TALLAHASSEE PEDIATRIC DENTISTRY PLLC v. AIRGAS USA LLC

Plaintiff: TALLAHASSEE PEDIATRIC DENTISTRY PLLC
Defendant: AIRGAS USA LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00202
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by LONDON LEE OTT on behalf of AIRGAS USA LLC (OTT, LONDON)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DENYING #9 MOTION TO DISMISS AS MOOT. Since Plaintiff has filed its First Amended Class Action Complaint, ECF No. #13 , Defendants pending Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. #9 , is DENIED as moot. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 07/02/2019. (rcb)
July 1, 2019 Filing 13 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against AIRGAS USA LLC, filed by TALLAHASSEE PEDIATRIC DENTISTRY PLLC. (ARMSTRONG, NICHOLAS)
June 21, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by AIRGAS USA LLC identifying Corporate Parent Airgas, Inc, Corporate Parent L'Air Liquide S.A. for AIRGAS USA LLC.. (BASSEL FRICK, IRENE)
June 19, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by TALLAHASSEE PEDIATRIC DENTISTRY PLLC. (HOBBS, RYAN)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 06/18/2019. Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 7/2/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/1/2019. Discovery due by 10/16/2019. Status Report due by 7/18/2019. (rcb)
June 18, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed Re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law (rcb)
June 18, 2019 Motions No Longer Referred to Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS: #9 MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law **Case Action Required to Judge Charles A Stampelos in error** (rcb)
June 18, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law. Referred to CHARLES A STAMPELOS. (rcb)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by AIRGAS USA LLC. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 7/1/2019). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (BASSEL FRICK, IRENE)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION. This Court has considered, without hearing, Defendant's unopposed motion for an extension of time to respond to complaint. ECF No. #7 . The motion is GRANTED. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's complaint no later than June 17, 2019 (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 6/17/2019).)Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 06/04/2019. (rcb)
June 3, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint (UNOPPOSED) by AIRGAS USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (BASSEL FRICK, IRENE)
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME by TALLAHASSEE PEDIATRIC DENTISTRY PLLC (HOBBS, RYAN)
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TALLAHASSEE PEDIATRIC DENTISTRY PLLC. AIRGAS USA LLC served on 5/15/2019, answer due 6/5/2019. (ARMSTRONG, NICHOLAS)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to AIRGAS USA LLC. (rcb)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE - Request for Summons by TALLAHASSEE PEDIATRIC DENTISTRY PLLC (HOBBS, RYAN)
May 1, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (ARMSTRONG, NICHOLAS)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AIRGAS USA LLC (Filing fee $400.), filed by TALLAHASSEE PEDIATRIC DENTISTRY PLLC. (ARMSTRONG, NICHOLAS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TALLAHASSEE PEDIATRIC DENTISTRY PLLC v. AIRGAS USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIRGAS USA LLC
Represented By: LONDON LEE OTT
Represented By: IRENE ADEL BASSEL FRICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TALLAHASSEE PEDIATRIC DENTISTRY PLLC
Represented By: NICHOLAS WILLIAM ARMSTRONG
Represented By: RYAN BLAKE HOBBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?