RICARDO v. JAMES MADISON INSTITUTE FOR PUBLIC POLICY STUDIES INC
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER RICARDO
Defendant: THE JAMES MADISON INSTITUTE FOR PUBLIC POLICY STUDIES, INC. and JAMES MADISON INSTITUTE FOR PUBLIC POLICY STUDIES INC
Case Number: 4:2018cv00571
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 38:4301
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Filing 10 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by JAMES MADISON INSTITUTE FOR PUBLIC POLICY STUDIES INC. (VAIL, JASON)
January 23, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by JAMES MADISON INSTITUTE FOR PUBLIC POLICY STUDIES INC. (VAIL, JASON)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 1/9/19. Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 1/23/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/22/2019. Discovery due by 5/9/2019. Status Report due by 2/8/2019. (amm)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT #6 : Defendant shall respond on or before 1/28/2019. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 1/9/19. (amm)
January 8, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by JAMES MADISON INSTITUTE FOR PUBLIC POLICY STUDIES INC. (VAIL, JASON)
January 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by JASON ERIC VAIL on behalf of JAMES MADISON INSTITUTE FOR PUBLIC POLICY STUDIES INC (VAIL, JASON)
December 19, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CHRISTOPHER RICARDO. JAMES MADISON INSTITUTE FOR PUBLIC POLICY STUDIES INC served on 12/18/2018, answer due 1/8/2019. (CRUZ, TIFFANY)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to THE JAMES MADISON INSTITUTE FOR PUBLIC POLICY STUDIES INC. (amm)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (CRUZ, TIFFANY)
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against THE JAMES MADISON INSTITUTE FOR PUBLIC POLICY STUDIES, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4356862.), filed by CHRISTOPHER RICARDO. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (CRUZ, TIFFANY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RICARDO v. JAMES MADISON INSTITUTE FOR PUBLIC POLICY STUDIES INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE JAMES MADISON INSTITUTE FOR PUBLIC POLICY STUDIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES MADISON INSTITUTE FOR PUBLIC POLICY STUDIES INC
Represented By: JASON ERIC VAIL
Represented By: MICHAEL MATTIMORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER RICARDO
Represented By: TIFFANY ROUSSEAU CRUZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?