CORKER v. HOBBS et al
Plaintiff: MICHAEL CORKER
Defendant: CIRCUIT COURT SECOND JUDICIAL CIRCUIT LEON COUNTY and BARBARA J HOBBS
Case Number: 4:2019cv00354
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: ALLEN C WINSOR
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR notified that action is needed Re: #8 Objection to #6 Report and Recommendation (jcw)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 OBJECTION to #6 Report and Recommendations by MICHAEL CORKER. (jcw)
September 17, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR notified that action is needed Re: #6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, #7 Objection to Report and Recommendations (jcw)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 OBJECTION to #6 Report and Recommendations by MICHAEL CORKER. (jcw)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #5 ) is GRANTED for the limited purpose of dismissing this action. The undersigned respectfully RECOMMENDS that: This case be DISMISSED without prejudice, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b)(1) and 1915(e)(2)(B)(i), for maliciousness and abuse of the judicial process. The clerk of the court be directed to enter judgment accordingly and close this case. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 9/3/2019. ( Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 10/1/2019.) (jcw)
August 28, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #4 Amended Complaint, #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (jcw)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by MICHAEL CORKER. (jcw)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against CIRCUIT COURT SECOND JUDICIAL CIRCUIT LEON COUNTY, BARBARA J HOBBS, filed by MICHAEL CORKER. (No service copies filed.) (jcw)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re #1 Complaint. The clerk shall send plaintiff a 1983 complaint form for use by prisoners, and a form application to proceed in forma pauperis. This case number shall be written on the forms. Within THIRTY (30) DAYS from the date of this order, Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint which shall be typed or clearly written, and submitted on the court-approved form. Within THE SAME TIME PERIOD, Plaintiff shall either pay the $400.00 fee ($350.00 filing fee and $50.00 administrative fee) or submit a completed application to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 8/14/2019.(Documents mailed as ordered.)( Amended Pleadings due by 9/13/2019., Fee due by 9/13/2019.) (jcw)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 Notice to Pro Se (jcw)
July 31, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint. (jcw)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CIRCUIT COURT SECOND JUDICIAL CIRCUIT LEON COUNTY, BARBARA J HOBBS, filed by MICHAEL CORKER. (Filing fee was not paid. No service copies filed.) (jcw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CORKER v. HOBBS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL CORKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIRCUIT COURT SECOND JUDICIAL CIRCUIT LEON COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARBARA J HOBBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?