MENDEZ v. DESANTIS et al
Petitioner: LUIS A MENDEZ
Respondent: CRAIG LATIMER, LAUREL M LEE and RON DESANTIS
Case Number: 4:2019cv00272
Filed: June 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: ROBERT L HINKLE
Referring Judge: WILLIAM STAFFORD
2 Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING TERMS OF CONSOLIDATION, RULE 26(f) DEADLINES, AND A SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. These cases are consolidated for case-management purposes only and will be maintained on a common docket under Consolidated Case No. 4:19cv300. The deadline for a Rule 26(f) conference among attorneys for all parties in any of these cases is 8/5/2019. The deadline to file the 26(f) report is 8/12 /2019. By a separate notice, the clerk must set a scheduling conference by telephone for 8/15/2019 11:00 AMat 11:00 a.m.in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE.) Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 07/23/2019. (rcb)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF DISQUALIFICATION. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 7/17/2019. (kjw) **Order docketed in Lead Case and Consolidated Cases.** Case reassigned to JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE for all further proceedings. CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER no longer assigned to case. **Please use the new judge's initials for future filings - 4:19cv272-RH/CAS.
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER CONSOLIDATING REASSIGNED CASE WITH COMMON DOCKET. The Clerk is directed to take all necessary steps to consolidate Case No. 4:19cv272 with Case No. 4:19cv300, the common docket, for the purposes of case management. The Clerk is directed to connect all lawyers from the consolidated case to Case No. 4:19cv300. A paper that is applicable to the consolidated case must be filed in the common docket and must not be filed separately. Cases associated., Set Consolidated Flags. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 07/03/2019. (rcb)
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by BRADLEY ROBERT MCVAY on behalf of LAUREL M LEE (MCVAY, BRADLEY)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF DISQUALIFICATION.I hereby disqualify myself from participation as a judge in this case.SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD recused. Case reassigned to CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER for all further proceedings. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD on 07/03/2019. (rcb)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Related Cases by LAUREL M LEE (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by MOHAMMAD OMAR JAZIL on behalf of LAUREL M LEE (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by ASHLEY E DAVIS on behalf of LAUREL M LEE (DAVIS, ASHLEY)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to RON DESANTIS. (rcb)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to LAUREL M LEE. (rcb)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to CRAIG LATIMER. (rcb)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number FLN400036960. Fee status updated to paid. (rcb)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summon for Craig Latimer, #2 Proposed Summon for Laurel Lee, #3 Proposed Summon for Ron Desantis) (STEINBERG, MICHAEL)
June 15, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Injunctive Relief, Declaratory Relief, and Mandamus ( Filing fee $47; receipt number AFLNDC-4522271.), filed by Luis A Mendez. (STEINBERG, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MENDEZ v. DESANTIS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CRAIG LATIMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: LAUREL M LEE
Represented By: ASHLEY E DAVIS
Represented By: BRADLEY ROBERT MCVAY
Represented By: MOHAMMAD OMAR JAZIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: RON DESANTIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: LUIS A MENDEZ
Represented By: MICHAEL A STEINBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?