JONES et al v. DESANTIS et al
Plaintiff: Kelvin Leon Jones, LEE HOFFMAN, JEFF GRUVER, DIANE SHERRILL, FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, BETTY RIDDLE, KRISTOPHER WRENCH, KAREN LEICHT, EMORY MARQUIS MITCHELL, SHEILA SINGLETON, JERMAINE MILLER, RAQUEL WRIGHT, KEITH IVEY, ROSEMARY MCCOY, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF FLORIDA, ORANGE COUNTY BRANCH OF THE NAACP, CLIFFORD TYSON, STEVEN PHALEN, LUIS A MENDEZ and BONNIE RAYSOR
Defendant: LAUREL M LEE, CRAIG LATIMER, PETER ANTONACCI, CHRISTINA WHITE, MARK EARLEY, LESLIE ROSSWAY SWAN, RON DESANTIS, KIM A BARTON, BILL COWLES, MICHAEL BENNETT, RON TURNER and MIKE HOGAN
Respondent: Governor RON DESANTIS
Case Number: 4:2019cv00300
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: ROBERT L HINKLE
2 Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28:1651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 113 NOTICE of Appearance by GEENA MARCELA CESAR on behalf of KIM A BARTON (CESAR, GEENA)
August 21, 2019 Filing 112 NOTICE Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel by Adam Katzman, Nathaniel Klitsberg, and Rene Harrod by PETER ANTONACCI re #83 Notice of Appearance (KATZMAN, ADAM)
August 20, 2019 Filing 111 NOTICE of Appearance by SUMMER DENAY BROWN on behalf of MARK EARLEY (HERRON, MARK) Modified on 8/20/2019 to correct filer (toy).
August 19, 2019 Filing 110 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Scheduling Conference Proceedings held on 8/15/2019 before Judge Robert L. Hinkle. Court Reporter: Judy Gagnon, Telephone number: 850-561-6822. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/26/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/25/2019. (kjw)
August 19, 2019 Filing 109 NOTICE OF HEARING on #108 Motion for Preliminary Injunction: Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 10/7/2019 09:00 AM before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE, United States Courthouse, Courtroom 5 East, 111 North Adams St., Tallahassee, Florida 32301. NOTE: If you or any party, witness or attorney in this matter has a disability that requires special accommodation, such as a hearing impairment that requires a sign language interpreter or a wheelchair restriction that requires ramp access, please contact Cindy Markley at 850-521-3501 in the Clerk's Office at least one week prior to the hearing (or as soon as possible) so arrangements can be made. s/ Cindy MarkleyCourtroom Deputy Clerk (ckm)
August 16, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Declaration/Exhibits/Witness Lists/26(a)(2) Disclosures due by 9/16/2019. Rebuttal Evidence Deadline - by 9/23/2019. Preliminary - Injuction Hearing set for 10/7/2019 09:00 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE. (toy) (Set per ECF#107 )
August 16, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #108 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 9/6/2019). Reply, if any due by 9/23/2019. (Set by ECF#107 ) (toy)
August 16, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #97 Joint MOTION to Dismiss (Florida Governor & Florida Secretary of State). (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 8/29/2019). Reply, if any due by 9/23/2019. (Set per ECF#107 ) (toy)
August 15, 2019 Filing 108 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, JEFF GRUVER, KEITH IVEY, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF FLORIDA, KAREN LEICHT, JERMAINE MILLER, EMORY MARQUIS MITCHELL, ORANGE COUNTY BRANCH OF THE NAACP, STEVEN PHALEN, BETTY RIDDLE, CLIFFORD TYSON, KRISTOPHER WRENCH, RAQUEL WRIGHT. (EBENSTEIN, JULIE)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 107 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER denying #96 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying #102 Motion to Stay; denying #102 Motion for Protective Order. The Initial Scheduling Order is VACATED. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 8/15/19. (sms)
August 15, 2019 Filing 106 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 8/15/2019. An Order is forthcoming. (Court Reporter Judy Gagnon.) (kjw)
August 12, 2019 Filing 105 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (SWEREN-BECKER, ELIZA)
August 8, 2019 Filing 104 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE on BRAD MCVAY, on behalf of LAUREL M LEE on August 6, 2019. (toy)
August 7, 2019 Set Response to Motion Deadline as to #102 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery as it Relates to Supervisors of Elections MOTION for Protective Order . (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 8/21/2019). (toy)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER ALLOWING MEMORANDA OF EXCESSIVE LENGTH - Plaintiffs' unopposed motion, ECF No. #98 , for leave to file a preliminary-injunction memorandum that exceeds the word limit is granted. The memorandum, ECF No. #98 -1, is deemed properly filed as of August 2, 2019. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 8/7/2019. (cle)
August 7, 2019 Filing 102 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery as it Relates to Supervisors of Elections, MOTION for Protective Order by CHRISTINA WHITE. (ROSENTHAL, OREN)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER ENDING REQUIREMENTS TO FILE DISCOVERY STATUS REPORTS. The initial scheduling order, ECF No. #37 , is amended to delete the requirement to file monthly reports on the status of discovery. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 08/07/2019. (toy)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER DENYING THE #94 MOTION FOR A SCHEDULING AND BRIEFING ORDER. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 08/07/2019. (toy)
August 7, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings Status Report due by 9/7/2019. (toy)
