UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MCCASKILL et al

Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: Johnny McCaskill and Olean McCaskill
Case Number: 4:2018cv00457
Filed: October 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: ROBERT L HINKLE
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION Administratively Close Case re #1 Complaint by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (TREANOR, TIMOTHY)
October 30, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed. OLEAN MCCASKILL served on 10/29/2018, answer due 11/19/2018. (cle)
October 30, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed. JOHNNY MCCASKILL served on 10/29/2018, answer due 11/19/2018. (cle)
October 5, 2018 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (TREANOR, TIMOTHY)
October 4, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Johnny McCaskill. (cle)
October 4, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Olean McCaskill. (cle)
October 4, 2018 Filing 2 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: To Attorney Timothy Treanor - re: #1 Complaint. A reminder that party names (including aliases) are to be added using all caps and no punctuation. (See "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing," available on Clerk's website.) The party names will be corrected by the clerk. Further, counsel is advised by this entry, that a Civil Cover Sheet must be filed as a separate entry using the event selection "Civil Cover Sheet" which is found under "Other Filings" under "Other Documents". Please re-file the Civil Cover Sheet. (cle)
October 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (TREANOR, TIMOTHY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MCCASKILL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny McCaskill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olean McCaskill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: TIMOTHY CHARLES TREANOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?