DAVIS v HOTWORX COLLEGE AVE LLC
Plaintiff: AMANDA DAVIS
Defendant: HOTWORX COLLEGE AVE LLC and HOTWORX COLLEGE AVE LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY doing business as HOTWORX TALLAHASSEE
Case Number: 4:2019cv00172
Filed: April 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: ROBERT L HINKLE
Referring Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 24 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by AMANDA DAVIS. (SHAMIS, ANDREW)
June 26, 2019 Filing 23 CLERK'S JUDGMENT re #22 Order Dismissing Case. 90 Day Exhibit Return Deadline set for 9/24/2019 (rcb)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER FOR DISMISSAL. The clerk must enter judgment stating, "The plaintiff Amanda Davis and the defendant Hotworx College Ave LLC are ordered to comply with their settlement agreement. The court reserves jurisdiction to enforce the order to comply with the settlement agreement. All claims between these parties are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41." The clerk must close the file. A party who objects to the terms of this order or the judgment to be entered based on this order must file a timely motion to alter or amend under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 59(e). Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 06/25/2019. (rcb)
June 24, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Settlement by AMANDA DAVIS (SHAMIS, ANDREW)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER. The motion to stay, ECF No. #9 , is denied. The deadline for the defendant to file a summary-judgment motion raising the issue of whether the defendant used an automatic telephone dialing system is July 18, 2019. The motion may address any other issue that feasibly can be addressed on the same schedule. The deadline for the plaintiff to respond to any such summary-judgment motion is 49 days after the motion is filed. (Summary Judgment Motions to be filed by 7/18/2019., Response to motion due by by 9/5/2019.) Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 06/17/2019. (rcb)
June 13, 2019 Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 6/13/2019. Court hears argument of counsel on #9 Motion to Stay Proceedings. Ruling by Court: The motion to stay is denied, the motion for class certification first is denied. The deadline to file a summary judgment motion is 7/18/2019. A response is due 49 days after the summary judgment motion is filed. An order is forthcoming (Court Reporter Megan Hague) (vkm)
June 11, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint, #6 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Motion to Stay All Deadlines Including Deadline to Respond to Complaint filed by AMANDA DAVIS. (SHAMIS, ANDREW)
June 6, 2019 Filing 17 JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT (SHAMIS, ANDREW) Modified to correct title on 6/7/2019 (rcb).
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER. It is ORDERED that the motion for leave to appear pro hac vice, ECF No. #8 , is GRANTED. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 06/05/2019. (rcb)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER. It is ORDERED that the motion for leave to appear pro hac vice, ECF No. #7 , is GRANTED. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 06/05/2019. (rcb)
June 3, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by HOTWORX COLLEGE AVE LLC. (THOMPSON, TREVOR)
May 31, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED DOCUMENT by HOTWORX COLLEGE AVE LLC. Amendment to #9 MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint, #6 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Motion to Stay All Deadlines Including Deadline to Respond to Complaint Ink-Signed Version of ECF No. 9-3 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Jernigan Declaration (ink-signed)) (THOMPSON, TREVOR)
May 30, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF HEARING (pursuant to #11 Order): Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 6/13/2019 02:00 PM before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE. Call in number: 888-684-8852Access code: 3243416#Security code: 0613# s/ Cindy MarkleyCourtroom Deputy Clerk (ckm)
May 29, 2019 Set Deadlines: Rule 26(f) Meeting Report due by 6/6/2019 (pursuant to #11 Order and 12 Notice of Hearing). (rcb)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REQUIRING AN ANSWER AND DIRECTING THE CLERK TO SET A RULE 16 CONFERENCE The defendant must file an answer by 6/4/2019. The clerk must set a Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16 pretrial and scheduling conference for the first available date on or after June 13, 2019. The conference will be conducted by telephone unless a consented motion to conduct the conference in person is filed at least two days before the conference. The parties must file the Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) report at least seven days before the conference. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 05/29/2019. (rcb)
May 29, 2019 Filing 10 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: ISO placed in Judge Hinkle's folder. (rcb)
May 28, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint, #6 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Motion to Stay All Deadlines Including Deadline to Respond to Complaint by HOTWORX COLLEGE AVE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Notice and Request for Comment, #2 Exhibit Second Notice and Request for Comment, #3 Exhibit Jernigan Declaration, #4 Exhibit Petition for Declaratory Ruling) (THOMPSON, TREVOR)
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Dirk D. Lasater.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4501085.) by HOTWORX COLLEGE AVE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Cert of Good Standing) (LASATER, DIRK)
May 16, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: #7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert C. Van Arnam.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4492622.) Referred to CHARLES A STAMPELOS. (rcb)
May 15, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert C. Van Arnam.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4492622.) by HOTWORX COLLEGE AVE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Cert of Good Standing) (VAN ARNAM, ROBERT)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER EXTENDING THE DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT. The defendant's unopposed motion, ECF No. #5 , to extend the deadline to respond to the complaint is granted. The deadline is extended to May 28, 2019. (Response to motion due by 5/28/2019. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 05/15/2019. (rcb)
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. by HOTWORX COLLEGE AVE LLC. (THOMPSON, TREVOR) Modified to correct title on 5/14/2019 (rcb).
April 29, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AMANDA DAVIS. HOTWORX COLLEGE AVE LLC served on 4/23/2019, answer due 5/14/2019. (SHAMIS, ANDREW)
April 19, 2019 Filing 3 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re #1 Complaint filed by Amanda Davis. Counsel is advised by this entry, the Civil Cover Sheet should be filed as a separate entry using the event selection "Civil Cover Sheet" which is found under "Other Filings" under "Other Documents". A reminder that party names (including aliases) are to be added using all caps and no punctuation. (See "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing," available on Clerk's website.) The party names will be corrected by the clerk. (rcb)
April 19, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Hotworx College Ave, LLC. (rcb)
April 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hotworx College Ave, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4463400.), filed by Amanda Davis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (SHAMIS, ANDREW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DAVIS v HOTWORX COLLEGE AVE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMANDA DAVIS
Represented By: ANDREW JOHN SHAMIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOTWORX COLLEGE AVE LLC
Represented By: TREVOR A THOMPSON
Represented By: DIRK D LASATER
Represented By: ROBERT VAN ARNAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOTWORX COLLEGE AVE LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY doing business as HOTWORX TALLAHASSEE
Represented By: TREVOR A THOMPSON
Represented By: DIRK D LASATER
Represented By: ROBERT VAN ARNAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?