JEROME v. TALLAHASSEE FLORIDA DRIVERS LICENSE DIVISION
Plaintiff: JEREMY JEROME
Defendant: TALLAHASSEE FLORIDA DRIVERS LICENSE DIVISION
Case Number: 4:2019cv00403
Filed: August 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S JUDGMENT - re: #11 ORDER ACCEPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. 90 Day Exhibit Return Deadline set for 12/12/2019. (cle)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ACCEPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - The #7 report and recommendation is accepted and adopted, over Plaintiff's objections, as this Court's opinion. The Clerk shall enter judgment stating, "Plaintiff's Complaint, ECF No. #1 , is DISMISSED as frivolous and for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. All pending motions are DENIED." The Clerk shall close the file. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 9/12/2019. (cle)
September 11, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED OBJECTION to #7 Report and Recommendation filed by JEREMY JEROME. (cle)
September 10, 2019 Filing 9 OBJECTION to #7 Report and Recommendation filed by JEREMY JEROME. (cle)
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 OBJECTION to #7 Report and Recommendation filed by JEREMY JEROME. (cle)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order **Duplicate - ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 8/28/2019. (lsd)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion to proceed informa pauperis, ECF No. #3 , is GRANTED. It is respectfully RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's complaint, ECF No. #1 , be DISMISSED as frivolous and for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted, and that all other pending motions be denied. - R&R flag set(Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 9/25/2019.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 8/28/2019. (rcb)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 Letter with attachments (copy of documents filed on 8/23/2019) from JEREMY JEROME (rcb)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 MISC DOCUMENTS FILED BY JEREMY JEROME WITH ATTACHMENTS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit VOTER INFORMATION CARD, #2 Exhibit VOTER INFORMATION CARD, #3 Exhibit COPY OF PRINTOUT, #4 Exhibit MONROE COUNTY DOCUMENT, #5 Exhibit LETTER) (rcb)
August 21, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: #2 Motion Requesting Appointment of Counsel, #3 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis, #1 Complaint. Referred to CHARLES A STAMPELOS. (rcb)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 Notice to Pro Se (rcb)
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by JEREMY JEROME. (rcb)
August 21, 2019 Filing 2 Motion Requesting Appointment of Counsel by JEREMY JEROME. (rcb)
August 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TALLAHASSEE FLORIDA DRIVERS LICENSE DIVISION, filed by JEREMY JEROME.***No service copy provided*** (rcb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JEROME v. TALLAHASSEE FLORIDA DRIVERS LICENSE DIVISION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TALLAHASSEE FLORIDA DRIVERS LICENSE DIVISION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEREMY JEROME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?