August 6, 2019 Filing 99 STATUS REPORT (Joint Discovery Report for all Parties) by FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, JEFF GRUVER, KEITH IVEY, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF FLORIDA, KAREN LEICHT, JERMAINE MILLER, EMORY MARQUIS MITCHELL, ORANGE COUNTY BRANCH OF THE NAACP, STEVEN PHALEN, BETTY RIDDLE, CLIFFORD TYSON, KRISTOPHER WRENCH, RAQUEL WRIGHT. (MORALES-DOYLE, SEAN)
August 2, 2019 Set Response to Motion Deadline as to #96 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Supervisors of Elections' Consolidated Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 8/16/2019). (toy)
August 2, 2019 Filing 98 Corrected and Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File a Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction in Excess of the Word Limit by FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, JEFF GRUVER, KEITH IVEY, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF FLORIDA, KAREN LEICHT, JERMAINE MILLER, EMORY MARQUIS MITCHELL, ORANGE COUNTY BRANCH OF THE NAACP, STEVEN PHALEN, BETTY RIDDLE, CLIFFORD TYSON, KRISTOPHER WRENCH, RAQUEL WRIGHT. (Attachments: #1 Prop. Mem. in Supp. of Mot. for Prelim. Inj., #2 Carpenter Decl., #3 Ex. A Smith Rep., #4 Ex. B Gruver Decl., #5 Ex. C Mitchell Decl., #6 Ex. D Riddle Decl., #7 Ex. E Leicht Decl., #8 Ex. F Ivey Decl., #9 Ex. G Wrench Decl., #10 Ex. H Wright Decl., #11 Ex. I Phalen Decl., #12 Ex. J Miller Decl., #13 Ex. K Tyson Decl., #14 Ex. L McCoy Decl., #15 Ex. M Singleton Decl., #16 Ex. N Raysor Decl., #17 Ex. O Sherrill Decl., #18 Ex. P Hoffman Decl., #19 Ex. Q Neal Decl., #20 Ex. R Nweze Decl., #21 Ex. S Brigham, #22 Ex. T Feb. 11 Email, #23 Ex. U June 7 Email, #24 Ex. V Arrington Dep. Excerpts, #25 Ex. W Haughwout Decl., #26 Ex. X Bowie Decl., #27 Ex. Y July 2 Email) (EBENSTEIN, JULIE) Modified on 8/5/2019 to match the PDF title (toy).
August 2, 2019 Filing 97 Joint MOTION to Dismiss (Florida Governor & Florida Secretary of State) by LAUREL M LEE. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 8/16/2019). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD)
August 2, 2019 Filing 96 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Supervisors of Elections' Consolidated Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by PETER ANTONACCI, KIM A BARTON, MICHAEL BENNETT, BILL COWLES, MARK EARLEY, MIKE HOGAN, CRAIG LATIMER, LESLIE ROSSWAY SWAN, RON TURNER. (KATZMAN, ADAM)
August 2, 2019 Filing 95 Emergency MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re: Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, JEFF GRUVER, KEITH IVEY, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF FLORIDA, KAREN LEICHT, JERMAINE MILLER, EMORY MARQUIS MITCHELL, ORANGE COUNTY BRANCH OF THE NAACP, STEVEN PHALEN, BETTY RIDDLE, CLIFFORD TYSON, KRISTOPHER WRENCH, RAQUEL WRIGHT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (EBENSTEIN, JULIE)
July 26, 2019 Set Response to Motion Deadline as to #94 MOTION for a Scheduling and Briefing Order . (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 8/9/2019). (toy)
July 26, 2019 Filing 94 MOTION for a Scheduling and Briefing Order by FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, JEFF GRUVER, KEITH IVEY, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF FLORIDA, KAREN LEICHT, JERMAINE MILLER, EMORY MARQUIS MITCHELL, ORANGE COUNTY BRANCH OF THE NAACP, STEVEN PHALEN, BETTY RIDDLE, CLIFFORD TYSON, KRISTOPHER WRENCH, RAQUEL WRIGHT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (EBENSTEIN, JULIE)
July 25, 2019 Filing 93 NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 8/15/2019 11:00 AM before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE. Call in number: 888-684-8852Access code: 3243416#Security code: 0815# s/ Cindy MarkleyCourtroom Deputy Clerk (ckm)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER SETTING TERMS OF CONSOLIDATION, RULE 26(f) DEADLINES, AND A SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. These cases are consolidated for case-management purposes only and will be maintained on a common docket under Consolidated Case No. 4:19cv300. The deadline for a Rule 26(f) conference among attorneys for all parties in any of these cases is August 5, 2019. The deadline to file the 26(f) report is August 12, 2019. By a separate notice, the clerk must set a scheduling conference by telephone for August 15, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/12/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 8/15/2019 11:00 AM before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 07/23/2019. (toy)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER EXTENDING THE DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINTS. The defendants' unopposed motion, ECF No. #89 , to extend the deadline to respond to the amended complaint in No. 4:19cv300 is granted. The deadline for these defendants to respond to the pending complaint in any of the consolidated cases is the later of August 2, 2019 or the deadline that would have applied in the absence of this order. ( (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 8/2/2019).) Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 07/22/2019. (toy)
July 19, 2019 Filing 90 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, JEFF GRUVER, KEITH IVEY, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF FLORIDA, KAREN LEICHT, JERMAINE MILLER, EMORY MARQUIS MITCHELL, ORANGE COUNTY BRANCH OF THE NAACP, STEVEN PHALEN, BETTY RIDDLE, CLIFFORD TYSON, KRISTOPHER WRENCH, RAQUEL WRIGHT. (ADEN, LEAH)
July 19, 2019 Filing 89 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #84 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint by PETER ANTONACCI. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (KATZMAN, ADAM)
July 18, 2019 Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by CORBIN FREDERICK HANSON on behalf of KIM A BARTON (HANSON, CORBIN)
July 17, 2019 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by TARA R PRICE on behalf of PETER ANTONACCI, LAUREL M LEE (PRICE, TARA)
