RUSS v. JV & SONS INC
Plaintiff: Alane Russ
Defendant: JV & Sons, Inc. and JV & SONS INC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00292
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: ROBERT L HINKLE
Referring Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S JUDGMENT re #6 Order Dismissing Case, 90 Day Exhibit Return Deadline set for 10/21/2019 (rcb)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR DISMISSAL. The clerk must enter judgment stating, "The parties are ordered to comply with their settlement agreement. The court reserves jurisdiction to enforce the order to comply with the settlement agreement. All claims in this case are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41". The clerk must close the file. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 07/22/2019. (rcb) Modified on 7/22/2019 (rcb).
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 Plaintiff's Notice of Resolution by ALANE RUSS (MATTOX, MARIE) Modified to correct title on 7/5/2019 (rcb).
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER :. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 06/28/2019. Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 7/12/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/12/2019. Discovery due by 10/23/2019. (rcb)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: ISO placed in Judge Hinkle's folder (rcb)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT TO ATTORNEY KEVIN JOHNSON: Counsel is advised that for all future pleadings in this case and any future cases assigned to Judge Hinkle, exhibits attached to a document filing should be properly identified in the docket text when posting the document. (Example: Deposition of John Doe rather than Exhibit A or Exhibit 1.) (rcb)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JV & Sons, Inc. from Second Judicial Circuit, Gadsden County, case number 19-CA-000519. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4530349.), filed by JV & Sons, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 1) (JOHNSON, KEVIN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RUSS v. JV & SONS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alane Russ
Represented By: MARIE A MATTOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JV & Sons, Inc.
Represented By: KEVIN DAVID JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JV & SONS INC
Represented By: KEVIN DAVID JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?