TALLAHASSEE PEDIATRIC DENTISTRY PLLC v. AIRGAS USA LLC

Plaintiff: Tallahassee Pediatric Dentistry, PLLC and TALLAHASSEE PEDIATRIC DENTISTRY PLLC
Defendant: Airgas USA, LLC and AIRGAS USA LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00199
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S JUDGMENT - re: #5 ORDER CLOSING FILE. (cle)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER CLOSING FILE - Plaintiff has filed a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal dismissing without prejudice this action. ECF No. #4 . Inasmuch as the defendant has not filed an answer or motion for summary judgment, the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal is effective without an order. The Clerk must enter judgment stating, "This case is dismissed without prejudice under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)." The Clerk must close the file. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 5/1/2019. (cle)
May 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by TALLAHASSEE PEDIATRIC DENTISTRY PLLC (ARMSTRONG, NICHOLAS)
April 30, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (ARMSTRONG, NICHOLAS)
April 30, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: To: ATTORNEY ARMSTRONG - re: #1 Complaint. Party names (including aliases) are to be added using all caps and no punctuation. (See "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing," available on Clerk's website.) The party names will be corrected by the clerk. Further, counsel is advised by this entry, that a Civil Cover Sheet must be filed as a separate entry using the event selection "Civil Cover Sheet" which is found under "Other Filings" under "Other Documents". PLEASE FILE A SIGNED CIVIL COVER SHEET. (cle)
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Airgas USA, LLC (Filing fee $400.), filed by Tallahassee Pediatric Dentistry, PLLC. (ARMSTRONG, NICHOLAS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TALLAHASSEE PEDIATRIC DENTISTRY PLLC v. AIRGAS USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Airgas USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIRGAS USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tallahassee Pediatric Dentistry, PLLC
Represented By: NICHOLAS WILLIAM ARMSTRONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TALLAHASSEE PEDIATRIC DENTISTRY PLLC
Represented By: NICHOLAS WILLIAM ARMSTRONG
Represented By: RYAN BLAKE HOBBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?