HEALTH MANAGEMENT CORPORATION OF AMERICA LLC v. WEST
Plaintiff: HEALTH MANAGEMENT CORPORATION OF AMERICA, LLC and HEALTH MANAGEMENT CORPORATION OF AMERICA LLC
Defendant: LAURIE WEST
Case Number: 4:2018cv00602
Filed: December 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: ROBERT L HINKLE
Referring Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
2 Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF REMAND: This case is remanded to the Circuit Court, Second Judicial Circuit, Leon County, Florida. The clerk must take all steps necessary to effect the remand. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 1/8/19. *Order provided to Circuit Court. (amm)
January 8, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by LAURIE WEST. (JOHNSON, RICHARD)
January 5, 2019 Set Deadline - Show Cause Response due by 1/8/2019 re: #9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE CASE SHOULD NOT BE REMANDED (amm)
January 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 1/5/19. (mkb)
January 4, 2019 Filing 8 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Counsel is advised that for all future pleadings, for this case and any future cases assigned to Judge Hinkle, any exhibit attached to a document filing should be properly identified. (Example: Deposition of John Doe rather than Exhibit A.) (amm)
January 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE CORRECTED Notice of Filing Motion for Temporary Injunction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law and Affidavit of Xavier Rodrigo by HEALTH MANAGEMENT CORPORATION OF AMERICA, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (PRICE, TARA)
January 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Motion for Temporary Injunction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law and Affidavit of Xavier Rodrigo by HEALTH MANAGEMENT CORPORATION OF AMERICA, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (PRICE, TARA)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF DISQUALIFICATION. CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER recused. Case reassigned to JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE for all further proceedings. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 1/3/19. (amm)
January 3, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against HEALTH MANAGEMENT CORPORATION OF AMERICA, LLC by LAURIE WEST. (JOHNSON, RICHARD)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 1/2/19. Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 1/16/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/15/2019. Discovery due by 5/2/2019. (amm)
January 2, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re #1 Notice of Removal filed by LAURIE WEST: Counsel is advised by this entry, that a Civil Cover Sheet should be filed as a separate entry using the event selection "Civil Cover Sheet" which is found under "Other Filings" under "Other Documents". For future case openings: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or Chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide", (both available on the clerk's website) (amm)
December 30, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LAURIE WEST from Leon Circuit Civil, case number 2018 CA 002635. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4366585.), filed by LAURIE WEST. (JOHNSON, RICHARD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HEALTH MANAGEMENT CORPORATION OF AMERICA LLC v. WEST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAURIE WEST
Represented By: RICHARD ERROL JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEALTH MANAGEMENT CORPORATION OF AMERICA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEALTH MANAGEMENT CORPORATION OF AMERICA LLC
Represented By: TARA R PRICE
Represented By: LINDSAY DENNIS SWIGER
Represented By: MATTHEW GROSACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?