CAMARON AT WOODCREST LLC v. PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: CAMARON AT WOODCREST LLC
Defendant: PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 4:2019cv00267
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 First MOTION to Remand to State Court Leon County filed by PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY. (CURTIS, LAUREN)
July 8, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF ALFRED TRANQUILLO by CAMARON AT WOODCREST LLC re #6 First MOTION to Remand to State Court Leon County (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A Signed Affidavit of Alfred Tranquillo) (MORELLO, FREDERICK)
July 3, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVITS OF ELIZABETH ROBERTS AND FRANK ROBERTS by CAMARON AT WOODCREST LLC re #6 First MOTION to Remand to State Court Leon County (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A Signed Affidavit of Elizabeth Roberts, #2 Affidavit Exhibit B Signed Affidavit of Frank Roberts) (MORELLO, FREDERICK)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO MOTION TO REMAND. This Court has considered, without hearing, Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. ECF No. #12 . The motion is GRANTED. Defendant shall file its response on or before 7/23/2019. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 7/2/19. (blb)
July 2, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Extend Timeto Respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY. (CURTIS, LAUREN)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ENLARGMENT OF TIME AND STAYING ALL DEADLINES. This Court has considered, without hearing, Plaintiff's unopposed motion requesting an enlargement of time pursuant to Local Rule 6.1 for all matters. ECF No. #10 . The motion is GRANTED. All deadlines in this matter are stayed until this Court determines whether or not it has subject matter jurisdiction. If this Court determines it has subject matter jurisdiction, the deadlines will be extended by 21 days after such an order. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 6/28/19. (blb)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 UNOPPOSED First MOTION to Extend TimePursuant to L.R.6.1 for all matters pending this Honorable Court's decision on subject matter jurisdiction by CAMARON AT WOODCREST LLC. (MORELLO, FREDERICK) Modified on 6/28/2019 (blb). *Edit Title*
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent Tokio Marine Group for PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY.. (CURTIS, LAUREN)
June 25, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #6 First MOTION to Remand to State Court Leon County. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 7/9/2019). (blb)
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Unavailability of Plaintiff's Counsel by CAMARON AT WOODCREST LLC (MORELLO, FREDERICK)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by CAMARON AT WOODCREST LLC. (MORELLO, FREDERICK)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 First MOTION to Remand to State Court Leon County by CAMARON AT WOODCREST LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit) (MORELLO, FREDERICK)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (CURTIS, LAUREN)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (CURTIS, LAUREN)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 6/26/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/26/2019. Discovery due by 10/10/2019. Status Report due by 7/12/2019. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 6/12/19. (blb)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Attorney Curtis Re #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL- Counsel is advised by this entry, that a Civil Cover Sheet should be filed as a separate entry using the event selection "Civil Cover Sheet" which is found under "Other Filings" under "Other Documents". PLEASE FILE THE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Further, for future case openings: Please review the procedure the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or Chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide", (both available on the clerk's website). (blb)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY from SECOND JUDICIAL CIRCUIT, LEON COUNTY, FL, case number 20019-CA-000204. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4518333.), filed by PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (CURTIS, LAUREN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CAMARON AT WOODCREST LLC v. PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAMARON AT WOODCREST LLC
Represented By: FREDERICK C MORELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: LAUREN STITT CURTIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?