NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION v. BONDI et al Featured Case

Following Florida's passage of SB 7026, the state's first gun control legislation enacted after the Parkland school massacre on February 14, the National Rifle Association filed a lawsuit against the state. In its complaint, the NRA argues that the section of the law that raises the minimum age to purchase a firearm from 18 to 21 violates the Second and Fourteenth Amendments of the US Constitution.

Plaintiff: NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION
Defendant: PAM BONDI and RICK SWEARINGEN
Case Number: 4:2018cv00137
Filed: March 9, 2018
Court: Florida Northern District Court
Office: Tallahassee Office
County: Leon
Presiding Judge: MARK E WALKER
Referring Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 13, 2018 44 Featured Case ORDER DENYING 43 MOTION TO AMEND. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 6/13/2018. (tdl) **Order forwarded**
June 8, 2018 43 MOTION for Leave to Amend Motion for Reconsideration by MITCHELL WILLIAMS (tdl)
June 7, 2018 42 Letter from JOHN T. PRICE (tdl)
June 4, 2018 41 Letter from JOHN T. PRICE (tdl)
June 1, 2018 40 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION for proceedings held on N/A before Judge N/A, (THOMPSON, DAVID)
May 24, 2018 39 USCA Case Number 18-12081-K for 34 NOTICE OF APPEAL. (tdl)
May 18, 2018 38 Featured Case ORDER ON JOINT MOTION REQUESTING ABEYANCE - Assuming that this Court is not already divested of jurisdiction, the parties' joint motion requesting that this case be held in abeyance, ECF No. 37 , is GRANTED. All deadlines in this case are stayed pending the resolution of Plaintiff's appeal of this Court's order denying Plaintiff's motion to proceed under pseudonyms (Deadline for clerk to check status of stay by 6/18/2018). Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 5/18/2018. (vkm)
May 18, 2018 37 MOTION to Stay JOINT Motion to Hold Case in Abeyance Pending Appeal by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION. (SUKHIA, KENNETH)
May 18, 2018 Set Deadlines re 34 Notice of Appeal: Clerk to check status of Appeal on 8/20/2018. Electronic Availability of ROA due by 8/20/2018. (tdl)
May 18, 2018 36 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 34 Notice of Appeal. (tdl)
May 18, 2018 35 Appeal Instructions re: 34 Notice of Appeal : The Transcript Request Form is available on the Internet at http://www.flnd.uscourts.gov/forms/Attorney/ECCA_transcript_form_fillable.pdf **PLEASE NOTE** Separate forms must be filed for each court reporter. Transcript Order Form due by 6/1/2018. (tdl)
May 17, 2018 34 NOTICE OF APPEAL by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION. ( Filing fee $505 Receipt Number AFLNDC-4183097.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (SUKHIA, KENNETH)
May 17, 2018 33 **FILED IN ERROR, SEE Doc. 34 **NOTICE of Appeal from Order by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (SUKHIA, KENNETH) Modified on 5/18/2018 (tdl).
