VARONA TERUEL v. SESSIONS et al
Petitioner: ANTONIO HECTOR VARONA TERUEL
Respondent: JEFF B SESSIONS, JARED F MILLER, MARC J MOORE, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN and RONALD D VITIELLO
Case Number: 4:2018cv00336
Filed: July 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Tallahassee Office
County: Wakulla
Presiding Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2018 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to ANTONIO HECTOR VARONA TERUEL at Wakulla County Sheriff Office re: #7 Order of Dismissal returned as "no longer here." (ckm)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF DISMISSAL - IT IS ORDERED that the motion to dismiss, ECF No. #6 , is GRANTED, and this case is DISMISSED as moot since Petitioner is no longer in custody. The Clerk shall provide this Order to Petitioner at both addresses provided in Respondents' certificate of service, ECF No. #6 at 3, and shall close the file. (File destruction deadline set for 12/4/2018.) Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 9/5/2018. (ckm) ***Provided to Petitioner at Wakulla County Sheriff Office and 9230 NW 26th Street, Sunrise, Florida 33322 as directed***
September 4, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: #6 Motion to Dismiss as Moot. Referred to CHARLES A STAMPELOS. (ckm)
September 4, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss as Moot by JEFF B SESSIONS. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 9/18/2018). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (FISHER, PETER)
August 1, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to JEFF B SESSIONS, RONALD D VITIELLO, and U.S. Attorney (ckm)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - The Clerk of Court shall substitute ICE Acting Director Ronald D. Vitiello in place of named Respondent Marc J. Moore. The Clerk of Court shall prepare and send sufficient copies of this Order, the petition, ECF No. #1 , and summons to Attorney General of the United States Jeff Sessions and ICE Acting Director Ronald D. Vitiello. The Clerk of Court shall also prepare a copy of this Order, the petition, ECF No. #1 , and summons, and send those copies to the United States Attorney for this District. (Answer due by 10/1/2018. Petitioner reply/response due by 10/29/2018. Notify Chambers by 10/1/2018.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 7/31/2018. (ckm)
July 18, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, 2 Filing Fee Received. (ckm)
July 18, 2018 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se (ckm)
July 18, 2018 Filing 2 Filing fee: $5.00, receipt number FLN400034609. Fee status updated to paid. (ckm)
July 18, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by ANTONIO HECTOR VARONA TERUEL. (ckm) ***No Service Copies***

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VARONA TERUEL v. SESSIONS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JEFF B SESSIONS
Represented By: PETER GUNNAR FISHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JARED F MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MARC J MOORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: KIRSTJEN NIELSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: RONALD D VITIELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ANTONIO HECTOR VARONA TERUEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?