HAMMER v. SORENSEN et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: MARION P. HAMMER and MARION P HAMMER
Defendant: HOWARD WEISS, PATRICK SULLIVAN, LAWRENCE T. SORENSEN, CHRISTOPHER RISICA and LAWRENCE T SORENSEN
Case Number: 4:2018cv00329
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Tallahassee Office
County: Leon
Presiding Judge: ROBERT L HINKLE
Referring Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting 28 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 32 Motion to Compel. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 11/17/18. (RH)
November 15, 2018 Filing 32 MOTION to Compel Interrogatory Answers and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by LAWRENCE T SORENSEN. (FINDLEY, THOMAS)
October 16, 2018 Filing 31 Summons Issued as to HOWARD WEISS. (cle)
October 16, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE (Summons to be issued: Howard Weiss) by MARION P HAMMER (VOGT, SHANE)
October 4, 2018 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re 28 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by MARION P HAMMER. (VOGT, SHANE)
September 20, 2018 Filing 28 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by LAWRENCE T SORENSEN. (FINDLEY, THOMAS)
September 10, 2018 Filing 27 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to CHRISTOPHER RISICA (ckm)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER DENYING THE MOTION TO DISMISS, AUTHORIZING A DEFAULT, AUTHORIZING DISCOVERY ON MR. WEISS'S IDENTITY, AND DENYING A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION - Mr. Sorensen's motion to dismiss, ECF No. 15 , is denied. Ms. Hammer's motion for leave to conduct discovery on personal jurisdiction over Mr. Sorensen, ECF No. 20 , is denied as moot. Ms. Hammer's motion for entry of a default, ECF No. 21 , is granted. The clerk must enter a default against Mr. Risica. Ms. Hammer's motion for leave to conduct discovery on identity and citizenship, ECF No. 6 , is granted in part. Ms. Hammer's preliminary-injunction motion, ECF No. 3 , is denied. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 9/7/2018. (ckm)
September 5, 2018 Filing 25 SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER - re: 23 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Discovery due by 2/25/2019. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 3/18/2019. Mediation Report due by 3/25/2019. Jury Trial set for 5/20/2019 at 8:15 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE. Case referred to mediation. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 9/5/2018. (cle)
September 4, 2018 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 20 MOTION Leave to Conduct Expedited Personal Jurisdiction Discovery and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by LAWRENCE T SORENSEN. (FINDLEY, THOMAS)
August 30, 2018 Filing 23 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (VOGT, SHANE)
August 29, 2018 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #21 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Christopher Risica and Incorporated Memorandum of Law of Shane B. Vogt filed by MARION P HAMMER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (VOGT, SHANE)
August 29, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Christopher Risica and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by MARION P HAMMER. (VOGT, SHANE)
August 21, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION Leave to Conduct Expedited Personal Jurisdiction Discovery and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by MARION P HAMMER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (VOGT, SHANE)
August 20, 2018 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by LAWRENCE T SORENSEN. (FINDLEY, THOMAS)
August 14, 2018 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT re #16 Response in Opposition to Motion of Shane B. Vogt by MARION P HAMMER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (VOGT, SHANE)
August 14, 2018 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT re #16 Response in Opposition to Motion by MARION P HAMMER. (VOGT, SHANE)
August 14, 2018 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and to Quash Service of Process and Memorandum of Law filed by MARION P HAMMER. (VOGT, SHANE)
July 31, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by LAWRENCE T SORENSEN. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 8/14/2018). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Lawrence T. Sorensen) (FINDLEY, THOMAS)
July 31, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE (Corrected Certificate of Service of Initial Court Filings) by MARION P HAMMER (VOGT, SHANE)
July 30, 2018 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action and Verified Complaint for Injunctive Relief & Damages served on Lol Sorensen on July 16, 2018, filed by MARION P HAMMER. (VOGT, SHANE)
July 30, 2018 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action and Verified Complaint for Injunctive Relief & Damages served on Christopher Risica on July 16, 2018, filed by MARION P HAMMER. (VOGT, SHANE)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER - Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 8/2/2018. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/4/2018. Discovery due by 11/16/2018. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 7/19/2018. (cle)
July 18, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS MARSHALL FINDLEY on behalf of LAWRENCE T SORENSEN (FINDLEY, THOMAS)
July 15, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to LAWRENCE T. SORENSEN. (cle)
July 15, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to CHRISTOPHER RISICA. (cle)
July 13, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF SIMILAR OR RELATED CASE by MARION P. HAMMER (VOGT, SHANE)
July 13, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Discovery (Leave to Conduct Limited Discovery & Incorporated Memorandum of Law) by MARION P. HAMMER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (VOGT, SHANE)
July 13, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law of Shane B. Vogt filed by MARION P. HAMMER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7) (VOGT, SHANE)
July 13, 2018 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law of Marion P. Hammer filed by MARION P. HAMMER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32) (VOGT, SHANE)
July 13, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by MARION P. HAMMER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (VOGT, SHANE)
July 13, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (VOGT, SHANE)
July 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (VERIFIED) FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF & DAMAGES against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4229492.), filed by MARION P. HAMMER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 SUMMONS FOR CHRISTOPHER RISICA, #35 SUMMONS FOR LOL SORENSEN) (VOGT, SHANE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HAMMER v. SORENSEN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOWARD WEISS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRICK SULLIVAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAWRENCE T. SORENSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER RISICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAWRENCE T SORENSEN
Represented By: THOMAS MARSHALL FINDLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARION P. HAMMER
Represented By: SHANE BRADY VOGT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARION P HAMMER
Represented By: SHANE BRADY VOGT
Represented By: KENNETH G TURKEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?