May 13, 2018 32 Featured Case ORDER DENYING 19 MOTION TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS. The NRA must file its amended complaint -without pseudonyms-no later than May 21, 2018. ( Amended Pleadings due by 5/21/2018.). Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 5/13/18. (pll)
May 7, 2018 31 REPLY to Response to Motion re 20 MOTION Memorandum in Support of Motion to Proceed under Pseudonyms , 19 MOTION For Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonyms filed by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION. (SUKHIA, KENNETH)
May 7, 2018 30 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED 29 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY (Reply due by 5/11/2018.) Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 5/7/2018. (tdl)
May 6, 2018 29 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Regarding Motion for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonyms by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION. (SUKHIA, KENNETH)
May 4, 2018 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re 20 MOTION Memorandum in Support of Motion to Proceed under Pseudonyms , 19 MOTION For Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonyms filed by PAM BONDI, RICK SWEARINGEN. (AGARWAL, AMIT)
May 2, 2018 27 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID HENRY THOMPSON on behalf of NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION (THOMPSON, DAVID)
May 2, 2018 26 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVIS COOPER on behalf of NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION (COOPER, DAVIS)
May 2, 2018 25 Featured Case ORDER ADMITTING JOHN C. OHLENDORF PRO HAC VICE re ECF No. 24 . The motion is GRANTED. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 5/2/2018. (tdl)
May 2, 2018 24 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John D. Ohlendorf.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4169960.) by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (OHLENDORF, JOHN)
April 30, 2018 23 Featured Case ORDER DENYING 22 MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 4/30/2018. (tdl)
April 27, 2018 22 MOTION for Reconsideration re 8 Order on Motion to Intervene by MITCHELL WILLIAMS. (tdl)**One Copy**
April 27, 2018 21 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 18 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND AND REQUIRING EXPEDITED RESPONSE (Response to 19 motion due by by 5/4/2018.) Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 4/27/2018. (tdl)
April 26, 2018 20 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Proceed under Pseudonyms by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Jane Doe, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of John Doe, # 3 Affidavit Declaration of Marion Hammer) (SUKHIA, KENNETH) Modified on 4/28/2018 (pll).
April 26, 2018 19 MOTION For Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonyms by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION. (SUKHIA, KENNETH)
April 26, 2018 18 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Complaint) (SUKHIA, KENNETH)
April 23, 2018 17 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 5/7/2018. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/6/2018. Discovery due by 8/21/2018. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 4/23/2018. (tdl)
April 20, 2018 16 NOTICE OF FILING EXECUTED WAIVER OF SERVICE by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION (LOCURTO, CLIFFORD)
April 19, 2018 15 NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD M WENGER on behalf of All Defendants (WENGER, EDWARD)
April 19, 2018 14 NOTICE of Appearance by AMIT AGARWAL on behalf of All Defendants (AGARWAL, AMIT)
April 4, 2018 13 Featured Case ORDER DENYING 12 MOTION TO AMEND. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 4/4/2018. (tdl) **Order forwarded**
April 2, 2018 12 PROPOSED INTERVENOR'S MOTION to Amend his Intervention by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION. (tdl)
March 30, 2018 11 Featured Case ORDER DENYING 9 LEAVE TO FILE AMICUS BRIEF - Mr. Leonard separately moves this Court to direct the Clerk to forward him paper copies of the filings in this case. ECF No. 10 . That motion is also DENIED. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 3/30/2018. (tdl)
March 30, 2018 10 MOTION for Paper Copies of Pleadings STEPHEN D LEONARD #15017162. (tdl)
March 30, 2018 9 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by STEPHEN D LEONARD #15017162. (tdl)
March 21, 2018 8 Featured Case ORDER DENYING 7 MOTION TO INTERVENE. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 3/21/2018. (tdl) **Order Mailed**
March 19, 2018 7 MOTION to Intervene of Mitchell Williams Statement of the Facts by MITCHELL WILLIAMS. (tdl)
March 9, 2018 6 Summons Issued as to PAM BONDI, RICK SWEARINGEN. (Attachments: # 1 Summons) (pll)
March 9, 2018 5 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION as to RICK SWEARINGEN. (LOCURTO, CLIFFORD) Modified on 3/9/2018 (pll).
March 9, 2018 4 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION as to PAM BONDI. (LOCURTO, CLIFFORD) Modified on 3/9/2018 (pll).
March 9, 2018 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION. (LOCURTO, CLIFFORD)
March 9, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Attorney Disclosure) (LOCURTO, CLIFFORD)
March 9, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4118013.), filed by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION. (LOCURTO, CLIFFORD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION v. BONDI et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION
Represented By: CLIFFORD VINCENT LOCURTO
Represented By: KENNETH WAYNE SUKHIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAM BONDI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICK SWEARINGEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?