AKINS v. CHC INVESTORS LLC
Plaintiff: SHIRLEY J. AKINS
Defendant: CHC INVESTORS LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00323
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Corrected Plaintiff's Statement of Compliance With Rule 26 by SHIRLEY J. AKINS re #13 Notice (Other) (MATTOX, MARIE)
September 12, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Plaintiff's Statement of Compliance With Rule 26 by SHIRLEY J. AKINS (MATTOX, MARIE)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER Re: #11 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting :( Discovery due by 3/27/2020., Dispositive Motions to be filed by 4/17/2020., Jury Trial set for 8/17/2020 08:15 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER., Mediation Report due by 5/8/2020.), Case referred to mediation. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 08/28/2019. (toy)
August 28, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed Re: #11 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (kjw)
August 27, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (LA FLEUR, DEBORAH)
August 16, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings Status Report due by 9/16/2019. (blb)
August 15, 2019 Filing 10 STATUS REPORT (First Joint Status Report Regarding Discovery) by CHC INVESTORS LLC. (LA FLEUR, DEBORAH)
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIKA ESAN GOODMAN on behalf of SHIRLEY J. AKINS (GOODMAN, ERIKA)
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 Defendant's ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint (Answer and Affirmative Defenses) by CHC INVESTORS LLC. (LA FLEUR, DEBORAH)
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against CHC INVESTORS LLC, filed by SHIRLEY J. AKINS. (MATTOX, MARIE)
July 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE RESPONSE - Defendant's motion for leave to file a response upon the filing of Plaintiff's forthcoming amended complaint, ECF No. #4 , is hereby GRANTED. Defendant shall file its response within the time provided by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure after Plaintiff files her amended complaint, if any. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 7/28/2019. (cle)
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by CHC INVESTORS LLC. (LA FLEUR, DEBORAH)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to File Defendant's Response Upon the Filing of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Based on Plaintiff Counsel's Representation by CHC INVESTORS LLC. (LA FLEUR, DEBORAH)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER - Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 7/30/2019. Status Report due by 8/16/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/29/2019. Discovery due by 11/13/2019. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 7/16/2019. (cle)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (LA FLEUR, DEBORAH)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CHC INVESTORS LLC from SECOND JUDICIAL CIRCUIT, LEON COUNTY, FLORIDA, case number 2019 CA 000721. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4552406.), filed by CHC INVESTORS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit COMPOSITE EXHIBIT A, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B) (LA FLEUR, DEBORAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AKINS v. CHC INVESTORS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHC INVESTORS LLC
Represented By: DEBORAH LYNN LA FLEUR
Represented By: CRAIG FRISCHER NOVICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHIRLEY J. AKINS
Represented By: MARIE A MATTOX
Represented By: ERIKA ESAN GOODMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?