MUREITHI v. VITIELLO et al

Petitioner: MARTIN MUREITHI
Respondent: KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, WILLIAM BARR, JOHN KELLY, MATTHEW G. WHITAKER, WILLIAM P BARR, RONALD D VITIELLO and MATTHEW G WHITAKER
Case Number: 4:2019cv00080
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: CHARLES J KAHN
Referring Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
2 Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Filing 18 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. In light of Respondents' showing that Petitioner has been removed from the United States and is no longer held in detention, it is respectfully RECOMMENDED that the 2241 petition be DISMISSED as moot since Petitioner has been granted the relief sought in the petition. R&R flag set. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 3/28/2019. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 4/25/2019. (cle)
March 22, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss as Moot by WILLIAM P BARR, RONALD D VITIELLO. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 4/5/2019). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (REGISTER, LENNARD)
March 22, 2019 Filing 16 AMENDED DOCUMENT by WILLIAM P BARR, RONALD D VITIELLO. Notice of Appearance (REGISTER, LENNARD)
March 22, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by LENNARD B REGISTER, III on behalf of WILLIAM P BARR, MARTIN MUREITHI (REGISTER, LENNARD)
March 20, 2019 Filing 14 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Martin Mureithi and returned: #10 ORDER. The Petitioner has been deported.
March 19, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: #13 Mail Returned. **Per ICE Officer, Petitioner was deported to Kenya on 3/4/2019.** (kjw)
March 18, 2019 Filing 13 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Attempted, not known, unable to forward. Mail sent to MARTIN MUREITHI Re: #9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. (alb)
March 11, 2019 Filing 12 Summons for USA Lawrence Keefe, re: #11 Summons Issued as to USA. (kjw)
March 7, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to RONALD D VITIELLO, WILLIAM P BARR, and U.S. Attorney. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Barr) (kjw)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. Petitioner's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, ECF No. #2 , is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court shall substitute ICE Deputy Director Ronald D. Vitiello in place of Respondent DHS Secretary Kirstjen Nielsen. The Clerk of Court shall substitute current United States Attorney William P. Barr in place of Respondent former United States Attorney Matthew G. Whitaker. The Clerk of Court shall prepare and send sufficient copies of this Order, the petition, ECF No. #1 , and summons to Attorney General of the United States William P. Barr and ICE Deputy Director Ronald D. Vitiello. The Clerk of Court shall also prepare a copy of this Order, the petition, ECF No. #1 , and summons, and send those copies to the United States Attorney for this District who shall have until 5/8/2019 in which to file an answer or similar response to the petition which shows good cause as to why the relief sought by Petitioner should not be granted. Petitioner shall have until 6/7/2019 in which to file a reply to the answer or response filed by Respondents. (Notify Chambers on 5/8/2019.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 3/6/2019. (kjw) *Documents prepared and distributed as directed.
March 5, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: #9 Order Reassigning Case. (alb)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON for all further proceedings. MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES J KAHN, JR no longer assigned to case. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 3/1/2019. Motions referred to HOPE T CANNON. (erl)**Please use the new judge's initials for all future filings: 4:19cv80-MW/HTC.
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. The clerk shall correct the docket to reflect the appropriate Nature of Suit (NOS) code of 463, and shall reassign this case to the appropriate United States Magistrate Judge who is referred habeas corpus-alien detainee cases (NOS 463). Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS for all further proceedings. MAGISTRATE JUDGE Charles J Kahn no longer assigned to case. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES J KAHN, JR on 3/1/2019. Motions referred to CHARLES A STAMPELOS. (alb)
February 21, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES J KAHN, JR notified that action is needed Re: #2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Referred to CHARLES J KAHN, JR. (alb)
February 21, 2019 Filing 7 Notice to Pro Se Litigant. (alb)
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of MIDDLE FLORIDA; Case Number 3:19-CV-163-J-25MCR. Original file and copy of transfer order received. (alb)
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 Case electronically transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 3:19-cv-00163. Original Petition and Order received.
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER transferring case to the Northern District of Florida, with instructions to the Clerk. Signed by Senior Judge Henry Lee Adams, Jr. on 2/7/2019. (MO) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 2/21/2019.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 1. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 02/07/2019.(MO) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 2/21/2019.]
February 6, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency by Martin Mureithi. (KKH) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 2/21/2019.]
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus -Federal. filed by Martin Mureithi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (No service copies provided. Postmarked 2/4/19) (KKH) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 2/21/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MUREITHI v. VITIELLO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: KIRSTJEN NIELSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JOHN KELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MATTHEW G. WHITAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM P BARR
Represented By: LENNARD B REGISTER, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: RONALD D VITIELLO
Represented By: LENNARD B REGISTER, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MATTHEW G WHITAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MARTIN MUREITHI
Represented By: LENNARD B REGISTER, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?