIMBERLY O'BRIEN, JOSHUA HARRINGTON-VARGAS, FRANCINE KNIGHT, SHANNA VEIT, ELIZABETH WIGLE, TYWONA DOUGLAS, ANTHONY MARTIN, SEBRINA PATTERSON, ANQUANETTE JACKSON and NATASHA GREEN
Defendant: CENTENE MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC, CENTENE MANAGEMENT COMPANY LLC and SUNSHINE HEALTH PLAN INC
Case Number: 4:2017cv00006
Filed: January 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Tallahassee Office
County: Leon
Presiding Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2017 Filing 35 CLERK'S JUDGMENT - re: #34 ORDER APPROVING JOINT SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE. (cle)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER APPROVING JOINT SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE - The Joint Motion for Final Approval of Settlement, ECF No. #32 , is GRANTED. The Clerk must enter judgment stating, "The parties are ordered to comply with their settlement agreement. All claims in this case are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41." The Clerk must close the file. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 6/15/2017. (cle)
June 12, 2017 Filing 33 SEALED. (cle)
June 12, 2017 Filing 32 SEALED. (cle)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO FILE CONFIDENTIAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT UNDER SEAL - The Joint Motion to File Confidential Settlement Agreement and Release Under Seal for Purposes of the Court's Approval of Settlement, ECF No. #30 , is GRANTED. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 6/12/2017. (cle)
June 12, 2017 Filing 30 Joint MOTION to Seal Document by SHANNA VEIT. (DAVIS, JOHN)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER ACKNOWLEDGING AND ACCEPTING STATUS REPORT - re: #28 Status Report. The parties shall submit their Joint Motion and Brief in Support of Final Approval of Settlement on or before 6/12/2017. The deadlines are stayed until 6/12/2017. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 6/5/2017. (cle)
June 5, 2017 Filing 28 STATUS REPORT on Settlement Process by SHANNA VEIT. (CULLITON, SEAN)
May 16, 2017 Filing 27 NOTICE of Filing Opt-In Form of Clarise Miller by SHANNA VEIT (Attachments: #1 Redacted Opt-In Form) (CULLITON, SEAN)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER STAYING CASE AND DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE STATUS REPORT PENDING DISPOSITION OF CASE - re: #25 Notice of Settlement. This Court stays all deadlines pending final approval. In the event the settlement has not been submitted by May 31, 2017, Plaintiff shall provide this Court with a status report on or before 6/5/2017. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 5/11/2017. (cle)
May 10, 2017 Filing 25 NOTICE of Settlement by SHANNA VEIT (DAVIS, JOHN)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER RECOGNIZING DISMISSAL OF OPT-IN PLAINTIFF - The parties have filed a Stipulation for Dismissal of Opt-In Plaintiff Kathy Creel. ECF No. #23 . Rule 41 allows the dismissal of a party and all claims associated with the party. The notice is effective without an order. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 5/9/2017. (cle)
May 9, 2017 Filing 23 STIPULATION of Dismissal by KATHY CREEL. (DAVIS, JOHN)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO EXTEND STAY AND ACKNOWLEDGING JOINT STATUS REPORT - re: #21 Joint MOTION to Extend Time of Stay. This court GRANTS an extension of the Stay until 5/10/2017. Plaintiff shall dismiss this action or file another status report on or before 5/10/2017. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 4/10/2017. (cle)
April 10, 2017 Filing 21 Joint MOTION to Extend Time of Stay by CENTENE MANAGEMENT COMPANY LLC. (SNIFFEN, ROBERT)
February 24, 2017 Filing 20 NOTICE of Filing Opt In for Anthony Martin by SHANNA VEIT (TALBOTT, JEREMIAH)
February 21, 2017 Filing 19 NOTICE of Filing Opt In for Joshua Harrington-Vargas by SHANNA VEIT (TALBOTT, JEREMIAH)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ACKNOWLEDGING STATUS REPORT AND GRANTING 60-DAY STAY OF DEADLINES - re: Joint Status Report and Request for 60-Day Stay, ECF No. #17 . This Court acknowledges the status report and GRANTS a stay of deadlines until 4/8/2017. The next status report shall be due on or before 4/10/2017. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 2/7/2017. (cle)
February 6, 2017 Filing 17 STATUS REPORT and Request for 60-day Stay by CENTENE MANAGEMENT COMPANY LLC, SUNSHINE HEALTH PLAN INC. (SNIFFEN, ROBERT)
February 1, 2017 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Opt In for Francine Knight by SHANNA VEIT (TALBOTT, JEREMIAH)
January 26, 2017 Filing 15 NOTICE of Filing Opt In for Kimberly O'Brien by SHANNA VEIT (TALBOTT, JEREMIAH)
January 26, 2017 Filing 14 NOTICE of Filing Opt In for Joan Frett by SHANNA VEIT (TALBOTT, JEREMIAH)
January 26, 2017 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing Opt In for Pamela Wizner by SHANNA VEIT (TALBOTT, JEREMIAH)
January 23, 2017 Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing Opt In for Alana Cohen by SHANNA VEIT (TALBOTT, JEREMIAH)
January 23, 2017 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing Opt In for Monica Hernandez by SHANNA VEIT (TALBOTT, JEREMIAH)
January 19, 2017 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by CENTENE MANAGEMENT COMPANY LLC, SUNSHINE HEALTH PLAN INC. (SNIFFEN, ROBERT)
January 19, 2017 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by CENTENE MANAGEMENT COMPANY LLC, SUNSHINE HEALTH PLAN INC. (SNIFFEN, ROBERT)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT - Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time within which to File a Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint, ECF No. #7 , is GRANTED. Defendants shall file their responsive pleading on or before 1/19/2017. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 1/13/2017. (cle)
January 12, 2017 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint by CENTENE MANAGEMENT COMPANY LLC, SUNSHINE HEALTH PLAN INC. (SNIFFEN, ROBERT)