July 17, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE notified that action is needed Re: #86 Order of Disqualification. (toy)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER OF DISQUALIFICATION. Case reassigned to JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE for all further proceedings. CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER no longer assigned to case. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 07/17/2019. *For future filings please use the new judge's initials 4-19-cv-300-RH-MJF* (toy)
July 17, 2019 Filing 85 NOTICE OF CANCELLED HEARING: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 7/19/2019 12:00 PM before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER is CANCELLED . (vkm)
July 16, 2019 Filing 84 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against LAUREL M LEE, filed by BONNIE RAYSOR, DIANE SHERRILL, LEE HOFFMAN. (DUNN, CHAD)
July 16, 2019 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by GEORGE N MEROS, JR on behalf of PETER ANTONACCI, LAUREL M LEE (MEROS, GEORGE)
July 16, 2019 Filing 82 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Mike Hogan on July 11, 2019, filed by ROSEMARY MCCOY, SHEILA SINGLETON. (SHORT, CAREN)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER GRANTING #80 ADMISSION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Ms. Bowie has fulfilled the requirements of the Local Rules for admission and is admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Plaintiffs Bonnie Raysor and Diane Sherrill. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 07/16/2019. (toy)
July 16, 2019 Filing 80 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Blair Bowie.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4552740.) by BONNIE RAYSOR, DIANE SHERRILL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Certificate of Good Standing)) (BOWIE, BLAIR)
July 15, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: PETER ANTONACCI answer due 7/22/2019; KIM A BARTON answer due 7/23/2019; MICHAEL BENNETT answer due 7/22/2019; BILL COWLES answer due 7/22/2019; MARK EARLEY answer due 7/22/2019; MIKE HOGAN answer due 7/23/2019; CRAIG LATIMER answer due 7/22/2019; LESLIE ROSSWAY SWAN answer due 7/22/2019; RON TURNER answer due 7/22/2019; CHRISTINA WHITE answer due 7/22/2019. (toy)
July 15, 2019 Filing 79 AFFIDAVIT of Service on Christina White by FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, JEFF GRUVER, KEITH IVEY, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF FLORIDA, KAREN LEICHT, JERMAINE MILLER, EMORY MARQUIS MITCHELL, ORANGE COUNTY BRANCH OF THE NAACP, STEVEN PHALEN, BETTY RIDDLE, CLIFFORD TYSON, KRISTOPHER WRENCH, RAQUEL WRIGHT. (EBENSTEIN, JULIE)
July 15, 2019 Filing 78 AFFIDAVIT of Service on Ron Turner by FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, JEFF GRUVER, KEITH IVEY, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF FLORIDA, KAREN LEICHT, JERMAINE MILLER, EMORY MARQUIS MITCHELL, ORANGE COUNTY BRANCH OF THE NAACP, STEVEN PHALEN, BETTY RIDDLE, CLIFFORD TYSON, KRISTOPHER WRENCH, RAQUEL WRIGHT. (EBENSTEIN, JULIE)
July 15, 2019 Filing 77 AFFIDAVIT of Service on Leslie Rossway Swan by FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, JEFF GRUVER, KEITH IVEY, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF FLORIDA, KAREN LEICHT, JERMAINE MILLER, EMORY MARQUIS MITCHELL, ORANGE COUNTY BRANCH OF THE NAACP, STEVEN PHALEN, BETTY RIDDLE, CLIFFORD TYSON, KRISTOPHER WRENCH, RAQUEL WRIGHT. (EBENSTEIN, JULIE)
July 15, 2019 Filing 76 AFFIDAVIT of Service on Laurel M. Lee by FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, JEFF GRUVER, KEITH IVEY, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF FLORIDA, KAREN LEICHT, JERMAINE MILLER, EMORY MARQUIS MITCHELL, ORANGE COUNTY BRANCH OF THE NAACP, STEVEN PHALEN, BETTY RIDDLE, CLIFFORD TYSON, KRISTOPHER WRENCH, RAQUEL WRIGHT. (EBENSTEIN, JULIE)
July 15, 2019 Filing 75 AFFIDAVIT of Service on Craig Latimer by FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, JEFF GRUVER, KEITH IVEY, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF FLORIDA, KAREN LEICHT, JERMAINE MILLER, EMORY MARQUIS MITCHELL, ORANGE COUNTY BRANCH OF THE NAACP, STEVEN PHALEN, BETTY RIDDLE, CLIFFORD TYSON, KRISTOPHER WRENCH, RAQUEL WRIGHT. (EBENSTEIN, JULIE)
July 15, 2019 Filing 74 AFFIDAVIT of Service on Mike Hogan by FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, JEFF GRUVER, KEITH IVEY, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF FLORIDA, KAREN LEICHT, JERMAINE MILLER, EMORY MARQUIS MITCHELL, ORANGE COUNTY BRANCH OF THE NAACP, STEVEN PHALEN, BETTY RIDDLE, CLIFFORD TYSON, KRISTOPHER WRENCH, RAQUEL WRIGHT. (EBENSTEIN, JULIE)
July 15, 2019 Filing 73 AFFIDAVIT of Service on Mark Earley by FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, JEFF GRUVER, KEITH IVEY, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF FLORIDA, KAREN LEICHT, JERMAINE MILLER, EMORY MARQUIS MITCHELL, ORANGE COUNTY BRANCH OF THE NAACP, STEVEN PHALEN, BETTY RIDDLE, CLIFFORD TYSON, KRISTOPHER WRENCH, RAQUEL WRIGHT. (EBENSTEIN, JULIE)
July 15, 2019 Filing 72 AFFIDAVIT of Service on Bill Cowles by FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, JEFF GRUVER, KEITH IVEY, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF FLORIDA, KAREN LEICHT, JERMAINE MILLER, EMORY MARQUIS MITCHELL, ORANGE COUNTY BRANCH OF THE NAACP, STEVEN PHALEN, BETTY RIDDLE, CLIFFORD TYSON, KRISTOPHER WRENCH, RAQUEL WRIGHT. (EBENSTEIN, JULIE)
July 15, 2019 Filing 71 AFFIDAVIT of Service on Broward County Supervisor of Elections - PETER ANTONACCI by FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, JEFF GRUVER, KEITH IVEY, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF FLORIDA, KAREN LEICHT, JERMAINE MILLER, EMORY MARQUIS MITCHELL, ORANGE COUNTY BRANCH OF THE NAACP, STEVEN PHALEN, BETTY RIDDLE, CLIFFORD TYSON, KRISTOPHER WRENCH, RAQUEL WRIGHT. (EBENSTEIN, JULIE) Modified on 7/16/2019 to identify defendant served (toy).
