CORKER v. ALLMAN et al
Plaintiff: MICHAEL CORKER
Defendant: FRANCIS ALLMAN, LAWANDA WARREN, JUANITA LEWIS and LISA SOKOL
Case Number: 4:2019cv00363
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. This Court has considered, without hearing, the Objection to Legal Conclusion filed pro se by the Plaintiff on September 25, 2019. ECF No. #10 . This Court has construed Plaintiff's present Objection as a motion for reconsideration. Upon consideration, without hearing, this Court finds Plaintiff has offered no new evidence or arguments of merit to warrant relief. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED: The motion for reconsideration is DENIED. The Clerk shall close the file. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 9/30/19. (blb)
September 25, 2019 Filing 10 OBJECTION to #6 Report and Recommendations by MICHAEL CORKER. (jcw)
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S JUDGMENT - re: #8 ORDER ACCEPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. (cle)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ACCEPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - The #6 report and recommendation is accepted and adopted, over Plaintiff's objections, as this Court's opinion. The Clerk shall enter judgment stating, "This case is DISMISSED without prejudice, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b)(1) and 1915(e)(2)(B)(i), for maliciousness and abuse of the judicial process." The Clerk shall also close the file. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 9/18/2019. (cle)
September 17, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed Re: #6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, #7 Objection to Report and Recommendations (jcw)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 OBJECTION to #6 Report and Recommendations by MICHAEL CORKER. (jcw)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #4 Amended Complaint. For the reasons set forth above, it is ORDERED: Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #5 ) is GRANTED for the limited purpose of dismissing this action. The undersigned respectfully RECOMMENDS that: This case be DISMISSED without prejudice, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b)(1) and 1915(e)(2)(B)(i), for maliciousness and abuse of the judicial process. The clerk of the court be directed to enter judgment accordingly and close this case. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 9/3/2019. ( Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 10/1/2019.) (jcw)
August 28, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #4 Amended Complaint. Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (jcw)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by MICHAEL CORKER. (jcw)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against FRANCIS ALLMAN, JUANITA LEWIS, LAWANDA WARREN, LISA SOKOL, filed by MICHAEL CORKER. (No service copies filed.) (jcw)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re #1 Complaint. The clerk shall send Plaintiff a 1983 complaint form for use by prisoners, and a form application to proceed in forma pauperis. This case number shall be written on the forms. Within THIRTY (30) DAYS from the date of this order, Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint which shall be typed or clearly written, and submitted on the court-approved form. Within THE SAME TIME PERIOD, Plaintiff shall either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $50.00 administrative fee, or submit a complete application to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 8/13/2019.( Amended Pleadings due by 9/12/2019.)(Forms mailed as ordered.) (jcw)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 Notice to Pro Se (jcw)
August 6, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint. (jcw)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FRANCIS ALLMAN, JUANITA LEWIS, LAWANDA WARREN, filed by MICHAEL CORKER. (Filing fee was not paid. No service copies filed.) (jcw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CORKER v. ALLMAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANCIS ALLMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAWANDA WARREN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUANITA LEWIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LISA SOKOL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL CORKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?