January 11, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Opt In for Amber Frazzini by SHANNA VEIT (TALBOTT, JEREMIAH)
January 11, 2017 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Opt In for Ashley Fraser by SHANNA VEIT (TALBOTT, JEREMIAH)
January 11, 2017 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Opt In for Yantale Owens by SHANNA VEIT (TALBOTT, JEREMIAH)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER - Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 1/23/2017. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/22/2017. Discovery due by 5/9/2017. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 1/9/2017. (cle)
January 5, 2017 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (SNIFFEN, ROBERT)
January 5, 2017 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SUNSHINE HEALTH PLAN, INC. d/b/a SUNSHINE HEALTH, CENTENE MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC from Circuit Court of the Second Judicial Circuit, in and for Leon County, Florida, case number 2016-CA-002267. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-3769923.), filed by SUNSHINE HEALTH PLAN, INC. d/b/a SUNSHINE HEALTH, CENTENE MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (SNIFFEN, ROBERT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VEIT v. CENTENE MANAGEMENT COMPANY LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTENE MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTENE MANAGEMENT COMPANY LLC
Represented By: ROBERT JACOB SNIFFEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUNSHINE HEALTH PLAN INC
Represented By: ROBERT JACOB SNIFFEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VEIT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELA B DILWORTH
Represented By: JOHN CLARK DAVIS
Represented By: SEAN PARNELL CULLITON
Represented By: JEREMIAH JOSEPH TALBOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOAN FRETT
Represented By: JEREMIAH JOSEPH TALBOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER MONTGOMERY
Represented By: JOHN CLARK DAVIS
Represented By: SEAN PARNELL CULLITON
Represented By: JEREMIAH JOSEPH TALBOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAMELA WIZNER
Represented By: JEREMIAH JOSEPH TALBOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASHELY FRASER
Represented By: JEREMIAH JOSEPH TALBOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER HARRIS
Represented By: JOHN CLARK DAVIS
Represented By: SEAN PARNELL CULLITON
Represented By: JEREMIAH JOSEPH TALBOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLARISE MILLER
Represented By: JEREMIAH JOSEPH TALBOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONACO BENJAMIN
Represented By: JOHN CLARK DAVIS
Represented By: SEAN PARNELL CULLITON
Represented By: JEREMIAH JOSEPH TALBOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMBER FRAZZINI
Represented By: JEREMIAH JOSEPH TALBOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHY CREEL
Represented By: JOHN CLARK DAVIS
Represented By: SEAN PARNELL CULLITON
Represented By: JEREMIAH JOSEPH TALBOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YANTALE OWENS
Represented By: JEREMIAH JOSEPH TALBOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONICA HERNANDEZ
Represented By: JEREMIAH JOSEPH TALBOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELA TIJUANA CARRINGTON
Represented By: JOHN CLARK DAVIS
Represented By: SEAN PARNELL CULLITON
Represented By: JEREMIAH JOSEPH TALBOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHNNY BANKS
Represented By: JOHN CLARK DAVIS
Represented By: SEAN PARNELL CULLITON
Represented By: JEREMIAH JOSEPH TALBOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EBONY HOLLEY
Represented By: JOHN CLARK DAVIS
Represented By: SEAN PARNELL CULLITON
Represented By: JEREMIAH JOSEPH TALBOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAKISHA L HUGHES
Represented By: JOHN CLARK DAVIS
Represented By: SEAN PARNELL CULLITON
Represented By: JEREMIAH JOSEPH TALBOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LATRISHA UPSON
Represented By: JOHN CLARK DAVIS
Represented By: SEAN PARNELL CULLITON
Represented By: JEREMIAH JOSEPH TALBOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEDRA MCKINNEY
Represented By: JOHN CLARK DAVIS
Represented By: SEAN PARNELL CULLITON
Represented By: JEREMIAH JOSEPH TALBOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALANA COHEN
Represented By: JEREMIAH JOSEPH TALBOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY O'BRIEN
Represented By: JEREMIAH JOSEPH TALBOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA HARRINGTON-VARGAS
Represented By: JEREMIAH JOSEPH TALBOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANCINE KNIGHT
Represented By: JEREMIAH JOSEPH TALBOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHANNA VEIT
Represented By: JOHN CLARK DAVIS
Represented By: SEAN PARNELL CULLITON
Represented By: JEREMIAH JOSEPH TALBOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH WIGLE
Represented By: JOHN CLARK DAVIS
Represented By: SEAN PARNELL CULLITON
Represented By: JEREMIAH JOSEPH TALBOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TYWONA DOUGLAS
Represented By: JOHN CLARK DAVIS
Represented By: SEAN PARNELL CULLITON
Represented By: JEREMIAH JOSEPH TALBOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY MARTIN
Represented By: JEREMIAH JOSEPH TALBOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEBRINA PATTERSON
Represented By: JOHN CLARK DAVIS
Represented By: SEAN PARNELL CULLITON
Represented By: JEREMIAH JOSEPH TALBOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANQUANETTE JACKSON
Represented By: JOHN CLARK DAVIS
Represented By: SEAN PARNELL CULLITON
Represented By: JEREMIAH JOSEPH TALBOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATASHA GREEN
Represented By: JOHN CLARK DAVIS
Represented By: SEAN PARNELL CULLITON
Represented By: JEREMIAH JOSEPH TALBOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?