July 15, 2019 Filing 70 AFFIDAVIT of Service on Michael Bennett by FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, JEFF GRUVER, KEITH IVEY, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF FLORIDA, KAREN LEICHT, JERMAINE MILLER, EMORY MARQUIS MITCHELL, ORANGE COUNTY BRANCH OF THE NAACP, STEVEN PHALEN, BETTY RIDDLE, CLIFFORD TYSON, KRISTOPHER WRENCH, RAQUEL WRIGHT. (EBENSTEIN, JULIE)
July 15, 2019 Filing 69 AFFIDAVIT of Service on Kim A. Barton by FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, JEFF GRUVER, KEITH IVEY, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF FLORIDA, KAREN LEICHT, JERMAINE MILLER, EMORY MARQUIS MITCHELL, ORANGE COUNTY BRANCH OF THE NAACP, STEVEN PHALEN, BETTY RIDDLE, CLIFFORD TYSON, KRISTOPHER WRENCH, RAQUEL WRIGHT. (EBENSTEIN, JULIE)
July 15, 2019 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by MORGAN RAY BENTLEY on behalf of RON TURNER (BENTLEY, MORGAN)
July 15, 2019 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by MORGAN RAY BENTLEY on behalf of MICHAEL BENNETT (BENTLEY, MORGAN)
July 15, 2019 Filing 66 NOTICE [Supplemental] of Compliance with Court's Direction by LAUREL M LEE re #63 Notice (Other) (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER DENYING #36 MOTION FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY AS MOOT. In light of the Secretary's Notice of Compliance, ECF No. #63 , indicating that the Gruver Plaintiffs "have agreed to withdraw their Motion for Expedited Discovery... and intend to abide by this Court's Initial Scheduling Order," Plaintiffs' motion, ECF No. #36 , is DENIED as moot. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 07/15/2019. (toy)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. RE ECF NO. #62 . (Appointed RODKANGYIL ORION DANJUMA for FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, JEFF GRUVER,KEITH IVEY,LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF FLORIDA, KAREN LEICHT, JERMAINE MILLER, EMORY MARQUIS MITCHELL,ORANGE COUNTY BRANCH OF THE NAACP, STEVEN PHALEN,BETTY RIDDLE,CLIFFORD TYSON,KRISTOPHER WRENCH, and RAQUEL WRIGHT. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 07/12/2019. (toy)
July 12, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE of Compliance with Court's Direction by LAUREL M LEE re #39 Status Conference,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD)
July 12, 2019 Filing 62 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by R. Orion Danjuma.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4549981.) by FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, JEFF GRUVER, KEITH IVEY, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF FLORIDA, KAREN LEICHT, JERMAINE MILLER, EMORY MARQUIS MITCHELL, ORANGE COUNTY BRANCH OF THE NAACP, STEVEN PHALEN, BETTY RIDDLE, CLIFFORD TYSON, KRISTOPHER WRENCH, RAQUEL WRIGHT. (Attachments: #1 Danjuma Certificate of Good Standing) (DANJUMA, RODKANGYIL)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER GRANTING #60 ADMISSION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Mr. Morales-Doyle has fulfilled the requirements of the Local Rules for admission and is admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Plaintiffs. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 07/11/2019. (toy)
July 11, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings RON DESANTIS answer due 7/30/2019; LAUREL M LEE answer due 7/30/2019. (toy)
July 10, 2019 Filing 60 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sean Morales-Doyle.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4547537.) by FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, JEFF GRUVER, KEITH IVEY, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF FLORIDA, KAREN LEICHT, JERMAINE MILLER, EMORY MARQUIS MITCHELL, ORANGE COUNTY BRANCH OF THE NAACP, STEVEN PHALEN, BETTY RIDDLE, CLIFFORD TYSON, KRISTOPHER WRENCH, RAQUEL WRIGHT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (MORALES-DOYLE, SEAN)
July 10, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by RENE DEVLIN HARROD on behalf of PETER ANTONACCI (HARROD, RENE)
July 10, 2019 Filing 58 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on LAUREL M LEE (on behalf of Ashley Davis) on July 9, 2019, filed by ROSEMARY MCCOY, SHEILA SINGLETON. (SHORT, CAREN) Modified on 7/11/2019 to identify party served (toy).
July 10, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by NATHANIEL ADAM KLITSBERG on behalf of PETER ANTONACCI (KLITSBERG, NATHANIEL)
July 10, 2019 Filing 56 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on RON DESANTIS (on behalf of Nick Primrose) on July 9, 2019, filed by ROSEMARY MCCOY, SHEILA SINGLETON. (SHORT, CAREN) Modified on 7/11/2019 to identify party served (toy).
