NELSON v. FLORIDA STATE PRISON et al

Plaintiff: JAMES NELSON
Defendant: ADAMS, LINSEY, STATE OF FLORIDA, MATHEW, RONNIE RUSSEL, FLORIDA STATE PRISON, BARNS, FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, COKEKER, WHITE, COX and DICKS
Case Number: 4:2019cv00082
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
0 Judge: ROBERT L HINKLE
1 Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S JUDGMENT pursuant to #6 Order of Dismissal. 90 Day Exhibit Return Deadline set for 6/24/2019 (rcb)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The #4 report and recommendation is accepted and adopted as the courts opinion. The clerk must enter judgment stating, "The complaint is dismissed without prejudice." The clerk must close the file.. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 03/26/2019. (rcb)
March 21, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Appeal construed as an OBJECTION to #4 Report and Recommendations by JAMES NELSON. (rcb)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. It is respectfully RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, ECF No. #2 , be DENIED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(g) and this case summarily DISMISSED. It is further RECOMMENDED that the Order adopting this Report and Recommendation direct the Clerk of Court to note on the docket that this cause was dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). R&R flag set. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 03/07/2019. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 4/4/2019. (rcb)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se (amm)
February 12, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #1 Complaint. Referred to CHARLES A STAMPELOS. (amm)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JAMES NELSON. (amm)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by JAMES NELSON. (No service copies provided) (amm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NELSON v. FLORIDA STATE PRISON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES NELSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF FLORIDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATHEW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONNIE RUSSEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLORIDA STATE PRISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COKEKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WHITE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DICKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?