PHILLIP v. BARR et al
Petitioner: MALCOLM PHILLIP
Respondent: WILLIAM BARR, WARDEN, U S ICE FIELD OFFICE DIRECTOR, SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY and MATTHEW T ALBENCE
Case Number: 4:2019cv00392
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
Referring Judge: ALLEN C WINSOR
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to MATTHEW T ALBENCE, ICE Acting Director. (blb)
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to WILLIAM BARR, U.S. Attorney General. (blb)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. The Clerk of Court shall substitute ICE Acting Director Matthew T. Albence in place of named Respondent Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security, Kristjen Neilsen, pursuant to Rule 25(d). The Clerk of Court shall prepare and send sufficient copies of this Order, the petition, ECF No. #1 , and summons to Attorney General of the United States William Barr and ICE Acting Director Matthew T. Albence. The Clerk of Court shall also prepare a copy of this Order, the petition, ECF No. #1 , and summons, and send those copies to the United States Attorney for this District who shall have until 11/22/2019, in which to file an answer or similar response to the petition. Petitioner shall have until 12/20/2019), in which to file a reply to the answer or response filed by the Respondents. The Clerk of Court shall note on the docket that Petitioner paid the filing fee for this case. See ECF No. #4 at 11. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon the filing of an answer or other response to the petition, or no later than 11/22/2019. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 9/23/19. (blb) *MATTHEW T ALBENCE added. SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY terminated. ORDERED #6 and Filing Fee docketed as separate entry. Documents forwarded as Directed*
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. Petitioner's motion for in forma pauperis status, ECF No. #4 , isDENIED as moot. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 9/23/19. (blb) *See ORDERED: #6*
September 20, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to CHARLES A STAMPELOS. (rcb)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with attachments by MALCOLM PHILLIP. (rcb)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. The Clerk of Court shall provide Petitioner with an in forma pauperis application packet. Petitioner shall have until 10/10/2019, in which to either pay the $5.00 filing fee for this case or file a motion requesting leave to proceed in forma pauperis, supported by a financial affidavit. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon Petitioner's compliance with this Order, or no later than 10/10/2019. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 9/10/19. (blb) *Forms Provided as Directed*
August 19, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (rcb)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 Notice to Pro Se (rcb)
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 400037369. Fee status updated to paid. (blb)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant TO 28 USC 2241 By A Person Subject to Indefinite Immigration Detention with attachments, filed by MALCOLM PHILLIP. (rcb) **No service copies/IFP motion**

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PHILLIP v. BARR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WARDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U S ICE FIELD OFFICE DIRECTOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MATTHEW T ALBENCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MALCOLM PHILLIP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?