July 10, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by MARK HERRON on behalf of MARK EARLEY (HERRON, MARK)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE This Court has considered, without hearing, Plaintiffs' Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jonathan S. Topaz. ECF No. #52 . The motion is GRANTED. Mr. Topaz has fulfilled the requirements of the Local Rules for admission and is admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Plaintiffs. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 7/9/19. (blb)
July 9, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by ADAM M KATZMAN on behalf of PETER ANTONACCI (KATZMAN, ADAM)
July 9, 2019 Filing 52 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan S. Topaz.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4545806.) by FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, JEFF GRUVER, KEITH IVEY, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF FLORIDA, KAREN LEICHT, JERMAINE MILLER, EMORY MARQUIS MITCHELL, ORANGE COUNTY BRANCH OF THE NAACP, STEVEN PHALEN, BETTY RIDDLE, CLIFFORD TYSON, KRISTOPHER WRENCH, RAQUEL WRIGHT. (Attachments: #1 Topaz Certificate of Good Standing) (TOPAZ, JONATHAN)
July 9, 2019 Filing 51 Summons Issued as to RON DESANTIS, CRAIG LATIMER, LAUREL M LEE. (Hard copies of summons and USM 285 Forms received by mail) (toy)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING #49 MOTION FOR SERVICE BY UNITED STATES MARSHAL. Counsel for Petitioner/Plaintiff is directed to provide to the Clerk of the Court service copies of the Complaint, prepared Summons, and prepared USM 285 forms necessary for service by the United States Marshal. The Clerk shall forward four certified copies of this order, along with the Summons, service copies of the Complaint, and USM 285 forms, previously prepared by counsel for Petitioner/Plaintiff, to the United States Marshal. Upon receipt of these documents, the United States Marshal shall personally serve a copy of the Complaint and Summons on the above -named Respondents/Defendants and subsequently file its returns of service with the Clerk. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 07/09/2019. (toy) *Copies distributed as directed*
July 8, 2019 Set Response to Motion Deadlines as to #49 MOTION to Appoint Process Server . (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 7/22/2019). (toy)
July 8, 2019 Filing 49 MOTION to Appoint Process Server by KELVIN LEON JONES. (Attachments: #1 US Marshal for Ron Desantis, #2 Summon for Ron Desantis, #3 US Marshal for Laurel Lee, #4 Summon for Laurel Lee, #5 US Marshal for Craig Latimer, #6 Summon for Craig Latimer) (STEINBERG, MICHAEL)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER DENYING #45 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 07/08/2019. (toy)
July 8, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by DYLAN T REINGOLD on behalf of LESLIE ROSSWAY SWAN (REINGOLD, DYLAN)
July 8, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by CRAIG DENNIS FEISER on behalf of MIKE HOGAN (FEISER, CRAIG)
July 8, 2019 Filing 44 Summons Issued as to RON DESANTIS, MIKE HOGAN, LAUREL M LEE. (toy)
July 8, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of summonses to be issued by the Clerk by ROSEMARY MCCOY, SHEILA SINGLETON (Attachments: #1 Lee Summons, #2 Hogan Summons) (SHORT, CAREN)
July 8, 2019 Filing 42 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (SHORT, CAREN)
July 5, 2019 Filing 45 Motion to be Granted Amicus Curiae Status filed by John B. Thompson. (rcb)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE re #38 . Attorney LEAH CAMILLE ADEN for FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP,JEFF GRUVER, KEITH IVEY, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF FLORIDA, KAREN LEICHT, JERMAINE MILLER, EMORY MARQUIS MITCHELL, ORANGE COUNTY BRANCH OF THE NAACP, STEVEN PHALEN, BETTY RIDDLE, CLIFFORD TYSON, KRISTOPHER WRENCH, and RAQUEL WRIGHT added. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 07/05/2019. (toy)
July 5, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 7/19/2019 12:00 PM before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER. ALL PARTIES are directed to call the AT&T Conference Line (see below) Conference Call Information You may dial into the conference call up to five minutes before start time. Call in number: 888-684-8852 When prompted for an access code, enter: 3853136# If you are asked to join as the host, just ignore and wait until you are asked for a security code. When asked for a security code, enter: 4565# Say your name, when prompted. You are now in the conference call. Remember to mute your phone when you are not speaking. The Court also asks that counsel NOT use cell phones or speaker phones during the call as the quality of the audio connection is comprised by these devices. s/ Victoria Milton McGeeCourtroom Deputy Clerk (vkm)
July 5, 2019 Filing 39 Minute Entry for proceedings held before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER: Status Conference held on 7/5/2019. Parties discuss case status. Ruling by Court: Parties to confer no later than 7/12/19 re: #36 Motion to Expedite Discoveryif no agreement can be reached, responses to the motion are due by 7/15/2019, replies by 7/16/2019. Defendant Lee's ore tenus motion for defendants to file one responsive pleading is granted, and parties should also confer and discuss by 7/12/19. Clerk to set a telephonic scheduling conference for 7/19/19 at noon (Court Reporter Megan Hague). (vkm)
July 5, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Leah C. Aden.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4542301.) by FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, JEFF GRUVER, KEITH IVEY, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF FLORIDA, KAREN LEICHT, JERMAINE MILLER, EMORY MARQUIS MITCHELL, ORANGE COUNTY BRANCH OF THE NAACP, STEVEN PHALEN, BETTY RIDDLE, CLIFFORD TYSON, KRISTOPHER WRENCH, RAQUEL WRIGHT. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing - NY) (ADEN, LEAH)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 *VACATED PER ECF#107 * INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 7/19/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/19/2019. Discovery due by 11/4/2019. Status Report due by 8/5/2019. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 07/05/2019. (toy) Modified docket text on 8/16/2019 (toy).
