GLOVER v. DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS STATE OF FLORIDA
Plaintiff: JENNIFER LYNN GLOVER
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS STATE OF FLORIDA and FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Case Number: 4:2019cv00327
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER Re: #10 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting :( Discovery due by 5/29/2020., Dispositive Motions to be filed by 6/19/2020., Jury Trial set for 10/19/2020 08:15 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER., Mediation Report due by 7/10/2020.), Case referred to mediation. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 8/26/19. (blb)
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (THOMPSON, THOMAS)
August 19, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings Status Report due by 9/19/2019. (blb)
August 16, 2019 Filing 9 STATUS REPORT JOINT ON DISCOVERY by FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS. (THOMPSON, THOMAS)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (THOMPSON, THOMAS)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER : Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/30/2019. Discovery due by 11/14/2019. Status Report due by 8/17/2019. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 7/17/19. (blb)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Attorney Thompson Re #1 Notice of Removal- Counsel is advised by this entry, that a Civil Cover Sheet should be filed as a separate entry using the event selection "Civil Cover Sheet" which is found under "Other Filings" under "Other Documents". PLEASE FILE THE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Further, for future case openings: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or Chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide", (both available on the clerk's website). (blb)
July 16, 2019 CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER and MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK added. (erl)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by MALLORY R BENNETT on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS STATE OF FLORIDA (BENNETT, MALLORY)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS STATE OF FLORIDA. (Thompson, Thomas)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas R Thompson on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS STATE OF FLORIDA (Thompson, Thomas)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING by DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS STATE OF FLORIDA (Thompson, Thomas)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS STATE OF FLORIDA from Circuit Court in and for Leon County, case number 2019-CA-0710. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4553538.), filed by DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS STATE OF FLORIDA. (Thompson, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GLOVER v. DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS STATE OF FLORIDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER LYNN GLOVER
Represented By: MARIE A MATTOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS STATE OF FLORIDA
Represented By: MALLORY R BENNETT
Represented By: Thomas R Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Represented By: MALLORY R BENNETT
Represented By: Thomas R Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?