BILL NELSON FOR U S SENATE v. DETZNER et al
Plaintiff: BILL NELSON FOR U S SENATE
Defendant: KEN DETZNER, PALM BEACH COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD and SUSAN M BUCHER
Intervenor Defendant: NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE
Case Number: 4:2018cv00536
Filed: November 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Filing 30 CLERK'S JUDGMENT re #29 ORDER CLOSING FILE. (kjw) 90 Day Exhibit Return Deadline set for 2/28/2019.
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER CLOSING FILE. Plaintiff has filed a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal dismissing with prejudice this action. ECF No. #28 . The Clerk must enter judgment stating, "This case is dismissed with prejudice under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)." The Clerk must close the file. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/30/2018. (kjw)
November 29, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by BILL NELSON FOR U S SENATE (NKWONTA, UZOMA)
November 29, 2018 Filing 27 Secretary's Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings in All Pending Cases by KEN DETZNER. (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD) Modified on 11/29/2018 to correct document title. (kjw)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER: The parties are directed to confer and, after conferral, file indication of how they intend to proceed in this Court. The parties shall file this notice on or before 11/30/2018. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/19/18. (amm)
November 16, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by JASON BRETT TORCHINSKY on behalf of NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE (TORCHINSKY, JASON)
November 16, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Proceedings held on 11/16/2018, before Judge Mark E. Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Megan A. Hague, Telephone number 850-422-0011. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/23/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/21/2019. (mah)
November 16, 2018 Filing 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER: Status Conference held on 11/16/2018. Parties discuss #20 Plaintiff's response requesting production of documents. Evidentiary hearing not held (Court Reporter Megan Hague). (vkm)
November 16, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING: Telephonic Evidentiary Hearing Re: #20 Request for Production of Documents set for 11/16/2018 06:00 PM before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER. ALL PARTIES are directed to call the AT&T Conference Line (see below) Conference Call Information You may dial into the conference call up to five minutes before start time. Call in number: 888-684-8852 When prompted for an access code, enter: 3853136# If you are asked to join as the host, just ignore and wait until you are asked for a security code. When asked for a security code, enter: 4565# Say your name, when prompted. You are now in the conference call. Remember to mute your phone when you are not speaking. The Court also asks that counsel NOT use cell phones or speaker phones during the call as the quality of the audio connection is comprised by these devices. s/ Victoria Milton McGee Courtroom Deputy Clerk (vkm)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER SETTING HEARING re #20 Response - This Court has considered, without hearing, Plaintiffs response requesting the production of documents. ECF No. 20. This matter shall be set for an emergency hearing on November 16, 2018, at 6:00 p.m. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/16/2018. (vkm)
November 16, 2018 Filing 20 RESPONSE by BILL NELSON FOR U S SENATE re #19 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, #12 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, CLARIFY - SUPPLEMENTAL. (MEYER, RONALD)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING TIME EXTENSION - Plaintiff seeks leave to file a further update to this Court by 5:00 p.m. EST. ECF No. #17 . To the extent this is a motion for a one-hour time extension, the motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall submit an answer to this Court by 5:00 p.m. EST on 11/16/2018. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/16/2018. (vkm)
November 16, 2018 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 Emergency MOTION to Intervene Secretary's Response to Order Directing Parties to Clarify filed by KEN DETZNER. (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD)
November 16, 2018 Filing 17 RESPONSE by BILL NELSON FOR U S SENATE re #12 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Clarify. (MEYER, RONALD)
November 16, 2018 Filing 16 RESPONSE by NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE re #12 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, by NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE. (MYDOCK, KIMBERLY)
November 16, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW BAUMANN, I on behalf of SUSAN M BUCHER, PALM BEACH COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD (BAUMANN, ANDREW)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ADMITTING UZOMA N. NKWONTA PRO HAC VICE. This Court has considered, without hearing, the Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Uzoma N. Nkwonta. ECF No. #9 . The motion is GRANTED. Mr. Nkwonta has fulfilled the requirements of the Local Rules for admission and is admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Plaintiffs. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/16/2018. (kjw)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ADMITTING MATTHEW A. FITZGERALD PRO HAC VICE. This Court has considered, without hearing, the Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Matthew A. Fitzgerald. ECF No. #8 . The motion is GRANTED. Mr. Fitzgerald has fulfilled the requirements of the Local Rules for admission and is admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Plaintiffs. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/16/2018. (kjw)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO CLARIFY - The parties shall file briefs no later than 4:00 p.m. on 11/16/2018 to clarify whether there is a live issue in this matter. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/16/2018. (vkm)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ADMITTING JOHN D. ADAMS PRO HAC VICE. This Court has considered, without hearing, the Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John D. Adams. ECF No. #7 . The motion is GRANTED. Mr. Adams has fulfilled the requirements of the Local Rules for admission and is admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Plaintiffs. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/16/2018. (kjw)
November 16, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by GEORGE TY LEVESQUE on behalf of NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE (LEVESQUE, GEORGE)
November 16, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Uzoma N. Nkwonta.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4337177.) by BILL NELSON FOR U S SENATE. (NKWONTA, UZOMA)
November 16, 2018 Filing 8 Emergency MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew A. Fitzgerald.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4337147.) by NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit) (BARDOS, ANDY)
November 16, 2018 Filing 7 Emergency MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John D. Adams.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4337142.) by NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit) (BARDOS, ANDY)
November 16, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by KIMBERLY TOLLAND MYDOCK on behalf of NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE (MYDOCK, KIMBERLY)
November 16, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT ERIC BILIK on behalf of NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE (BILIK, ROBERT)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING EMERGENCY MOTION TO INTERVENE. This Court has considered, without hearing, The National Republican Senatorial Committees Emergency Motion to Intervene. ECF No. #3 . The motion is GRANTED. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/16/2018. (kjw)
November 16, 2018 Filing 3 Emergency MOTION to Intervene by NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE. (BARDOS, ANDY)
November 16, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (PERKO, GARY)
November 16, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by KEN DETZNER from Leon County Circuit Court, case number 2018-CA-002445. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4336753.), filed by KEN DETZNER. (PERKO, GARY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BILL NELSON FOR U S SENATE v. DETZNER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BILL NELSON FOR U S SENATE
Represented By: UZOMA NKEM NKWONTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEN DETZNER
Represented By: MALCOLM NOBLE MEANS
Represented By: MOHAMMAD OMAR JAZIL
Represented By: BRADLEY ROBERT MCVAY
Represented By: ASHLEY E DAVIS
Represented By: GARY VERGIL PERKO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PALM BEACH COUNTY CANVASSING BOARD
Represented By: ANDREW BAUMANN, I
Represented By: NATALIE KATO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUSAN M BUCHER
Represented By: ANDREW BAUMANN, I
Represented By: NATALIE KATO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE
Represented By: ROBERT ERIC BILIK
Represented By: KIMBERLY TOLLAND MYDOCK
Represented By: ANDY V BARDOS
Represented By: JASON BRETT TORCHINSKY
Represented By: GEORGE TY LEVESQUE
Represented By: JOHN DONLEY ADAMS
Represented By: MATTHEW ALLEN FITZGERALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?