July 3, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, JEFF GRUVER, KEITH IVEY, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF FLORIDA, KAREN LEICHT, JERMAINE MILLER, EMORY MARQUIS MITCHELL, ORANGE COUNTY BRANCH OF THE NAACP, STEVEN PHALEN, BETTY RIDDLE, KRISTOPHER WRENCH, RAQUEL WRIGHT. (EBENSTEIN, JULIE)
July 3, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by MYRNA PEREZ on behalf of FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, JEFF GRUVER, KEITH IVEY, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF FLORIDA, KAREN LEICHT, JERMAINE MILLER, EMORY MARQUIS MITCHELL, ORANGE COUNTY BRANCH OF THE NAACP, STEVEN PHALEN, BETTY RIDDLE, CLIFFORD TYSON, KRISTOPHER WRENCH, RAQUEL WRIGHT (PEREZ, MYRNA)
July 3, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by WENDY ROBIN WEISER on behalf of FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, JEFF GRUVER, KEITH IVEY, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF FLORIDA, KAREN LEICHT, JERMAINE MILLER, EMORY MARQUIS MITCHELL, ORANGE COUNTY BRANCH OF THE NAACP, STEVEN PHALEN, BETTY RIDDLE, CLIFFORD TYSON, KRISTOPHER WRENCH, RAQUEL WRIGHT (WEISER, WENDY)
July 3, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by NICHOLAS ARI SHANNIN on behalf of BILL COWLES (SHANNIN, NICHOLAS)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE re #28 . Attorney CAREN E SHORT for ROSEMARY MCCOY and SHEILA SINGLETON added. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 07/03/2019. (toy)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE re #25 . Attorney ELIZA SWEREN-BECKER for FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, JEFF GRUVER, KEITH IVEY, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF FLORIDA, KAREN LEICHT, JERMAINE MILLER, EMORY MARQUIS MITCHELL, ORANGE COUNTY BRANCH OF THE NAACP, STEVEN PHALEN, BETTY RIDDLE, CLIFFORD TYSON, KRISTOPHER WRENCH, and RAQUEL WRIGHT added. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 07/03/2019. (toy)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE re #27 . Attorney JONATHAN MICHAEL DIAZ for BONNIE RAYSOR and DIANE SHERRILL added. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 07/03/2019. (toy)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE re #26 . Attorney JOHN SPENCER CUSICK for FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, JEFF GRUVER, KEITH IVEY,LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF FLORIDA,KAREN LEICHT, JERMAINE MILLER, EMORY MARQUIS MITCHELL,ORANGE COUNTY BRANCH OF THE NAACP,STEVEN PHALEN, BETTY RIDDLE, CLIFFORD TYSON,KRISTOPHER WRENCH, and RAQUEL WRIGHT added. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 07/03/2019. (toy)
July 3, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Caren E. Short.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4541477.) by ROSEMARY MCCOY, SHEILA SINGLETON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (SHORT, CAREN)
July 3, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan Diaz.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4541201.) by BONNIE RAYSOR, DIANE SHERRILL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Certificate of Good Standing)) (DIAZ, JONATHAN)
July 3, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John S. Cusick.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4541161.) by FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, JEFF GRUVER, KEITH IVEY, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF FLORIDA, KAREN LEICHT, JERMAINE MILLER, EMORY MARQUIS MITCHELL, ORANGE COUNTY BRANCH OF THE NAACP, STEVEN PHALEN, BETTY RIDDLE, CLIFFORD TYSON, KRISTOPHER WRENCH, RAQUEL WRIGHT. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (CUSICK, JOHN)
July 3, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Eliza Sweren-Becker.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4540690.) by FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, JEFF GRUVER, KEITH IVEY, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF FLORIDA, KAREN LEICHT, JERMAINE MILLER, EMORY MARQUIS MITCHELL, ORANGE COUNTY BRANCH OF THE NAACP, STEVEN PHALEN, BETTY RIDDLE, CLIFFORD TYSON, RAQUEL WRIGHT. (SWEREN-BECKER, ELIZA)
July 3, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE Of Unavailability by KIM A BARTON (SWAIN, ROBERT)
July 3, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by BRADLEY ROBERT MCVAY on behalf of LAUREL M LEE (MCVAY, BRADLEY)
July 3, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by JIMMY MIDYETTE, JR on behalf of JEFF GRUVER (MIDYETTE, JIMMY)
July 3, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by OREN ROSENTHAL on behalf of CHRISTINA WHITE (ROSENTHAL, OREN)
July 3, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT CHARLES SWAIN on behalf of KIM A BARTON (SWAIN, ROBERT)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE re #15 . Attorney DANIELLE MARIE LANG for BONNIE RAYSOR and DIANE SHERRILL added. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 07/03/2019. (toy)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE re #14 . Attorney MARK P GABER for BONNIE RAYSOR and DIANE SHERRILL added. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 07/02/2019. (toy)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE re #13 . Attorney MOLLY ELIZABETH DANAHY for BONNIE RAYSOR and DIANE SHERRILL added. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 07/02/2019. (toy)
July 2, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Colleen O'Brien on 07/01/2019, filed by BONNIE RAYSOR, DIANE SHERRILL. (DUNN, CHAD)
July 2, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Danielle M. Lang.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4540345.) by BONNIE RAYSOR, DIANE SHERRILL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Certificate of Good Standing)) (LANG, DANIELLE)
July 2, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark P. Gaber.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4540341.) by BONNIE RAYSOR, DIANE SHERRILL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Certificate of Good Standing)) (GABER, MARK)
