KRESLIN v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: Martin Kreslin
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 4:2018cv00560
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
2 Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to lift stay by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (HARWIN, MICHAEL)
January 16, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings Deadline for clerk to check status of stay by 2/15/2019. (jcw)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REFERRAL AND ORDER granting #9 Motion to Stay. All proceedings in this matter are STAYED and all pending deadlines are TOLLED and extended commensurate with the duration of the lapse in appropriations. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 1/15/2019. (jcw)
January 15, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed re: #9 MOTION to Stay in Light of Lapse of Appropriations, #10 Summons Returned Executed as to USA, and #11 Summons Returned Executed. Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (cle)
January 14, 2019 ACTION NO LONGER REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed re: #10 Summons Returned Executed as to USA and #11 Summons Returned Executed. (cle) Modified on 1/15/2019 (cle).
January 14, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MARTIN KRESLIN. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA served on 12/12/2018, answer due 2/15/2019. (KALEKO, TALLEY)
January 14, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MARTIN KRESLIN. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA served on 12/17/2018, answer due 2/15/2019. (KALEKO, TALLEY)
January 14, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Stay in Light of Lapse of Appropriations by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (HARWIN, MICHAEL)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF RECUSAL. MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS recused. Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK for all further proceedings. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 12/27/2018. (ckm)
December 27, 2018 Filing 7 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT TO ATTORNEY KALEKO: Counsel should be advised by this entry that his CM/ECF address is different from the address listed on the pleadings. Please update in PACER. (ckm)
December 26, 2018 Filing 6 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed by MARTIN KRESLIN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (KALEKO, TALLEY)
December 7, 2018 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (KALEKO, TALLEY)
December 7, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA - U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 SUMMONS). (cle)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: To Attorney KALEKO - re: #1 Complaint. Party names (including aliases) are to be added using all caps and no punctuation. (See "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing," available on Clerk's website.) The party names will be corrected by the clerk. Further, counsel is advised by this entry, that a Civil Cover Sheet must be filed as a separate entry using the event selection "Civil Cover Sheet" which is found under "Other Filings" under "Other Documents". PLEASE RE-FILE THE CIVIL COVER SHEET (cle)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by TALLEY LEE KALEKO on behalf of Martin Kreslin (KALEKO, TALLEY)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4350775.), filed by Martin Kreslin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons-AG, #5 Summons-Civil Process Clerk) (KALEKO, TALLEY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KRESLIN v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Kreslin
Represented By: TALLEY LEE KALEKO
Represented By: DEAN ROBERT LEBOEUF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: MICHAEL JAY HARWIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?