PEDRO v. MCALEENAN et al

Petitioner: SULE AUGUSTO PEDRO
Respondent: YESEIRA DIAZ, WILLIAM BARR and KEVIN MCALEENAN
Case Number: 4:2019cv00248
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: ROBERT L HINKLE
Referring Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by LENNARD B REGISTER, III on behalf of WILLIAM BARR, YESEIRA DIAZ, KEVIN MCALEENAN (REGISTER, LENNARD)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - It is respectfully RECOMMENDED that this case be DISMISSED for failure to prosecute and failure to comply with a Court Order. R&R flag set. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 07/09/2019. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 8/6/2019. (toy)
July 8, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: #3 Order. *No Fee/IFP* (toy)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. The Clerk of Court shall provide Petitioner with an in forma pauperis application packet. Petitioner shall have until June 27, 2019, in which to either pay the filing fee for this case, or file a motion requesting leave to proceed with in forma pauperis status. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon Petitioner's compliance with this Order, or no later than June 27, 2019.( Notify Chambers on 6/27/2019., Fee/IFP due by 6/27/2019.)Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 05/30/2019. (toy) *Form provided as instructed*
May 29, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (toy)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 Notice to Pro Se (toy)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by SULE AUGUSTO PEDRO. (No Fee/IFP, NO service copies) (toy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PEDRO v. MCALEENAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: YESEIRA DIAZ
Represented By: LENNARD B REGISTER, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM BARR
Represented By: LENNARD B REGISTER, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: KEVIN MCALEENAN
Represented By: LENNARD B REGISTER, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SULE AUGUSTO PEDRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?