July 2, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Molly Danahy.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4540304.) by BONNIE RAYSOR, DIANE SHERRILL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Certificate of Good Standing)) (DANAHY, MOLLY)
July 2, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING: Telephonic Status Conference set for 7/5/2019 11:00 AM before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER. ALL PARTIES are directed to call the AT&T Conference Line (see below) Conference Call Information You may dial into the conference call up to five minutes before start time. Call in number: 888-684-8852 When prompted for an access code, enter: 3853136# If you are asked to join as the host, just ignore and wait until you are asked for a security code. When asked for a security code, enter: 4565# Say your name, when prompted. You are now in the conference call. Remember to mute your phone when you are not speaking. Please also mute your phone if you join the line and a hearing is already in progress. The Court also asks that counsel NOT use cell phones or speaker phones during the call as the quality of the audio connection is comprised by these devices. s/ Victoria Milton McGeeCourtroom Deputy Clerk (vkm)
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Related Cases by LAUREL M LEE (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD)
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by MOHAMMAD OMAR JAZIL on behalf of LAUREL M LEE (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL BOAZ TILLEY on behalf of FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, JEFF GRUVER, KEITH IVEY, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF FLORIDA, KAREN LEICHT, JERMAINE MILLER, EMORY MARQUIS MITCHELL, ORANGE COUNTY BRANCH OF THE NAACP, STEVEN PHALEN, BETTY RIDDLE, CLIFFORD TYSON, KRISTOPHER WRENCH, RAQUEL WRIGHT (TILLEY, DANIEL)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC STATUS HEARING. This Court must hold a hearing on an expedited basis. Accordingly, the Clerk is directed to set a telephonic status hearing on Friday, July 5, 2019. ( Telephonic Hearing Deadline - by 7/5/2019.) Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 07/02/2019. (toy)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #2 MOTION TO PROCEED FORMA PAUPERIS. Fee status updated to in forma pauperis. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 07/02/2019. (toy)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by NICHOLAS ALLEN PRIMROSE on behalf of RON DESANTIS (PRIMROSE, NICHOLAS)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (STEINBERG, MICHAEL)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Attorney MICHAEL A STEINBERG Re #1 Complaint - Counsel is advised by this entry, that a Civil Cover Sheet should be filed as a separate entry using the event selection "Civil Cover Sheet" which is found under "Other Filings" under "Other Documents". PLEASE RE-FILE THE CIVIL COVER SHEET. (toy)
June 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF TRANSFER AND CONSOLIDATION WITH PRIOR-FILED CASE. The Clerk is directed to take all necessary steps to consolidate Case Nos. 4:19cv300, 1:19cv121, and 4:19cv301 for the purposes of case management. They will be maintained on a common docket under Consolidated Case No. 4:19cv300. The Clerk is directed to connect all lawyers from the consolidated cases to Case No. 4:19cv300. A paper that is applicable to any of the consolidated case must be filed in the common docket and must not be filed separately in any other case. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 6/30/2019. (kjw)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kelvin Leon Jones. (STEINBERG, MICHAEL)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ron Desantis, Laurel Lee, and Craig Latimer filed by Kelvin Leon Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (STEINBERG, MICHAEL) Modified docket text on 7/1/2019 (toy).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JONES et al v. DESANTIS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAUREL M LEE
Represented By: MOHAMMAD OMAR JAZIL
Represented By: GEORGE N MEROS, JR
Represented By: BRADLEY ROBERT MCVAY
Represented By: TARA R PRICE
Represented By: ASHLEY E DAVIS
Represented By: GARY VERGIL PERKO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRAIG LATIMER
Represented By: STEPHEN MARK TODD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETER ANTONACCI
Represented By: RENE DEVLIN HARROD
Represented By: GEORGE N MEROS, JR
Represented By: NATHANIEL ADAM KLITSBERG
Represented By: TARA R PRICE
Represented By: ADAM M KATZMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTINA WHITE
Represented By: MICHAEL BENY VALDES
Represented By: OREN ROSENTHAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK EARLEY
Represented By: SUMMER DENAY BROWN
Represented By: MARK HERRON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LESLIE ROSSWAY SWAN
Represented By: DYLAN T REINGOLD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RON DESANTIS
Represented By: JOSEPH W JACQUOT
Represented By: COLLEEN M ERNST
Represented By: NICHOLAS ALLEN PRIMROSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIM A BARTON
Represented By: CORBIN FREDERICK HANSON
Represented By: ROBERT CHARLES SWAIN
Represented By: GEENA MARCELA CESAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BILL COWLES
Represented By: NICHOLAS ARI SHANNIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL BENNETT
Represented By: MORGAN RAY BENTLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RON TURNER
Represented By: MORGAN RAY BENTLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIKE HOGAN
Represented By: CRAIG DENNIS FEISER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelvin Leon Jones
Represented By: MICHAEL A STEINBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEE HOFFMAN
Represented By: CHAD W DUNN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFF GRUVER
Represented By: MYRNA PEREZ
Represented By: JOHN SPENCER CUSICK
Represented By: ELIZA SWEREN-BECKER
Represented By: WENDY ROBIN WEISER
Represented By: JIMMY MIDYETTE, JR
Represented By: SEAN MORALES-DOYLE
Represented By: LEAH CAMILLE ADEN
