CUNNINGHAM v. DARDEN RESTAURANTS INC
Plaintiff: TERRANCE CUNNINGHAM
Defendant: DARDEN RESTAURANTS, INC. and DARDEN RESTAURANTS INC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00382
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: ROBERT L HINKLE
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S JUDGMENT re #6 Order. 90 Day Exhibit Return Deadline set for 12/3/2019 (rcb)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR DISMISSAL. The parties must present their dispute to arbitration in accordance with their agreement. The clerk must enter judgment stating, "This case is dismissed without prejudice in deference to arbitration." The court retains jurisdiction to enforce the order to present the dispute to arbitration and retains jurisdiction to enforce or set aside any arbitration award. The clerk must close the file. A party who objects to the terms of this order or the judgment to be entered based on this order must file a timely motion to alter or amend under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 59(e). Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 09/04/2019. (rcb)
September 4, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE notified that action is needed Re: #5 Order.***No notice that objects to dismissal filed by 9/3/2019*** (rcb)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER COMPELLING ARBITRATION. The joint motion to compel arbitration, ECF No. #4 , is granted. The parties must present their dispute to arbitration in accordance with their agreement. The case will be dismissed by a judgment retaining jurisdiction to enforce the order to arbitrate and retaining jurisdiction to enforce or set aside any arbitration awardunless a party files by 9/3/2019, a notice that objects to dismissal on these terms. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 08/19/2019. (rcb)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Completion of Arbitration by DARDEN RESTAURANTS INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (WEINSTEIN, LAURIE)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 8/14/2019. Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 8/28/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/27/2019. Discovery due by 12/12/2019. (rcb)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (WEINSTEIN, LAURIE)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by DARDEN RESTAURANTS, INC. from SECOND JUDICIAL CIRCUIT, LEON COUNTY, FL, case number 2019 CA 001405. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4587583.), filed by DARDEN RESTAURANTS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) State Court Case, #2 Exhibit B) Defendant's NOF Notice of Removal) (WEINSTEIN, LAURIE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CUNNINGHAM v. DARDEN RESTAURANTS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERRANCE CUNNINGHAM
Represented By: MARIE A MATTOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DARDEN RESTAURANTS, INC.
Represented By: LAURIE MARTINE WEINSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DARDEN RESTAURANTS INC
Represented By: LAURIE MARTINE WEINSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?