LAWRENCE v. ZFTRW AUTOMOTIVE HOLDINGS CORP
Plaintiff: Kaya Lawrence
Defendant: ZFTRW AUTOMOTIVE HOLDINGS CORP., TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, U.S.A., INC., TOYOTA MOTOR ENGINEERING & MANUFACTURING NORTH AMERICA INC, ZF FRIEDRICHSHAFEN AG, TRW VEHICLE SAFETY SYSTEMS INC, ZFTRW AUTOMOTIVE HOLDINGS CORP, TRW AUTOMOTIVE INC, TOYOTA MOTOR CORPORATION, TRW AUTOMOTIVE US LLC and TOYOTA MOTOR SALES USA INC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00369
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: ROBERT L HINKLE
Referring Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 17 ACKNOWLEDGMENT - re: 16 Interdistrict Transfer to the Central District of California re: MDL 2905. The Central District of California has opened this case in their district. Their case number is 2:19-cv-7608. (cle)
September 5, 2019 Filing 16 Interdistrict Transfer to the Central District of California re: MDL 2905. (cle)
September 3, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-2) re: MDL 2905 to Central District of California. (Attachment(s) #1 E-Mail Requesting Case). (cle)
August 13, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to TRW VEHICLE SAFETY SYSTEMS INC. (toy)
August 13, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to TRW AUTOMOTIVE INC. (toy)
August 12, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Summons to be Issued by KAYA LAWRENCE (TAPLEY, FRANK)
August 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Summons to be Issued by KAYA LAWRENCE (TAPLEY, FRANK)
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to ZF FRIEDRICHSHAFEN AG. (cle)
August 9, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to ZFTRW AUTOMOTIVE HOLDINGS CORP. (cle)
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to TRW AUTOMOTIVE US LLC. (cle)
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, U.S.A., INC.. (cle)
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to TOYOTA MOTOR ENGINEERING & MANUFACTURING NORTH AMERICA INC. (cle)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The filing of this case was incomplete as only two of the eight parties were added to the docket. The clerk has added the remaining parties as a courtesy. Further, there were two proposed summons filed for the same party as well as no proposed summons for two of the parties. The court has issued proposed summons for five of the parties. It is the responsibility of Attorney TAPLEY to provide the other proposed summons. Counsel is urged to review his court filings for accuracy. (cle)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (TAPLEY, FRANK)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: To ATTORNEY TAPLEY - re: #1 Complaint. Party names (including aliases) are to be added using all caps and no punctuation. (See "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing," available on Clerk's website.) The party names will be corrected by the clerk. Further, counsel is advised by this entry, that a Civil Cover Sheet must be filed as a separate entry using the event selection "Civil Cover Sheet" which is found under "Other Filings" under "Other Documents". PLEASE RE-FILE THE CIVIL COVER SHEET (cle)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Summons to be Issued by Kaya Lawrence (Attachments: #1 Summons to be Issued, #2 Summons to be Issued, #3 Summons to be Issued, #4 Summons to be Issued, #5 Summons to be Issued) (TAPLEY, FRANK)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4582057.), filed by Kaya Lawrence. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (TAPLEY, FRANK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LAWRENCE v. ZFTRW AUTOMOTIVE HOLDINGS CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaya Lawrence
Represented By: FRANK JEROME TAPLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZFTRW AUTOMOTIVE HOLDINGS CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, U.S.A., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOYOTA MOTOR ENGINEERING & MANUFACTURING NORTH AMERICA INC
Represented By: FRANK JEROME TAPLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZF FRIEDRICHSHAFEN AG
Represented By: FRANK JEROME TAPLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRW VEHICLE SAFETY SYSTEMS INC
Represented By: FRANK JEROME TAPLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZFTRW AUTOMOTIVE HOLDINGS CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRW AUTOMOTIVE INC
Represented By: FRANK JEROME TAPLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOYOTA MOTOR CORPORATION
Represented By: FRANK JEROME TAPLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRW AUTOMOTIVE US LLC
Represented By: FRANK JEROME TAPLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOYOTA MOTOR SALES USA INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?