Represented By: JONATHAN TOPAZ
Represented By: JULIE A EBENSTEIN
Represented By: DANIEL BOAZ TILLEY
Represented By: RODKANGYIL ORION DANJUMA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIANE SHERRILL
Represented By: JONATHAN MICHAEL DIAZ
Represented By: DANIELLE MARIE LANG
Represented By: CHAD W DUNN
Represented By: BLAIR S BOWIE
Represented By: MARK P GABER
Represented By: MOLLY ELIZABETH DANAHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FLORIDA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP
Represented By: MYRNA PEREZ
Represented By: JOHN SPENCER CUSICK
Represented By: ELIZA SWEREN-BECKER
Represented By: WENDY ROBIN WEISER
Represented By: SEAN MORALES-DOYLE
Represented By: LEAH CAMILLE ADEN
Represented By: JONATHAN TOPAZ
Represented By: JULIE A EBENSTEIN
Represented By: DANIEL BOAZ TILLEY
Represented By: RODKANGYIL ORION DANJUMA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BETTY RIDDLE
Represented By: MYRNA PEREZ
Represented By: JOHN SPENCER CUSICK
Represented By: ELIZA SWEREN-BECKER
Represented By: WENDY ROBIN WEISER
Represented By: SEAN MORALES-DOYLE
Represented By: LEAH CAMILLE ADEN
Represented By: JONATHAN TOPAZ
Represented By: JULIE A EBENSTEIN
Represented By: DANIEL BOAZ TILLEY
Represented By: RODKANGYIL ORION DANJUMA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KRISTOPHER WRENCH
Represented By: MYRNA PEREZ
Represented By: ELIZA SWEREN-BECKER
Represented By: JOHN SPENCER CUSICK
Represented By: WENDY ROBIN WEISER
Represented By: SEAN MORALES-DOYLE
Represented By: LEAH CAMILLE ADEN
Represented By: JONATHAN TOPAZ
Represented By: JULIE A EBENSTEIN
Represented By: DANIEL BOAZ TILLEY
Represented By: RODKANGYIL ORION DANJUMA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAREN LEICHT
Represented By: MYRNA PEREZ
Represented By: JOHN SPENCER CUSICK
Represented By: ELIZA SWEREN-BECKER
Represented By: WENDY ROBIN WEISER
Represented By: SEAN MORALES-DOYLE
Represented By: LEAH CAMILLE ADEN
Represented By: JONATHAN TOPAZ
Represented By: JULIE A EBENSTEIN
Represented By: DANIEL BOAZ TILLEY
Represented By: RODKANGYIL ORION DANJUMA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMORY MARQUIS MITCHELL
Represented By: MYRNA PEREZ
Represented By: JOHN SPENCER CUSICK
Represented By: ELIZA SWEREN-BECKER
Represented By: WENDY ROBIN WEISER
Represented By: SEAN MORALES-DOYLE
Represented By: LEAH CAMILLE ADEN
Represented By: JONATHAN TOPAZ
Represented By: JULIE A EBENSTEIN
Represented By: DANIEL BOAZ TILLEY
Represented By: RODKANGYIL ORION DANJUMA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHEILA SINGLETON
Represented By: CAREN E SHORT
Represented By: NANCY GBANA ABUDU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JERMAINE MILLER
Represented By: MYRNA PEREZ
Represented By: JOHN SPENCER CUSICK
Represented By: ELIZA SWEREN-BECKER
Represented By: WENDY ROBIN WEISER
Represented By: SEAN MORALES-DOYLE
Represented By: LEAH CAMILLE ADEN
Represented By: JONATHAN TOPAZ
Represented By: JULIE A EBENSTEIN
Represented By: DANIEL BOAZ TILLEY
Represented By: RODKANGYIL ORION DANJUMA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAQUEL WRIGHT
Represented By: MYRNA PEREZ
Represented By: JOHN SPENCER CUSICK
Represented By: ELIZA SWEREN-BECKER
Represented By: WENDY ROBIN WEISER
Represented By: SEAN MORALES-DOYLE
Represented By: LEAH CAMILLE ADEN
Represented By: JONATHAN TOPAZ
Represented By: JULIE A EBENSTEIN
Represented By: DANIEL BOAZ TILLEY
Represented By: RODKANGYIL ORION DANJUMA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEITH IVEY
Represented By: MYRNA PEREZ
Represented By: JOHN SPENCER CUSICK
Represented By: ELIZA SWEREN-BECKER
Represented By: WENDY ROBIN WEISER
Represented By: SEAN MORALES-DOYLE
Represented By: LEAH CAMILLE ADEN
Represented By: JONATHAN TOPAZ
Represented By: JULIE A EBENSTEIN
Represented By: DANIEL BOAZ TILLEY
Represented By: RODKANGYIL ORION DANJUMA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSEMARY MCCOY
Represented By: CAREN E SHORT
Represented By: NANCY GBANA ABUDU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF FLORIDA
Represented By: MYRNA PEREZ
Represented By: JOHN SPENCER CUSICK
Represented By: ELIZA SWEREN-BECKER
Represented By: WENDY ROBIN WEISER
Represented By: SEAN MORALES-DOYLE
Represented By: LEAH CAMILLE ADEN
Represented By: JONATHAN TOPAZ
Represented By: JULIE A EBENSTEIN
Represented By: DANIEL BOAZ TILLEY
Represented By: RODKANGYIL ORION DANJUMA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ORANGE COUNTY BRANCH OF THE NAACP
Represented By: MYRNA PEREZ
Represented By: JOHN SPENCER CUSICK
Represented By: ELIZA SWEREN-BECKER
Represented By: WENDY ROBIN WEISER
Represented By: SEAN MORALES-DOYLE
Represented By: LEAH CAMILLE ADEN
Represented By: JONATHAN TOPAZ
Represented By: JULIE A EBENSTEIN
Represented By: DANIEL BOAZ TILLEY
Represented By: RODKANGYIL ORION DANJUMA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLIFFORD TYSON
Represented By: MYRNA PEREZ
Represented By: JOHN SPENCER CUSICK
Represented By: ELIZA SWEREN-BECKER
Represented By: WENDY ROBIN WEISER
Represented By: SEAN MORALES-DOYLE
Represented By: LEAH CAMILLE ADEN
Represented By: JONATHAN TOPAZ
Represented By: JULIE A EBENSTEIN
Represented By: DANIEL BOAZ TILLEY
Represented By: RODKANGYIL ORION DANJUMA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN PHALEN
Represented By: MYRNA PEREZ
Represented By: JOHN SPENCER CUSICK
Represented By: ELIZA SWEREN-BECKER
Represented By: WENDY ROBIN WEISER
Represented By: SEAN MORALES-DOYLE
Represented By: LEAH CAMILLE ADEN
Represented By: JONATHAN TOPAZ
Represented By: JULIE A EBENSTEIN
Represented By: DANIEL BOAZ TILLEY
Represented By: RODKANGYIL ORION DANJUMA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUIS A MENDEZ
Represented By: MICHAEL A STEINBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BONNIE RAYSOR
Represented By: JONATHAN MICHAEL DIAZ
Represented By: DANIELLE MARIE LANG
Represented By: CHAD W DUNN
Represented By: BLAIR S BOWIE
Represented By: MARK P GABER
Represented By: MOLLY ELIZABETH DANAHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Governor RON DESANTIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?