BODERICK v. GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY
Plaintiff: CLEONDENISE BODERICK
Defendant: GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY
Case Number: 4:2019cv00158
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
2 Judge: ALLEN C WINSOR
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR for all further proceedings. CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER no longer assigned to case. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 6/28/19. **Please use the new judge's initials for all future filings: 4:19cv158-AW/MJF. (pll)
June 14, 2019 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #24 MOTION to Sever and Remand Count I filed by GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. (FISCHER, IAN)
June 13, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 7/15/2019. (rcb)
June 13, 2019 Filing 27 JOINT STATUS REPORT on Status of Discovery by GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. (TROWELL, LINDSEY) Modified to correct title on 6/14/2019 (rcb).
June 4, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by CLEONDENISE BODERICK re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Attachments: #1 Supplement case law) (JEEVES, SCOTT)
May 31, 2019 Set Response to Motion Deadline as to #24 MOTION to Sever and Remand Count I. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 6/14/2019). (toy)
May 31, 2019 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by CLEONDENISE BODERICK. (JEEVES, SCOTT)
May 31, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Sever and Remand Count I by CLEONDENISE BODERICK. (ROTHBURD, CRAIG)
May 30, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in Support of Motion to Dismiss by GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schenck v. Windhaven Ins. Co.) (TROWELL, LINDSEY)
May 29, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in Support of Motion to Dismiss by GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sigler v. GECIO) (TROWELL, LINDSEY)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MODIFIED SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER. The class certification discovery deadline is extended to December 10, 2019. The class certification expert discovery deadline is extended to May 11, 2020. The case management report, ECF No. #20 , will control the matters it addresses, except to the extent of any conflict with this order. The motion for class certification shall be filed no later than June 10, 2020. The response is due July 24, 2020 and the reply due on August 24,2020. The deadline for filing summary-judgment motions shall be set by separate order after the class certification issue is resolved.( (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 7/24/2020)., Class Certification Motion due by 6/10/2020., Reply due by 8/24/2020.) Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 05/24/2019. (toy)
May 23, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed Re: #20 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (kjw)
May 22, 2019 Filing 20 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Proposed Schedule, #2 Defendant's Proposed Schedule) (ROTHBURD, CRAIG)
May 20, 2019 Filing 19 RULE 26 Disclosures by GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. (TROWELL, LINDSEY)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. The #14 motion is GRANTED. Mr. Goldfine has fulfilled the requirements of the Local Rules for admission and is admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Defendant. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 05/16/2019. (toy)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. The #15 motion is GRANTED. Mr. Fischer has fulfilled the requirements of the Local Rules for admission and is admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Defendant. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 05/16/2019. (toy)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. The #13 motion is GRANTED. Mr. Blakley has fulfilled the requirements of the Local Rules for admission and is admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Defendant. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 05/16/2019. (toy)
May 16, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ian Fischer.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4493501.) by GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (TROWELL, LINDSEY)
May 16, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4493496.) by GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order) (TROWELL, LINDSEY)
May 16, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4493488.) by GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (TROWELL, LINDSEY)
May 13, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings Status Report due by 6/13/2019. (toy)
May 10, 2019 Filing 12 STATUS REPORT on Status of Discovery by GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. (TROWELL, LINDSEY)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ADMITTING J.R. WHALEY PRO HAC VICE. The motion #10 is GRANTED. Mr. Whaley has fulfilled the requirements of the Local Rules for admission and is admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Plaintiff. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 05/10/2019. (toy)
May 10, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J.R. Whaley.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4487317.) by CLEONDENISE BODERICK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1) (JEEVES, SCOTT)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #8 EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO #7 MOTION TO DISMISS ( Response to motion due by by 5/31/2019.) Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 05/08/2019. (toy)
May 8, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by CLEONDENISE BODERICK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss) (JEEVES, SCOTT) Modified on 5/9/2019 to match PDF title (toy).
April 30, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 5/14/2019). (toy)
April 30, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Policy) (TROWELL, LINDSEY)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #5 EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Defendant shall file its responsive pleading to the Complaint on or before April 30, 2019.( Answer due by 4/30/2019.) Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 04/15/2019. (toy)
April 12, 2019 Filing 5 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (TROWELL, LINDSEY)
April 10, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY INC, Corporate Parent GEICO CORPORATION for GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY.. (TROWELL, LINDSEY)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 4/24/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/24/2019. Discovery due by 8/8/2019. Status Report due by 5/10/2019. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 04/10/2019.(toy)
April 9, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (TROWELL, LINDSEY)
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY from Second Circuit, Leon County, Florida, case number 2019-CA-000570. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4451673.), filed by GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Record) (TROWELL, LINDSEY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BODERICK v. GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLEONDENISE BODERICK
Represented By: EDWARD HERBERT ZEBERSKY
Represented By: MARK S FISTOS
Represented By: SCOTT ROGER JEEVES
Represented By: CRAIG E ROTHBURD
Represented By: JOHN RANDALL WHALEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY
Represented By: LINDSEY R TROWELL
Represented By: IAN M FISCHER
Represented By: DAN W GOLDFINE
Represented By: KRISTEN LINDSAY WENGER
Represented By: JOHN PATRICK MARINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?